Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Officer: SBI Virgo - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-14 - 2020-11-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: SBI Gemini - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-11 - 2020-03-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SBI Gemini - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-25 - 2019-05-31 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SBI Gemini - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-28 - 2018-11-02 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: E Traveller - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-27 - 2017-10-31 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: EVROTAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-12 - 2020-11-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ASOPOS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-06-27 - 2019-10-28 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: VOIDOMATIS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-07 - 2019-02-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ASOPOS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-28 - 2018-04-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: EVROTAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-05 - 2017-10-18 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: FWN SOLIDE - General cargo / 2020-07-15 - 2020-11-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: FWN BONAFIDE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-09-07 - 2020-01-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Momentum Scan - General cargo / 2019-01-09 - 2019-05-06 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: FWN BONAFIDE - General cargo / 2017-11-29 - 2018-03-19 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: FWN SOLIDE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-10-28 - 2017-03-08 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Nordica - Container Ship / 2022-06-21 - 2022-08-16 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Baltic Hollyhock - Reefer / 2021-09-28 - 2022-02-12 (4 месяца)
Expedition Leader: Akademik Vavilov - Passenger vessel / 2021-06-18 - 2021-08-20 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Baltic Hollyhock - Reefer / 2020-12-08 - 2021-05-06 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: SVP-1 Vector 25 - Crew boat / 2020-06-05 - 2020-11-16 (5 месяцев)
Master: Vladimir Petrov - Other vessels / 2020-08-26 - 2020-11-15 (3 месяца)
Master: Vladimir Petrov - Other vessels / 2019-11-01 - 2020-06-30 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ekaterina - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-17 - 2019-07-30 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ekaterina - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-01 - 2018-08-03 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ekaterina - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-17 - 2017-09-04 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: OCEAN PEGASUS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-07 - 2020-11-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: HUA SAN - VLCC / 2019-11-20 - 2020-04-28 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: HUA SAN - VLCC / 2019-02-05 - 2019-08-22 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: HUA SAN - VLCC / 2018-06-21 - 2018-12-01 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: JIU HUA SAN - VLCC / 2017-07-03 - 2017-12-03 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BELUGA ROTTERDAM - AHT / 2020-07-09 - 2020-11-13 (4 месяца)
Master: RESPONSE - Tug boat / 2019-07-02 - 2020-03-07 (8 месяцев)
Master: Crystal east - Chemical tanker / 2018-05-31 - 2018-12-20 (7 месяцев)
Master: Evgeniy Khorov - Tug boat / 2017-03-18 - 2017-09-18 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Evgeniy Khorov - Tug boat / 2016-06-14 - 2016-12-14 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Onego Traveller - General cargo / 2020-07-13 - 2020-11-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ilse D - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-11-12 - 2020-02-22 (3 месяца)
Master: Ilse - General cargo / 2018-07-16 - 2019-01-23 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ilse - General cargo / 2017-12-13 - 2018-05-08 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Helene S - Container Ship / 2016-12-06 - 2017-03-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Aquataurus - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-03 - 2020-11-09 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: BTG Kailash - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-21 - 2019-12-11 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Magda - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-21 - 2019-04-11 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: St. Andrew - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-27 - 2018-11-16 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: St. George - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-15 - 2018-08-06 (5 месяцев)
Master: SL Labuan/DPII/ASD - MRSV / 2021-12-23 - 2022-04-29 (4 месяца)
Master: SL Labuan - MRSV / 2021-03-22 - 2021-08-16 (5 месяцев)
Master: SL Labuan - MRSV / 2020-11-10 - 2020-11-23 (13 дней)
Chief Officer: SL Labuan - MRSV / 2020-08-24 - 2020-11-09 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: SL Labuan - MRSV / 2020-05-13 - 2020-06-27 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: ANHONA - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-09 - 2020-11-08 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: ANHONA - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-29 - 2019-12-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: MTM YANGON - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-13 - 2019-04-05 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: New Dawn - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-02-15 - 2018-06-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: NEW DAWN - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-08-19 - 2017-11-10 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Idel 1 - General cargo / 2020-08-02 - 2020-11-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Modulus 3 - General cargo / 2019-07-10 - 2019-12-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ugah Discovery - General cargo / 2019-02-28 - 2019-05-03 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Siberin 4 - General cargo / 2018-08-16 - 2018-12-04 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Planeo - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-11-05 - 2018-03-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Senanur Çebi - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-23 - 2020-11-04 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Minanur cebi 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-13 - 2019-09-28 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Minanur cebi - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-14 - 2018-10-05 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Saadet c - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-02 - 2017-12-12 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Saadet c - Bulk Carrier / 2016-08-01 - 2017-05-20 (10 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Voge Trust - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-25 - 2020-11-03 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Atlantica Bridge - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-04 - 2020-02-03 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Stena Important - Chemical tanker / 2018-09-02 - 2019-01-27 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Stena Concert - Chemical tanker / 2017-11-11 - 2018-03-15 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Junin - VLCC / 2017-01-31 - 2017-06-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Winposh Rampart - AHTS / 2020-07-14 - 2020-11-02 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Winposh Rampart - AHTS / 2019-09-16 - 2020-02-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Halul 100 - Standby-safety vessel / 2018-11-10 - 2019-02-03 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Halul 100 - Standby-safety vessel / 2018-04-25 - 2018-08-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: JHW Sapphire - AHTS / 2017-07-11 - 2017-09-06 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Волго-Дон 5079 - General cargo / 2020-08-29 - 2020-11-02 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Сормово 3 - Dry Cargo / 2020-06-18 - 2020-08-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: VODLA2 - General cargo / 2019-12-08 - 2020-06-10 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: GRAND - Dry Cargo / 2019-05-22 - 2019-11-20 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Omskiy 135 - Dry Cargo / 2019-02-25 - 2019-04-22 (2 месяца)
Master: Achilleas S - Bulk Carrier / 2024-03-27 - 2024-07-06 (3 месяца)
Master: Belmonte - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-29 - 2023-03-13 (5 месяцев)
Master: Florentine Oetker - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-29 - 2021-11-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Berlin - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-17 - 2020-11-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ultra Letizia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-25 - 2020-03-01 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Wilson Dordrecht - General cargo / 2022-07-10 - 2022-11-05 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Wilson Hansa - General cargo / 2022-03-02 - 2022-05-03 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Wilson Hansa - General cargo / 2021-10-02 - 2022-03-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Positive-4 - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-09-07 - 2020-11-01 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: Vectis isle - General cargo / 2020-04-27 - 2020-08-22 (4 месяца)
Master: Tolbukhin - Tug boat / 2020-09-21 - 2020-11-01 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Tolbukhin - Tug boat / 2020-05-29 - 2020-09-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nereis - Barge / 2018-07-25 - 2018-11-09 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Baltic Pride - Reefer / 2017-11-04 - 2018-01-10 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Baltic Summer - Reefer / 2017-07-20 - 2017-10-22 (3 месяца)
Master: VIVIANA - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-11-02 - 2020-12-05 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: VIVIANA - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-06 - 2020-11-01 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Port State Control Inspector - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-08-17 - 2017-01-01 (4 года)
Pilot: Pilot - Other vessels / 2010-06-04 - 2011-04-01 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ocean Allenmar - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-07-12 - 2009-11-10 (4 месяца)