Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Chief Cook: Maersk Connector - Cable laying vessel / 2017-07-22 - 2021-12-09 (4 года)
Chief Cook: Comet - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-22 - 2021-12-01 (7 месяцев)
Messman: AVRA MITERAS - Container Ship / 2020-06-19 - 2021-02-26 (8 месяцев)
Cook Assistant: Costa fortuna - Cruise Liner / 2020-10-24 - 2021-04-22 (6 месяцев)
Cook Assistant: Costa victoria - Cruise Liner / 2019-11-29 - 2020-04-05 (4 месяца)
Cook Assistant: Costa fortuna - Cruise Liner / 2018-12-10 - 2019-08-31 (9 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Victoria - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-22 - 2021-03-26 (7 месяцев)
Cook: Suzie-Q - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-16 - 2020-06-13 (7 месяцев)
Cook: GNV Azzurra - Passenger vessel / 2021-04-09 - 2021-08-16 (4 месяца)
Chief Cook: Norderoog - Container Ship / 2021-01-13 - 2021-03-04 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: MSC Agata - Container Ship / 2020-02-03 - 2020-11-24 (10 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Hohe Bank - General cargo / 2019-05-22 - 2019-12-10 (7 месяцев)
Stewardess: Bluefort - Accommodation barge / 2018-08-29 - 2018-10-27 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Scala - General cargo / 2018-08-19 - 2019-03-20 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Scala - General cargo / 2017-09-25 - 2018-05-20 (8 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Scala - General cargo / 2016-10-20 - 2017-06-26 (8 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Scala - General cargo / 2015-10-09 - 2016-05-27 (8 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Scala - General cargo / 2014-12-11 - 2016-05-25 (1 год)
Cook: MSC JEONGMIN - Container Ship / 2018-06-26 - 2019-01-15 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: SHEILA - Container / 2017-07-19 - 2018-03-22 (8 месяцев)
Cook: mv"SUZIE Q" - General cargo / 2014-03-27 - 2014-10-01 (6 месяцев)
Cook: mv"SUZIE Q" - General cargo / 2013-08-08 - 2013-12-17 (4 месяца)
Cook: mv"TASE" - General cargo / 2013-04-11 - 2013-07-03 (3 месяца)
2nd Cook: Independent - Fishing vessel / 2018-05-02 - 2018-10-03 (5 месяцев)
2nd Cook: Independent - Fishing vessel / 2017-05-03 - 2017-10-30 (6 месяцев)
2nd Cook: Independent - Fishing vessel / 2016-06-15 - 2016-10-31 (5 месяцев)
Chief Cook: TFM-1 - RO-RO / 2015-04-19 - 2015-11-07 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: VALKA - Fishing vessel / 2017-12-15 - 2018-07-18 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: VALKA - Fishing vessel / 2015-11-20 - 2016-09-17 (10 месяцев)
Chief Cook: FORTIS AMALTEA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-07 - 2018-04-06 (6 месяцев)
Chief Cook: CORVUS - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-07 - 2017-05-10 (5 месяцев)
Chief Cook: m.v.Tychy - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-12-09 - 2016-08-24 (8 месяцев)
Cook: m.t.Kamila - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-06-10 - 2013-11-28 (6 месяцев)
Cook: m/v Valpolichella - Bulk Carrier / 2012-06-15 - 2013-03-03 (9 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Birte Terezi - Bunkering Vessel / 2013-07-15 - 2017-12-22 (4 года)
Chief Cook: Birte Terezi - Chemical tanker / 2013-07-15 - 2017-12-22 (4 года)
Chief Cook: Birte Terezi - Bunkering Vessel / 2013-07-15 - 2017-12-22 (4 года)
AB-Cook: SARDIS - Fishing vessel / 2017-10-09 - 2017-12-07 (2 месяца)
AB-Cook: SARDIS - Fishing vessel / 2017-04-20 - 2017-09-09 (5 месяцев)
AB-Cook: SARDIS - Fishing vessel / 2016-09-05 - 2016-12-05 (3 месяца)
AB-Cook: DARINA - Reefer / 2016-04-11 - 2016-08-07 (4 месяца)
Chief Cook: Fehn companjon - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-02-02 - 2016-03-14 (1 месяц)
Chief Cook: Go phoenix - AHTS / 2014-12-31 - 2015-05-19 (5 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Go Phoenix - AHTS / 2014-08-29 - 2014-10-24 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Seasafe salvo - Accomodation barge / 2014-06-06 - 2014-07-18 (1 месяц)
Chief Cook: Go Altair - AHTS / 2014-04-14 - 2014-05-25 (1 месяц)
Chief Cook: Rem supplier - Platform Supply vessel / 2013-12-31 - 2014-03-14 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: North ocean 102 - Cable laying vessel / 2014-03-09 - 2014-04-23 (1 месяц)
Chief Cook: North ocean 102 - Cable laying vessel / 2013-01-01 - 2013-02-08 (1 месяц)
Cook: Agile - Pipe laying vessel / 2011-11-10 - 2011-12-04 (1 месяц)
Cook: Agile - Pipe laying vessel / 2011-06-14 - 2011-08-26 (2 месяца)
Cook: Bold Endurance - Pipe laying vessel / 2011-02-11 - 2011-04-02 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Ice Base - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-05-02 - 2013-09-27 (5 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Rapla - General cargo / 2012-09-10 - 2013-01-08 (4 месяца)
Chief Cook: Baltic Merchant - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-12-08 - 2012-07-03 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Tor Hafnia - Ferry / 2010-08-23 - 2010-09-23 (1 месяц)
Chief Cook: Tor Corona - Ferry / 2010-05-16 - 2010-07-18 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2012-11-05 - 2012-11-28 (1 месяц)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2012-06-29 - 2012-08-31 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2012-02-22 - 2012-04-22 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2011-10-17 - 2011-12-22 (2 месяца)
Chief Cook: Linda - General cargo / 2011-06-14 - 2011-08-10 (2 месяца)
Cook: Mystic Striker - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-29 - 2015-06-07 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Mystic Striker - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-20 - 2015-06-07 (8 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Gladiator - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-29 - 2015-06-07 (7 месяцев)
Cook: african oryx - Dry Cargo / 2010-05-29 - 2010-12-19 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Bourbon Evolution 804 - Construction vessel / 2022-06-03 - 2023-08-24 (1 год)
Chief Cook: Filiya Glory - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-29 - 2022-11-23 (8 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Ugale - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-05 - 2022-01-15 (6 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Sand Shiner - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-01-30 - 2020-12-01 (10 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Rs Aurora - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-02-01 - 2019-10-28 (9 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Spottaill - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-06-02 - 2018-11-11 (5 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Falcon Trident - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-31 - 2022-10-22 (9 месяцев)
Chief Cook: Falcon Confidence - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-13 - 2021-11-24 (7 месяцев)
Chief Cook: NORDIC HAMBURG - Container Ship / 2020-06-01 - 2021-02-02 (8 месяцев)