Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
4th Engineer: EIDER S - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-06 - 2017-12-08 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: SEA WISE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-06 - 2017-07-09 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: SEA WISE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-06 - 2017-07-09 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: SEA WISE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-06 - 2017-07-09 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Komkov - Tug boat / 2012-09-02 - 2013-04-25 (8 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Margaretha - General cargo / 2017-06-02 - 2017-10-03 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: MSC Nicol - Container Ship / 2016-06-18 - 2016-11-30 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: MSC Clementina - Container Ship / 2015-06-10 - 2016-01-30 (8 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Arnica - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-26 - 2014-09-19 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: Arkadia - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-01 - 2013-09-08 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: lefkoniko - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-31 - 2017-07-06 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Anogyra - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-18 - 2016-09-09 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Capo Orlando - Tug boat / 2015-08-18 - 2015-12-17 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Brazil - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-12 - 2015-05-21 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Brazil - Bulk Carrier / 2013-10-24 - 2014-07-30 (9 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Regal Bay - Reefer / 2017-07-24 - 2018-01-22 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Regal Bay - Reefer / 2016-10-14 - 2017-04-09 (6 месяцев)
ETO: Caribbean Mermaid - Reefer / 2014-08-23 - 2015-03-10 (6 месяцев)
ETO: Eastern Bay - Reefer / 2013-10-04 - 2014-04-12 (6 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Buzzard Bay - Reefer / 2012-09-04 - 2013-02-12 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: PIRITA - General cargo / 2016-09-15 - 2017-02-07 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: DAISY - General cargo / 2015-08-01 - 2016-01-10 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: DON-1 - General cargo / 2014-06-06 - 2014-12-19 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Pirita - General cargo / 2016-05-11 - 2016-09-16 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Kholmsk - Bulk Carrier / 2015-03-31 - 2015-09-09 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Kholmsk - Bulk Carrier / 2015-01-08 - 2015-03-30 (3 месяца)
Motorman: MSC Messina - Container Ship / 2014-02-28 - 2014-09-18 (7 месяцев)
Motorman: MSC Agata - Container Ship / 2013-05-27 - 2013-11-18 (6 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: Hoegh America - RO-RO / 2015-09-27 - 2016-03-28 (6 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: Aramis - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-13 - 2015-07-10 (8 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: Melchior - Bulk Carrier / 2014-04-12 - 2014-09-09 (5 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: Nikos N - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-20 - 2013-12-23 (7 месяцев)
Fitter / Welder: UCCL ALARA - Container Ship / 2012-10-01 - 2013-02-24 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: CMA CGM Don Pascuale - Container Ship / 2015-12-05 - 2016-03-15 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: Maersk Santana - Container Ship / 2015-04-17 - 2015-08-03 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Maersk Santana - Container Ship / 2014-07-06 - 2014-10-21 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: AS Castor - Container Ship / 2015-05-22 - 2015-09-18 (4 месяца)
Motorman: AS Castor - Container Ship / 2014-01-14 - 2015-05-22 (1 год)
Motorman: Aries - Container Ship / 2013-11-12 - 2014-04-23 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Pollux - Container Ship / 2013-03-01 - 2013-08-08 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Pluto - Container Ship / 2012-05-31 - 2012-11-23 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: STARK - Fishing vessel / 2015-04-02 - 2015-08-02 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Venturer - Seismic vessel / 2018-01-31 - 2018-04-11 (2 месяца)
Mechanic: Topaz Captain - Construction vessel / 2017-07-05 - 2017-10-14 (3 месяца)
Mechanic: Topaz Captain - Construction vessel / 2017-03-05 - 2017-05-18 (2 месяца)
Mechanic: Athens Star - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-11 - 2016-01-18 (2 месяца)
4th Engineer: SIEM STINGRAY - Construction vessel / 2015-01-25 - 2015-03-09 (1 месяц)
2nd Engineer: Alp Centre - AHTS / 2019-05-30 - 2019-08-08 (2 месяца)
4th Engineer: Papenburg - Heavy lift vessel / 2014-08-22 - 2014-12-02 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: Onego St. Petersburg - General cargo / 2014-02-18 - 2014-08-08 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: HHL MACAO - Heavy lift vessel / 2013-04-06 - 2013-10-07 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Marcherokee - General cargo / 2012-04-06 - 2012-09-05 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Hyunday Future - Container Ship / 2013-11-09 - 2014-05-15 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Federal - Container Ship / 2013-01-09 - 2013-06-16 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: CMA CGM Melisande - Container Ship / 2012-07-04 - 2012-10-15 (3 месяца)
Motorman: CMA CGM Melisande - Container Ship / 2012-02-28 - 2012-07-04 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Jimilta II - Bulk Carrier / 2011-03-10 - 2011-09-16 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Rawabi 1 - AHTS / 2014-05-07 - 2014-11-07 (6 месяцев)
2nd Engineer: Ali 20 - Platform Supply vessel / 2013-05-03 - 2013-08-20 (4 месяца)
2nd Engineer: Tigran - Tug boat / 2012-10-23 - 2013-02-22 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: POLAR KING - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-03-22 - 2012-07-25 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Baltic - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-10-10 - 2011-02-23 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Nordic Sprinter - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-03-22 - 2024-09-22 (6 месяцев)
Trainee Engineer: Nordic Cross - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-03-14 - 2022-09-30 (7 месяцев)
Oiler: MAGMA FIDELITY - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-16 - 2024-03-19 (8 месяцев)
Motorman: Михаил Лазарев - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-28 - 2024-01-27 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Ns Laguna - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-04-15 - 2022-11-22 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: MK5695 "Murman 1" - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-01-24 - 2024-06-24 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: MK5695 "Murman 1" - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-03-04 - 2023-09-21 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Yasnyy - AHTS / 2022-07-22 - 2022-11-25 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: Purga - Tug boat / 2020-08-20 - 2020-10-19 (2 месяца)
4th Engineer: Purga - Tug boat / 2020-03-14 - 2020-05-15 (2 месяца)
4th Engineer: CABINDA EXPRESS - Container Ship / 2023-02-25 - 2023-08-15 (6 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: HC OPAL - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-11-22 - 2022-06-03 (6 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: ALEXANDER B - Container Ship / 2020-08-30 - 2021-02-25 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Gac marine - AHTS / 2022-09-01 - 2023-07-17 (11 месяцев)