Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Paganella - RO-RO / 2024-01-24 - 2024-05-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Paganella - RO-RO / 2023-05-09 - 2023-09-06 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mosel Ace - RO-RO / 2022-04-18 - 2022-08-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Catherine - RO-RO / 2021-10-29 - 2021-12-30 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Catherine - RO-RO / 2021-04-30 - 2021-08-02 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Elbstrom - Container Ship / 2023-10-06 - 2024-02-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Elbstrom - Container Ship / 2023-02-12 - 2023-05-23 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Elbstrom - Container Ship / 2022-09-26 - 2023-02-11 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Einstein - Container Ship / 2021-09-19 - 2022-01-27 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Containerships Nord - Container Ship / 2020-09-13 - 2021-03-22 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Omskiy-34 - General cargo / 2023-09-18 - 2024-02-16 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Pola Filofeia - General cargo / 2023-05-11 - 2023-07-21 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Cometa - Crew boat / 2022-05-12 - 2022-12-11 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Omskiy -136 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-29 - 2022-01-25 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Omskiy -128 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-18 - 2021-05-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SHANTAR - Container Ship / 2023-03-07 - 2023-10-02 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Anastasia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-06-25 - 2018-11-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Amur - Dry Cargo / 2017-06-02 - 2018-01-16 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Kristella - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-07-27 - 2016-11-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Hunteborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-12-02 - 2016-03-14 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Transbay - General cargo / 2022-11-12 - 2023-09-30 (11 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Transocean - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-18 - 2022-08-20 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Transocean - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-07 - 2021-08-25 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Transpacific - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-29 - 2020-08-23 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ocean Brother - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-22 - 2019-11-08 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Anna Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-06 - 2023-08-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: HELGA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-01 - 2022-09-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: ORANGE LINK - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-04 - 2021-10-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ORANGE LINK - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-13 - 2021-03-08 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ORANGE DREAM - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-02 - 2020-01-26 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Devon - LPG / LNG / 2023-02-22 - 2023-06-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Gaz United - LPG / LNG / 2022-08-26 - 2022-12-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Gaz Liberty - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-19 - 2022-06-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Gaz Nemesis - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-25 - 2021-09-28 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Reggane - LPG / LNG / 2020-07-29 - 2020-10-26 (3 месяца)
Master: Palau - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-11 - 2024-02-19 (8 дней)
Master: Papua - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-15 - 2024-01-27 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Clara - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-28 - 2023-06-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Else - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-05 - 2022-07-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Captain J. Papadakis - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-12 - 2021-06-07 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Wawasan Bluefin - Chemical tanker / 2022-12-17 - 2023-05-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Giulia Ievoli - Chemical tanker / 2022-04-27 - 2022-07-18 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: NCC Nasma - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-01 - 2021-12-15 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Silver Houston - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-12 - 2020-12-28 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Stena Impeccable - Chemical tanker / 2019-12-19 - 2020-03-23 (3 месяца)
Master: CHRYSSA K - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-07 - 2023-11-07 (4 месяца)
Master: EPTALOFOS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-19 - 2023-07-06 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: EPTALOFOS - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-06 - 2023-05-18 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: CAPTAIN J.PAPADAKIS - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-15 - 2023-02-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: MARIA MARIA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-13 - 2022-05-25 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: POLA FILOFEIA - General cargo / 2022-11-02 - 2023-05-11 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: POLA ANASTASIA - General cargo / 2021-12-15 - 2022-05-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: POLA AGATA - General cargo / 2021-03-03 - 2021-08-20 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: POLA HARITA - General cargo / 2019-10-15 - 2020-03-05 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: TURKESTAN - General cargo / 2017-08-10 - 2017-09-30 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: OWL 2 - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-23 - 2023-03-23 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: OWL 2 - Chemical tanker / 2021-12-02 - 2022-06-04 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Vacamonte - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-06-20 - 2021-10-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vemaharmony - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-01-02 - 2020-09-10 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Bluefin - Chemical tanker / 2019-04-05 - 2019-07-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: VOS Apollo - AHTS / 2023-01-06 - 2023-03-16 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: VOS Principle - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-09-01 - 2022-11-14 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Oyeli Star - AHTS / 2022-02-18 - 2022-06-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Oyeli Star - AHTS / 2021-08-30 - 2021-11-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Oyeli Star - AHTS / 2021-04-04 - 2021-06-16 (2 месяца)
Master: stolt sycamore - Chemical tanker / 2023-09-20 - 2023-12-19 (3 месяца)
Master: stolt sycamore - Chemical tanker / 2023-04-17 - 2023-07-14 (3 месяца)
Master: stolt pondo - Chemical tanker / 2022-09-23 - 2023-01-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: stolt pondo - Chemical tanker / 2022-02-03 - 2022-05-31 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: stolt island - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-01 - 2021-10-14 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Prostar - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-26 - 2022-04-16 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ocean Jupiter - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-22 - 2021-09-27 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Chrysanthemum - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-16 - 2020-12-17 (6 месяцев)
Master: CSCL LIMA - Container Ship / 2022-10-23 - 2023-03-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Cosco Harmony - Container Ship / 2021-08-14 - 2022-03-15 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: YM Witness - Container Ship / 2020-09-13 - 2021-03-26 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: YM Wreath - Container Ship / 2019-12-26 - 2020-06-06 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: YM Width - Container Ship / 2019-04-05 - 2019-08-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cemi - General cargo / 2021-10-17 - 2022-02-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Adele - General cargo / 2020-11-26 - 2021-03-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Heidi - General cargo / 2020-02-25 - 2020-06-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Vestland - General cargo / 2019-07-25 - 2020-02-06 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Kjervaagsund - General cargo / 2018-08-28 - 2019-03-03 (6 месяцев)
Master: Glomar Worker - ROV Support vessel / 2021-07-14 - 2021-09-20 (2 месяца)
Master: Glomar Worker - ROV Support vessel / 2021-03-05 - 2021-05-17 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Glomar Wave - ROV Support vessel / 2020-11-20 - 2020-12-28 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Glomar Wave - ROV Support vessel / 2020-06-05 - 2020-09-04 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Glomar Wave - ROV Support vessel / 2019-11-23 - 2020-02-05 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: GLADIATOR - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-20 - 2021-06-21 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Pythagoras - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-01 - 2021-01-10 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Stamatis - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-02 - 2020-02-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Pythagoras - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-15 - 2019-08-01 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sunshine - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-13 - 2018-11-25 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sunshine - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-25 - 2018-03-03 (7 месяцев)