Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Naval Ship - AHTS / 2012-09-07 - 2016-11-07 (4 года)
Master: MAMOLA MELODY - DSV (Diving Support) / 2023-03-28 - 2023-06-12 (2 месяца)
Master: MEO GUARDIAN - Survey vessel / 2017-01-01 - 2021-08-20 (4 года)
Chief Officer: MEO Guardian - Accommodation barge / 2016-04-25 - 2016-07-30 (3 месяца)
Master: Jan Van Gent - Standby-safety vessel / 2015-06-15 - 2015-10-12 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Straitview - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-01 - 2016-12-04 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aliot - Tug boat / 2016-04-15 - 2016-06-11 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aliot - Tug boat / 2015-12-05 - 2016-02-08 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Niagara - Chemical tanker / 2015-04-14 - 2015-06-10 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Niagara - Chemical tanker / 2015-02-14 - 2015-04-14 (2 месяца)
Master: TRUVOR - Tug boat / 2016-04-16 - 2017-11-24 (1 год)
Chief Officer: DIR - Tug boat / 2012-11-01 - 2016-04-16 (3 года)
2nd Officer: Lappland - Container Ship / 2012-03-23 - 2012-08-26 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Oeland - Container Ship / 2010-12-05 - 2011-06-03 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Celtic Freedom - Coaster / 2010-06-09 - 2010-10-26 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Thorco Africa - General cargo / 2015-06-12 - 2016-03-24 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Thorco Sapphire - RO-RO / 2014-08-22 - 2015-02-26 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hammonia Pacificum - Container Ship / 2013-12-17 - 2014-04-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: TS Qingdao (Hammonia Holasatia) - Container Ship / 2013-05-22 - 2013-10-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Belgica - Container Ship / 2012-10-15 - 2013-03-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nireas - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-15 - 2016-01-04 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Atlas - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-29 - 2014-12-17 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Thisseas - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-19 - 2014-03-17 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Joalmi - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-17 - 2013-04-05 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: Joalmi - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-05 - 2012-12-17 (12 дней)
Chief Officer: Roschem-2 - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-05-26 - 2015-10-04 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vladimir Rusanov - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-11-29 - 2015-01-23 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Roschem-2 - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-06-13 - 2014-08-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Riroil 2 - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-12-05 - 2013-04-22 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Riroil 4 - Oil Products Tanker / 2011-10-01 - 2012-04-10 (6 месяцев)
Master: Aquata - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-19 - 2017-12-15 (5 месяцев)
Master: South Wind - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-07 - 2017-03-05 (5 месяцев)
Master: United Jalua - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-27 - 2016-09-12 (2 месяца)
Master: South Wind - Bulk Carrier / 2015-07-16 - 2015-12-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: United Tristan Da Cuhna - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-13 - 2015-06-19 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Polonia - Container Ship / 2014-02-08 - 2014-07-25 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cs Discovery - Container Ship / 2013-06-15 - 2013-11-06 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Uranus - Container Ship / 2012-11-21 - 2013-03-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: VEGA - Container Ship / 2012-03-10 - 2012-10-15 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Uranus - Container Ship / 2011-06-20 - 2011-11-15 (5 месяцев)
Master: Zamil-51 - AHTS / 2015-01-19 - 2015-05-04 (3 месяца)
Master: Zamil-51 DP-2 - AHTS / 2014-07-13 - 2014-11-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-55 DP-1 - AHTS / 2014-03-08 - 2014-05-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-57 DP-1 - AHTS / 2013-10-01 - 2013-12-09 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil-58 DP-1 - AHTS / 2013-03-16 - 2013-06-27 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fluvius Taw - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-10-29 - 2014-03-01 (4 месяца)
Master: Fri Sea - General cargo / 2012-06-26 - 2012-10-03 (3 месяца)
Master: Fri Sea - General cargo / 2011-12-21 - 2012-03-30 (3 месяца)
Master: Svyatitel Aleksiy - Dry Cargo / 2011-04-25 - 2011-09-08 (4 месяца)
Master: Svyatitel Aleksiy - Dry Cargo / 2010-08-08 - 2010-12-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ice Bird - Other vessels / 2011-10-27 - 2012-04-27 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ice Bird - Other vessels / 2011-10-27 - 2012-04-27 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ice Star,IceBird,Ice crystal - Reefer / 1998-09-01 - 2011-10-12 (13 лет)
Master: Bystray - Other vessels / 2016-09-18 - 2016-12-16 (3 месяца)
Master: Antey - Tug boat / 2015-05-15 - 2015-07-04 (2 месяца)
Master: Ataman - General cargo / 2012-11-04 - 2013-05-12 (6 месяцев)
Master: Ataman - General cargo / 2011-12-21 - 2012-05-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Vega/Sarma1 - Dry Cargo / 2011-06-04 - 2011-10-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ankie - General cargo / 2024-07-01 - 2024-09-11 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: ANKIE - General cargo / 2024-04-06 - 2024-05-20 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: ANKIE - General cargo / 2023-11-20 - 2024-01-19 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: ANKIE - General cargo / 2023-07-28 - 2023-09-25 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: LEONIE - General cargo / 2023-03-02 - 2023-05-24 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: ELBTRAVELLER - Container Ship / 2023-12-19 - 2024-04-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: KATHERINE BORCHARD - Container Ship / 2023-06-23 - 2023-11-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aion - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-02-01 - 2024-04-21 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aion - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-04-18 - 2023-07-14 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ridgebury Mary Jane - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-22 - 2022-12-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ridgebury Astary - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-02-22 - 2022-06-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ridgebury Lessly B - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-22 - 2021-10-29 (5 месяцев)
Master: Fairplay XII - Tug boat / 2024-01-15 - 2024-02-01 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swardfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-10-19 - 2021-12-29 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swardfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-07-07 - 2021-09-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swardfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-02-03 - 2021-04-15 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swordfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2020-07-19 - 2020-11-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: EDERRA - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-08-26 - 2024-01-02 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: AXIOS I - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-11 - 2023-03-06 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ALIAKMON - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-12 - 2021-02-26 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: KALAMAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-31 - 2019-11-26 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: VOIDOMATIS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-07 - 2019-03-11 (6 месяцев)
Master: Atlantis - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2024-04-02 - 2024-05-29 (2 месяца)
Master: Spasatel Karev - MRSV / 2023-11-01 - 2023-11-30 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Atlantis - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-04-06 - 2023-06-28 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Atlantis - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-12-13 - 2023-02-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Atlantis - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-08-03 - 2022-10-12 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: CHEM LITHIUM - Chemical tanker / 2022-12-29 - 2023-05-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CHEM LITHIUM - Chemical tanker / 2022-03-04 - 2022-10-08 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: STOLT SYPRESS - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-24 - 2021-12-17 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: STOLT EFFORT - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-25 - 2021-02-19 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: STOLT RENGE - Chemical tanker / 2019-08-26 - 2020-01-06 (4 месяца)