Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: GMB Artemis - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-07-28 - 2018-12-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Varvara - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-09 - 2018-01-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Erato - Container Ship / 2016-11-26 - 2017-05-23 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: TG Athena - Container Ship / 2016-03-15 - 2016-08-26 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Frisian Ino - General cargo / 2018-10-01 - 2018-12-02 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: SPANACO RELIABILITY - General cargo / 2018-05-13 - 2018-07-18 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: TIMBUS - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-10-22 - 2018-01-04 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: ROME / PIONEER - General cargo / 2017-05-14 - 2017-07-28 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: ABIS Cardiff - General cargo / 2016-05-26 - 2016-08-13 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: M.V. CALA PIANA - Container Ship / 2017-10-04 - 2018-03-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.V CALA PORTESE - Container Ship / 2016-12-02 - 2017-05-31 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.V. CALA PICCOLA - Container Ship / 2016-02-24 - 2016-08-24 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.V CALA PIANA - Container Ship / 2015-05-22 - 2015-12-02 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M.V.CALA PICCOLA - Container Ship / 2014-10-25 - 2015-03-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Arianna - General cargo / 2017-03-25 - 2017-09-22 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Falster - Container Ship / 2014-11-14 - 2015-05-22 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: King Julius - Container Ship / 2014-01-07 - 2014-07-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Don - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-03-22 - 2013-09-03 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Cape Mondego - Container Ship / 2012-08-10 - 2012-12-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SAINT NEKTARIS - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-25 - 2016-12-22 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SAINT GEORGE - General cargo / 2015-11-29 - 2016-05-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SABINA - General cargo / 2015-03-08 - 2015-07-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: THORCO CLOUD - Heavy lift vessel / 2014-06-06 - 2014-08-21 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: LAGANBORG - General cargo / 2013-09-01 - 2014-01-11 (4 месяца)
AB Seaman: SIBIRSKIY-2119 - General cargo / 2021-11-26 - 2022-02-09 (2 месяца)
AB Seaman: Fourty two - Yacht / 2021-07-24 - 2021-10-26 (3 месяца)
AB Seaman: Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2018-04-01 - 2020-02-01 (1 год)
AB Seaman: Виктор Субботин - Other vessels / 2017-10-01 - 2018-03-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Апостол Андрей - Yacht / 2015-03-12 - 2016-12-14 (1 год)
2nd Officer: Umba - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-03-10 - 2016-05-07 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: RN Murmansk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-11-01 - 2015-12-01 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Enisey - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-03-08 - 2015-08-07 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Enisey - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-03-08 - 2015-08-06 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Enisey - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-07-25 - 2014-11-15 (4 месяца)
Master: Bes Savvy - AHTS / 2017-07-19 - 2017-11-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Jascon 12 - AHTS / 2015-09-06 - 2015-11-12 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Jascon 11 - AHTS / 2015-05-30 - 2015-07-31 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Jascon 66 - AHTS / 2015-05-02 - 2015-05-29 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Jascon 11 - AHTS / 2014-12-22 - 2015-04-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Laganborg - General cargo / 2024-07-11 - 2024-10-11 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ohioborg - General cargo / 2023-07-14 - 2024-04-30 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ohioborg - General cargo / 2022-11-04 - 2023-05-01 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Lady Anna - General cargo / 2021-12-16 - 2022-02-01 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sylvia - General cargo / 2021-04-04 - 2021-08-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Amilyn - Bulk Carrier / 2024-06-29 - 2024-09-25 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Amilyn - Bulk Carrier / 2024-05-08 - 2024-06-28 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Federal Sable - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-01 - 2023-11-18 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Federal Skeena - Bulk Carrier / 2022-11-22 - 2023-03-13 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Federal Skeena - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-19 - 2022-07-16 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Istra Ace - RO-RO / 2024-04-25 - 2024-09-10 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: RCC Tianjin - RO-RO / 2023-05-14 - 2023-09-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Crystal Ray - RO-RO / 2022-09-15 - 2023-02-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Garnet Leader - RO-RO / 2021-08-05 - 2021-12-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: RCC Europe - RO-RO / 2020-12-08 - 2021-05-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Seaways 10 - AHT / 2024-05-05 - 2024-09-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Sea Latch - AHTS / 2023-10-23 - 2023-11-22 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Odissey - Tug boat / 2023-06-09 - 2023-09-09 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: EEMS WARRIOR - AHTS / 2022-08-18 - 2022-10-27 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Socotra Dream - Passenger vessel / 2021-05-16 - 2021-06-17 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Aila - Container Ship / 2024-07-24 - 2024-09-04 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Linda - Container Ship / 2024-05-17 - 2024-06-28 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Arkadia - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-25 - 2024-05-13 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Arkadia - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-04 - 2023-11-19 (3 месяца)
Master: George - Construction vessel / 2023-05-15 - 2023-07-27 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: BOS Rincess - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-05-09 - 2024-08-09 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: BOS Rincess - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-11-10 - 2024-03-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: VOS Princess - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-05-25 - 2023-09-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: VOS Princess - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-01-25 - 2023-03-25 (2 месяца)
Senior DPO: VOS Principle - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-08-06 - 2022-11-18 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Belgravia V - LPG / LNG / 2024-04-12 - 2024-07-30 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Pazifik - LPG / LNG / 2020-12-29 - 2021-04-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Yara Sela - LPG / LNG / 2020-02-08 - 2020-08-03 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Polar - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-09 - 2019-05-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Yara Aesa - LPG / LNG / 2018-03-15 - 2018-08-22 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-12-15 - 2024-07-28 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2023-01-31 - 2023-08-20 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-02-20 - 2022-09-22 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 2 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-07-16 - 2021-11-28 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Oslo Bulk 9 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-10-25 - 2021-03-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: EVONA - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-22 - 2024-07-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Elati - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-18 - 2023-06-27 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Navios Fantastiks - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-18 - 2021-08-15 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Navios Fantastiks - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-19 - 2020-07-11 (9 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Navios Antares - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-16 - 2019-04-10 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BGP Dragon - Seismic vessel / 2024-04-17 - 2024-07-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Tonjer - Construction vessel / 2024-02-02 - 2024-03-15 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Tonjer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2023-12-01 - 2024-01-05 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Atlantic Tonjer - DSV (Diving Support) / 2023-07-29 - 2023-11-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: VOS Patience - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-06-01 - 2023-06-29 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: M/T Hafnia Pacific - Chemical tanker / 2024-04-06 - 2024-07-07 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: M/T BW Merlin - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-10-26 - 2024-02-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: M/T Chem Stream - Chemical tanker / 2023-03-19 - 2023-08-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M/T UACC MANAMA - Chemical tanker / 2022-02-07 - 2022-09-03 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: M/T Celsius Miami - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-16 - 2021-09-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: IONIC PATRIS - Bulk Carrier / 2024-01-30 - 2024-06-24 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: IONIC SMYRNI - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-10 - 2023-06-19 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: IONIC PRIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-03 - 2022-06-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: IONIC HAWK - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-10 - 2021-09-20 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SABRINA I - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-08 - 2020-07-30 (8 месяцев)