Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: Industrial Ama - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-04-27 - 2023-08-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Alanis - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-05-29 - 2022-09-27 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Imke - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-02 - 2022-01-17 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Eemslift Nelli - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-11-29 - 2021-02-26 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Warnow Mars - General cargo / 2019-12-15 - 2020-07-02 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Apollo - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-14 - 2023-07-31 (12 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Race - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-27 - 2021-11-05 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Kennedy - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-16 - 2020-08-15 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Kasos - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-08 - 2019-09-24 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Kennedy - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-03 - 2019-01-28 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Oceanic Leader - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-23 - 2023-06-12 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sicilian Express - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-14 - 2022-05-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Athinoula - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-16 - 2021-07-26 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Athinoula - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-02 - 2020-09-04 (1 год)
2nd Officer: Marylaki - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-28 - 2019-06-19 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Gazibey - General cargo / 2022-07-27 - 2023-04-27 (9 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Stella GS - General cargo / 2017-08-04 - 2018-02-01 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Argyroula - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-24 - 2016-10-23 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Apellis - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-11 - 2015-05-22 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: Antaeus - Bulk Carrier / 2013-10-06 - 2014-07-04 (9 месяцев)
Master: CMA CGM Ambarli - Container Ship / 2023-11-01 - 2024-04-11 (5 месяцев)
Master: CMA CGM Ambarli - Container Ship / 2023-03-09 - 2023-06-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM Ambarli - Container Ship / 2023-02-11 - 2023-03-08 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM Ambarli - Container Ship / 2022-08-21 - 2022-12-13 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Wide Bravo - Container Ship / 2022-02-24 - 2022-06-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: POLA DUDINKA - General cargo / 2022-05-09 - 2022-09-19 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: KOHL I - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-28 - 2022-01-07 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: KOHL I - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-24 - 2021-01-06 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ZOLOTO KOLYMY - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-03 - 2019-02-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: FESCO Posyet - General cargo / 2017-04-23 - 2017-09-20 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Korsakov - Bunkering Vessel / 2022-02-28 - 2022-07-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Korsakov - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-12-04 - 2022-01-25 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mt Korsakov - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-10-12 - 2021-11-15 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Ns Clipper - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-11 - 2020-11-18 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Ns Clipper - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-11 - 2020-04-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: G Dancer - LPG / LNG / 2022-04-29 - 2022-07-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: G Dancer - LPG / LNG / 2021-08-12 - 2021-12-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SEAGAS GOVERNOR - LPG / LNG / 2020-11-17 - 2021-04-10 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SEAGAS GOVERNOR - LPG / LNG / 2020-01-12 - 2020-07-28 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SEAGAS GOVERNOR - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-08 - 2019-10-05 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Elbspirit - Container Ship / 2021-11-21 - 2022-06-05 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Stamatis B - Container Ship / 2021-01-19 - 2021-06-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: La Tour - Container Ship / 2020-06-12 - 2020-11-03 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: CMA CGM La Tour - Container Ship / 2019-09-14 - 2020-01-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ida Rambow - Container Ship / 2022-01-18 - 2022-05-31 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ida Rambow - Container Ship / 2021-05-13 - 2021-09-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ida rambow - Container Ship / 2020-07-07 - 2020-12-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ida rambow - Container Ship / 2019-09-27 - 2020-01-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Ida rambow - Container Ship / 2018-12-10 - 2019-06-11 (6 месяцев)
Master: STAR BRIGHT - Bulk Carrier / 2023-04-24 - 2023-09-12 (5 месяцев)
Master: STAR BRIGHT - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-19 - 2022-12-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: TR LADY - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-31 - 2022-05-24 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: STAR SKY - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-18 - 2021-05-12 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: STAR SKY - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-08 - 2020-08-01 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Arctic Flounder - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-19 - 2022-04-10 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: River Shiner - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-19 - 2021-03-29 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: River Shiner - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-05-05 - 2019-11-12 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: RS Tara - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-17 - 2018-12-19 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Pike - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-04-29 - 2017-11-09 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Svitzer Busse - Tug boat / 2018-01-02 - 2022-03-23 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Svitzer Busse - Tug boat / 2013-08-06 - 2018-01-01 (4 года)
Chief Officer: Pola Monaco - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-06 - 2022-03-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Pola Anisia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-24 - 2021-08-19 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Pola Anisia - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-15 - 2021-03-29 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Taurus - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-10 - 2020-04-08 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Prince 4 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-18 - 2019-05-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: DABA - VLCC / 2021-07-10 - 2022-01-09 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Red Nova - VLCC / 2020-11-16 - 2021-03-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Red Nova - VLCC / 2019-12-08 - 2020-07-14 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Brightoil Grace - VLCC / 2018-09-19 - 2019-03-29 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Brightoil Gravity - VLCC / 2018-02-15 - 2018-06-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Berge Kenya - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-21 - 2021-12-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Berge Cho Oyu - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-17 - 2021-02-05 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Berge NEBLINA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-28 - 2020-03-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Berge Kosciuszko - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-11 - 2019-07-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Berge Kosciuszko - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-13 - 2018-10-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Atomos Venus - LPG / LNG / 2021-05-23 - 2021-11-09 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Atomos Venus - LPG / LNG / 2019-11-26 - 2020-10-03 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BW CONFIDENCE - LPG / LNG / 2018-12-26 - 2019-06-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BW VAR - LPG / LNG / 2018-04-09 - 2018-08-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: BW LOYALITY - LPG / LNG / 2017-12-09 - 2018-01-15 (1 месяц)
Master: Arch. Sealtiel - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-06 - 2024-07-31 (5 месяцев)
Master: St. Andrew - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-26 - 2023-11-25 (6 месяцев)
Master: Mykonos Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-16 - 2021-11-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mykonos Bay - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-04 - 2021-06-15 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Genco Picardy - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-01 - 2015-08-24 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: LUCHOW - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-04 - 2021-02-03 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ZINA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-25 - 2020-05-25 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ZINA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-24 - 2019-06-25 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nordic Harbin - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-04 - 2018-11-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nordic Harbin - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-06 - 2018-03-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Viking Emerald - RO-RO / 2020-02-18 - 2020-07-04 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Viking Emerald - RO-RO / 2019-07-17 - 2019-10-14 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Viking Emerald - RO-RO / 2018-11-21 - 2019-04-06 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Viking Emerald - RO-RO / 2018-04-12 - 2018-07-13 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Viking Emerald - RO-RO / 2017-09-16 - 2018-01-03 (4 месяца)