Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
2nd Officer: Valentin Butuzov - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-06 - 2022-05-25 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Four Nabucco - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-12 - 2021-03-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Pacific Busan - Container Ship / 2019-07-02 - 2019-10-27 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Pacific Geneva - Container Ship / 2018-04-21 - 2018-10-18 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Max Centaur - Container Ship / 2017-01-17 - 2017-08-04 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Mikhail Nenashev - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-28 - 2022-05-25 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: KADRI - General cargo / 2021-04-01 - 2021-08-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Kadri - General cargo / 2020-10-18 - 2020-12-30 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Kaisa - General cargo / 2020-08-15 - 2020-10-09 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Ketlin - General cargo / 2020-02-18 - 2020-05-07 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Chemtrans Adriatic - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-01-23 - 2022-05-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Chemtrans Adriatic - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-03 - 2021-09-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Chemtrans Adriatic - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-31 - 2021-05-02 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Chemtrans Cancale - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-11-25 - 2020-07-04 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: STAMOS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-06-23 - 2019-02-09 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Wolf - General cargo / 2022-05-12 - 2022-05-22 (10 дней)
Chief Officer: Fox - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-27 - 2021-10-09 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fox - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-04 - 2020-12-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fox - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-05 - 2020-01-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fox - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-31 - 2018-07-18 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Dijksgracht - General cargo / 2021-12-17 - 2022-05-20 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Humbergracht - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-03-15 - 2021-08-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Fortunagracht - General cargo / 2020-08-28 - 2020-12-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Fortunagracht - General cargo / 2020-01-09 - 2020-05-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Florijngracht - General cargo / 2019-06-10 - 2019-10-01 (4 месяца)
Master: Olivia - Container Ship / 2023-10-15 - 2024-02-15 (4 месяца)
Master: Olivia - Container Ship / 2022-10-21 - 2023-03-21 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Olivia - Container Ship / 2022-01-20 - 2022-05-20 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Orion - Container Ship / 2020-12-13 - 2021-03-17 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Samskip Blaffel - Container Ship / 2019-12-09 - 2020-06-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: AOS Vision - ROV Support vessel / 2021-12-18 - 2022-05-19 (5 месяцев)
Master: Valentine 3 - AHTS / 2020-02-04 - 2020-07-16 (5 месяцев)
Master: Valentine 1 - AHTS / 2019-12-28 - 2020-02-03 (1 месяц)
Master: Mutawa 104 - AHT / 2018-11-30 - 2019-03-31 (4 месяца)
Master: Mutawa 303 - AHTS / 2018-06-06 - 2018-10-11 (4 месяца)
Master: Aquavita Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2024-01-17 - 2024-05-30 (4 месяца)
Master: Elong Elong - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-10 - 2023-09-08 (4 месяца)
Master: Mbeya - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-10 - 2023-03-03 (5 месяцев)
Master: SSI PRIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-09 - 2022-09-09 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: SSI MAGNIFICENT - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-18 - 2022-05-18 (10 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Contship key - Container Ship / 2021-09-30 - 2022-05-17 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Contship key - Container Ship / 2020-12-17 - 2021-05-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sonderborg - Container Ship / 2020-03-14 - 2020-08-01 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sonderborg - Container Ship / 2019-06-23 - 2019-11-12 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Sonderborg - Container Ship / 2018-10-14 - 2019-02-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2022-03-01 - 2022-05-16 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2021-08-21 - 2021-12-03 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2021-02-18 - 2021-05-18 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2020-06-15 - 2020-09-11 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Bourbon Liberty 319 - AHTS / 2019-11-26 - 2020-02-24 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nabil - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-02-21 - 2022-05-16 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Arcticaborg - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-12-02 - 2020-03-10 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Beringov Proliv - MRSV / 2019-06-07 - 2019-09-14 (3 месяца)
3rd Officer: Beringov Proliv - MRSV / 2019-04-05 - 2019-06-06 (2 месяца)
3rd Officer: Beringov Proliv - MRSV / 2018-08-14 - 2018-12-11 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: VOLGO-BALT 240 - General cargo / 2022-07-17 - 2022-11-24 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: DONMASTER SPIRIT - General cargo / 2022-04-04 - 2022-05-15 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: DONMASTER SPIRIT - General cargo / 2021-06-18 - 2021-11-26 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: KAPITAN VORONKOV - General cargo / 2021-03-30 - 2021-04-25 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: DONMASTER LIDER - General cargo / 2020-10-21 - 2021-02-26 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Dragomyr - Other vessels / 2021-02-15 - 2022-05-14 (1 год)
Chief Officer: Dragomyr - Other vessels / 2020-02-15 - 2020-08-15 (6 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Dragomyr - Other vessels / 2019-07-08 - 2019-12-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Vera Rose - General cargo / 2018-08-14 - 2018-12-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Mekhanik Cherevko - General cargo / 2017-04-25 - 2017-09-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BONANZA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-18 - 2022-05-13 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Emmakris II - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-21 - 2021-07-08 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Emmakris I - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-31 - 2020-11-17 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: EMMAKRIS II - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-25 - 2020-02-03 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: EMMAKRIS II - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-25 - 2019-02-13 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Navigator Gemini - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-24 - 2022-05-10 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Navigator Gemini - LPG / LNG / 2020-12-23 - 2021-07-17 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: B Gas Master - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-07 - 2020-10-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Navigator Gemini - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-10 - 2019-12-30 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Navigator Capricorn - LPG / LNG / 2018-10-10 - 2019-03-02 (5 месяцев)
Master: Zamil 64 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2023-03-14 - 2023-06-08 (3 месяца)
Master: Zamil 64 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2022-07-07 - 2022-09-08 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Zamil 64 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2022-03-10 - 2022-05-10 (2 месяца)
Master: CCC Maritime 1 - Construction vessel / 2021-11-28 - 2022-03-10 (3 месяца)
Master: CCC Maritime 1 - Construction vessel / 2021-11-28 - 2022-02-10 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: X-Press Anglesey - Container Ship / 2021-12-14 - 2022-05-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Atalntic Solli - Container Ship / 2021-04-27 - 2021-09-09 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Nordic Wismar - Container Ship / 2020-07-12 - 2021-02-23 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Nordic Wismar - Container Ship / 2019-06-15 - 2019-11-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Constantin S - Container Ship / 2017-12-15 - 2018-04-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: TRADE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-16 - 2022-05-06 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: VIENNA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-27 - 2021-12-04 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: NORDIC DALIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-21 - 2021-03-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: NORDIC SEOUL - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-06 - 2020-07-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: NORDIC DALIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-20 - 2019-11-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Esperance - Container Ship / 2022-03-21 - 2022-05-05 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Energizer - Container Ship / 2021-06-26 - 2021-08-30 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Energizer - Container Ship / 2021-03-01 - 2021-04-13 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Energizer - Container Ship / 2020-12-03 - 2021-01-19 (2 месяца)
Chief Officer: Energizer - Container Ship / 2020-09-07 - 2020-10-19 (1 месяц)
Chief Officer: Beata - General cargo / 2021-12-29 - 2022-05-04 (4 месяца)
Chief Officer: Norman - General cargo / 2021-07-14 - 2021-10-15 (3 месяца)
Chief Officer: Triumph IV - General cargo / 2020-01-17 - 2020-08-03 (7 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Volga 4007 - General cargo / 2019-04-01 - 2019-09-05 (5 месяцев)
Chief Officer: BABYLON - General cargo / 2018-04-18 - 2018-10-20 (6 месяцев)