Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Master: Sv. Apostol Andrey - General cargo / 2022-04-16 - 2022-08-25 (4 месяца)
Master: Sv. Apostol Andrey - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-10 - 2021-12-03 (5 месяцев)
Master: Sv. Apostol Andrey - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-11 - 2021-02-23 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ionian Star - Chemical tanker / 2019-05-21 - 2019-08-16 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Pyxis Epsilon - Chemical tanker / 2018-03-18 - 2018-05-02 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: STAR EUROPE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-23 - 2019-02-04 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: STAR LADY - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-20 - 2018-03-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Desert Oak - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-21 - 2018-11-03 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Valley Oak - Chemical tanker / 2018-01-14 - 2018-05-25 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Valley Oak - Chemical tanker / 2017-04-16 - 2017-09-17 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Mountain Oak - Chemical tanker / 2016-07-14 - 2016-11-17 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Mountain Oak - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-05 - 2016-03-23 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mechanic Alekseev - Tug boat / 2018-04-04 - 2018-06-05 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Anapa - Tug boat / 2017-08-04 - 2017-11-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Tak-9 - Tug boat / 2017-04-01 - 2017-07-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aliot - Tug boat / 2015-09-09 - 2016-09-14 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Tores - Tug boat / 2015-06-18 - 2015-09-06 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Skagern - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-08-09 - 2017-11-13 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Rachel - General cargo / 2017-02-09 - 2017-04-26 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Lecko - General cargo / 2016-06-07 - 2016-08-29 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Clara K - General cargo / 2015-10-20 - 2016-02-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Clara K - General cargo / 2015-02-11 - 2015-06-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: LEYLA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-12-13 - 2017-06-01 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Blue Tune - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-04-27 - 2016-10-13 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Blue Carmel - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-07-02 - 2015-12-21 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BBC Iceland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-06-16 - 2014-11-18 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Team Spirit - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-11-30 - 2014-03-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SOPHIA - Container Ship / 2016-11-23 - 2017-03-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: JONNI RITSCHER - Container Ship / 2015-11-19 - 2016-04-04 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: DOLPHIN STRAIT - Container Ship / 2015-03-04 - 2015-07-24 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CONTI HARMONY - Container Ship / 2011-04-22 - 2014-07-16 (3 года)
Chief Officer: KIL-31 - Other vessels / 2019-09-26 - 2024-09-25 (4 года)
1st Officer: AAVA VG - General cargo / 2024-05-28 - 2024-07-22 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2023-09-11 - 2024-01-17 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2022-12-26 - 2023-05-18 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2022-04-10 - 2022-08-30 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: TRANSMAR - General cargo / 2021-07-11 - 2021-11-19 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: GTM Denmark - Chemical tanker / 2024-03-29 - 2024-06-30 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Chemical tanker / 2023-10-05 - 2023-12-19 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Chemical tanker / 2023-05-06 - 2023-08-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Chemical tanker / 2022-12-04 - 2023-02-20 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aster Alvar - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-21 - 2022-09-19 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Temiro - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-09-19 - 2024-02-16 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Sunny Isles - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-03 - 2023-02-21 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Sunny Isles - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-16 - 2022-03-20 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ripley Pioneer - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-11 - 2024-02-09 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Alpha Discovery - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-08 - 2023-07-20 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: LMZ BIANCA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-28 - 2023-03-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mystras - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-30 - 2022-04-14 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kedros - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-26 - 2021-04-27 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Emstal - General cargo / 2023-08-27 - 2024-01-14 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Emstal - General cargo / 2022-11-01 - 2023-04-30 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: RMS Twisteden - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-22 - 2022-06-09 (10 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Wilson Odra - Dry Cargo / 2019-10-10 - 2021-04-07 (1 год)
Chief Officer: MARGUERITA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-30 - 2024-01-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: HARVESTER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-02-24 - 2023-04-21 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: HARVESTER - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-13 - 2022-10-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Four Turandot - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-15 - 2022-02-27 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: HARVESTER - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-10 - 2021-03-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nikolay Kuznetsov - Dry Cargo / 2023-07-10 - 2024-01-05 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Volgo-Balt 235 - General cargo / 2020-12-29 - 2021-05-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Nikolay Kuznetsov - General cargo / 2020-07-06 - 2020-11-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: DANUBE RIVER - LPG / LNG / 2023-08-04 - 2023-12-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: CHESHIRE - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-08 - 2022-05-04 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Hampshire - LPG / LNG / 2020-07-18 - 2021-05-07 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cheshire - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-20 - 2019-10-15 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: CHESHIRE - LPG / LNG / 2019-06-20 - 2019-07-20 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: NIPAYIA - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-07-09 - 2023-11-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ariadne - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-25 - 2022-11-24 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Afrodite - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-11 - 2022-01-06 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Sunny Isles - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-27 - 2021-02-07 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Pyxis Epsilon - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-15 - 2019-12-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Situla - Survey vessel / 2023-07-21 - 2023-11-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Stefany - General cargo / 2022-02-15 - 2022-08-28 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Swissco Garnet - AHT / 2020-02-26 - 2020-11-26 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Med Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2019-03-19 - 2019-09-17 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Med Surveyor - Survey vessel / 2018-08-04 - 2019-02-08 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: VOLKHOV - Reefer / 2023-02-23 - 2023-05-22 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: VOLKHOV - Reefer / 2022-11-15 - 2023-02-22 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Zaliv Prostor - Reefer / 2019-12-13 - 2020-06-27 (6 месяцев)
Junior officer: Yara Freya - LPG / LNG / 2019-09-17 - 2019-10-15 (1 месяц)
3rd Officer: Korsakov - Reefer / 2019-01-12 - 2019-05-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: KRISTIN - General cargo / 2022-06-09 - 2022-10-06 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: CARLOW - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-07 - 2022-02-15 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: KAIE - Dry Cargo / 2020-12-08 - 2021-03-09 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: KAIE - Dry Cargo / 2020-01-22 - 2020-06-28 (5 месяцев)