Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Engineer: Stolt Shearwater - Chemical tanker / 2022-03-05 - 2022-05-19 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Stolt Shearwater - Chemical tanker / 2021-10-15 - 2021-12-19 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Stolt Shearwater - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-12 - 2021-08-12 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Stolt Shearwater - Chemical tanker / 2021-02-16 - 2021-04-16 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Stolt Shearwater - Chemical tanker / 2020-10-01 - 2020-12-09 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Federal Delta - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-27 - 2022-05-17 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: RTM Flinders - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-26 - 2020-07-11 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: RTM Flinders - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-28 - 2019-08-17 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: RTM Dias - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-14 - 2018-05-24 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Saga Navigator - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-14 - 2017-07-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: OSAKA - Container Ship / 2021-12-06 - 2022-05-16 (5 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: OSAKA - Container Ship / 2021-04-03 - 2021-08-09 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: OSAKA - Container Ship / 2020-07-28 - 2020-11-26 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: OSAKA - Container Ship / 2019-09-05 - 2020-02-27 (6 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: OSAKA - Container Ship / 2019-01-24 - 2019-05-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Monjasa Chaser - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-12-10 - 2022-05-14 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Gazpromneft Zuid - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-04-05 - 2021-10-30 (7 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Amalia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-15 - 2020-12-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Alpine Aqualina - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-04-13 - 2019-08-12 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Alpine Aqualina - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-07-16 - 2018-11-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: STELLAR BALTIC - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-20 - 2022-05-12 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: STELLAR BALTIC - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-28 - 2021-04-03 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: GREENDALE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-27 - 2020-06-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: HENG TAI YANG - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-01 - 2019-08-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: HAZAR - Dry Cargo / 2018-05-24 - 2018-10-31 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Kalliopi L - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-26 - 2022-05-05 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Star Apus - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-19 - 2021-07-19 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Venture Pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-21 - 2020-07-20 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Eurus Venture - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-09 - 2019-10-21 (1 месяц)
Chief Engineer: Eurus Venture - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-12 - 2019-03-19 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Bourbon Liberty 212 - AHTS / 2022-01-24 - 2022-05-05 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Bourbon Liberty 212 - AHTS / 2021-09-06 - 2021-11-24 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Bourbon Liberty 212 - AHTS / 2021-04-25 - 2021-07-03 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Bourbon MALILA - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-10-10 - 2021-02-15 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Bourbon Liberty 216 - AHTS / 2020-06-17 - 2020-09-04 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Elandra Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-07 - 2022-05-04 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Elandra Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-14 - 2021-03-21 (8 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Elandra Eagle - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-30 - 2020-02-07 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Elandra Angel - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-27 - 2019-07-12 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Elandra Angel - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-09-20 - 2018-11-27 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: ERKUL S - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-12 - 2022-05-04 (3 месяца)
1st Engineer: JOANNA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-24 - 2021-03-10 (3 месяца)
1st Engineer: STARGATE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-22 - 2020-06-19 (8 месяцев)
1st Engineer: FEYHA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-23 - 2019-08-17 (3 месяца)
1st Engineer: ANASTASIA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-28 - 2018-07-26 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: FRIO FORWIN - Reefer / 2022-01-01 - 2022-04-29 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: FRIO NEREUS - Reefer / 2021-12-18 - 2021-12-31 (13 дней)
Chief Engineer: FRIO FORWIN - Reefer / 2021-11-25 - 2021-12-17 (1 месяц)
2nd Engineer: BELUGA REEFER - Reefer / 2021-04-02 - 2021-06-06 (2 месяца)
2nd Engineer: FRIO FORWIN - Reefer / 2020-11-22 - 2021-03-10 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Maersk Santana - Container Ship / 2021-10-26 - 2022-04-26 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Lisbon Express - Container Ship / 2020-09-18 - 2021-06-17 (9 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Seamax Bridgeport - Container Ship / 2019-11-08 - 2020-07-12 (8 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Four Butterfly - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-02 - 2019-06-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: OOCL KOBE - Container Ship / 2018-05-13 - 2018-09-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: MORAGA - Container Ship / 2021-06-15 - 2022-04-24 (10 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: BRIANNA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-29 - 2020-11-22 (9 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: AMADORE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-14 - 2020-02-24 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: ANNETTA - Dry Cargo / 2019-01-01 - 2019-08-09 (7 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: RODINA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-03 - 2018-10-31 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: ANFA - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-03 - 2022-04-21 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: MARVIN CONFIDENCE - Chemical tanker / 2021-01-28 - 2021-07-07 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: MARVIN FAITH - Chemical tanker / 2019-12-09 - 2020-08-30 (9 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: MARVIN STAR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-07 - 2019-09-04 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: GOLDEN SHINER - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-04-17 - 2018-09-28 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: NORRBOTTEN - General cargo / 2022-02-07 - 2022-04-20 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Sider Mompox - General cargo / 2021-05-16 - 2021-09-21 (4 месяца)
Single Engineer: Ice Star - General cargo / 2021-01-11 - 2021-03-01 (2 месяца)
Single Engineer: Ice Star - General cargo / 2020-08-01 - 2020-10-26 (3 месяца)
Single Engineer: Ice Star - General cargo / 2020-01-14 - 2020-05-18 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Vendome Street - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-31 - 2022-04-19 (9 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Tavistock Square - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-08 - 2021-01-29 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: NCC NAJD - Chemical tanker / 2019-05-20 - 2019-07-12 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: NCC NAJD - Chemical tanker / 2018-10-19 - 2019-01-23 (3 месяца)
Chief Engineer: NCC SAFA - Chemical tanker / 2017-10-22 - 2018-03-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Clearwater - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-10 - 2022-04-18 (10 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Lider Haluk - RO-RO / 2020-11-06 - 2021-04-09 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Alat - Tug boat / 2019-05-20 - 2020-08-12 (1 год)
2nd Engineer: Sara - General cargo / 2018-03-23 - 2019-03-16 (12 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Kangalassy - General cargo / 2017-08-03 - 2018-02-23 (7 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: WILHELMINE - Container Ship / 2021-11-02 - 2022-04-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: WILHELMINE - Container Ship / 2021-03-20 - 2021-07-23 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: STEEN - Container Ship / 2020-07-23 - 2020-11-22 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: WARNOW THROUT - Container Ship / 2019-08-28 - 2019-11-04 (2 месяца)
Chief Engineer: UNDARUM - Container Ship / 2018-12-07 - 2019-04-21 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: MSC ELOISE - Container Ship / 2021-10-30 - 2022-04-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: City of Hongkong - Container Ship / 2020-02-14 - 2020-07-29 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Mastery D - Container Ship / 2019-05-03 - 2019-09-01 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Onego ponza - General cargo / 2017-12-21 - 2018-04-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: CMA CGM L'ETOILE - Container Ship / 2016-11-11 - 2017-04-08 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Veles - Bunkering Vessel / 2021-12-15 - 2022-04-15 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Baltic eagle - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-07 - 2021-10-07 (4 месяца)
Single Engineer: Seskar - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-02 - 2021-02-10 (4 месяца)
Single Engineer: Seskar - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-16 - 2020-05-01 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Avatar - RO-RO / 2019-08-02 - 2019-12-14 (4 месяца)
Chief Engineer: Beket - Ata - General cargo / 2021-11-21 - 2022-04-15 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Анастасия - General cargo / 2019-02-05 - 2019-07-27 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Рыбинск - General cargo / 2018-01-04 - 2018-07-16 (6 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Аликбер Пашаев - Coaster / 2016-10-04 - 2017-03-16 (5 месяцев)
Chief Engineer: Kompozitor Gasanov09 - Ferry / 2015-06-03 - 2016-02-10 (8 месяцев)