Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
Engine Cadet: MV.SUNGAI MAS - Container Ship / 2019-10-21 - 2020-05-21 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: MV.TELUK MAS - Container Ship / 2019-04-13 - 2019-09-29 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: M/T GURONI - Chemical tanker / 2019-10-03 - 2020-03-11 (5 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: M/T NILUFER SULTAN - Chemical tanker / 2018-02-08 - 2018-08-13 (6 месяцев)
Trainee Engineer: M.T.CLARA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-27 - 2020-03-10 (11 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Leon - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-02 - 2021-12-09 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Ecostory - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-30 - 2020-12-22 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: New Orion - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-17 - 2020-02-27 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: New Orion - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-06 - 2019-05-22 (8 месяцев)
Motorman: Joy - Container Ship / 2016-11-06 - 2017-06-17 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: GAZ FRATERNITY - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-28 - 2019-07-29 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: G MUSE - LPG / LNG / 2018-02-04 - 2018-07-27 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Seagas Governor - LPG / LNG / 2017-03-16 - 2017-08-28 (5 месяцев)
Motorman: Gaz Century - LPG / LNG / 2016-07-26 - 2017-01-26 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Gaz Century - LPG / LNG / 2015-07-03 - 2016-01-20 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: BOSTON TRADER - Container Ship / 2018-06-05 - 2018-12-11 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Lady of luck - Container Ship / 2017-06-26 - 2017-11-05 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Lady of Luck - Container Ship / 2017-03-26 - 2017-06-26 (3 месяца)
Motorman: Star of Luck - Container Ship / 2016-08-09 - 2016-12-17 (4 месяца)
Motorman: Queen of Luck - Container Ship / 2015-09-16 - 2016-03-29 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: MV REK TITAN - General cargo / 2017-10-06 - 2018-05-04 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: MV.ARDHIANTO - General cargo / 2017-03-03 - 2018-03-07 (1 год)
4th Engineer: Mineral Belgium - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-11 - 2017-06-14 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Mineral Beljium - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-12 - 2017-06-14 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Mineral Beljium - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-25 - 2016-09-16 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Mineral Beljium - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-26 - 2015-10-17 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Mineral Nobl - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-21 - 2015-03-02 (1 год)
3rd Engineer: Bali Sea - RO-RO / 2017-03-14 - 2017-09-16 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: ALPHA - General cargo / 2016-01-21 - 2016-07-17 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: m/v SILA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-12-27 - 2015-07-03 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: m/v SILA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-11-02 - 2014-12-27 (2 месяца)
Motorman: Golden Endurance - Bulk Carrier / 2013-01-12 - 2013-05-01 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Nemorino - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-02 - 2015-04-28 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Volodymyr Sharkov - Dry Cargo / 2014-06-17 - 2014-07-12 (1 месяц)
3rd Engineer: Oleksii Fedorov - Dry Cargo / 2013-10-10 - 2014-03-05 (5 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Michail Isakovskiy - Dry Cargo / 2009-04-10 - 2009-10-31 (7 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: UCF-1 - General cargo / 2014-10-27 - 2015-04-19 (6 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Baltic Shearwater - Container Ship / 2018-09-24 - 2019-01-23 (4 месяца)
3rd Engineer: BOMAR RESOLUTE - Container Ship / 2017-07-14 - 2017-12-19 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Schubert - Container Ship / 2016-05-30 - 2016-10-22 (5 месяцев)
3rd Engineer: Gypsum Integrity - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-06 - 2015-02-02 (4 месяца)
4th Engineer: Gypsum Integrity - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-10 - 2014-10-05 (3 месяца)
4th Engineer: Иван Малякин - Drilling Vessel / 2012-06-03 - 2013-04-26 (11 месяцев)
Motorman: ледокол "Капитан Крутов" - Accomodation barge / 2010-09-02 - 2012-04-04 (1 год)
Motorman: Капитан Крутов - Accomodation barge / 2010-09-02 - 2012-04-04 (1 год)
Motorman: Meganisi - General cargo / 2008-09-09 - 2009-03-07 (6 месяцев)
Motorman: Meganisi - General cargo / 2008-04-24 - 2008-07-17 (3 месяца)
Oiler: Johann - General cargo / 2024-02-01 - 2024-08-01 (6 месяцев)
Wiper: Lucia B - Container Ship / 2022-12-02 - 2023-07-28 (8 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Cape Stork - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-10 - 2021-10-03 (7 месяцев)
Trainee Engineer: Hammurabi - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-10-19 - 2024-06-22 (8 месяцев)
Motorman: calypso - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-05-07 - 2022-12-07 (7 месяцев)
Oiler: siroko - Tug boat / 2021-11-01 - 2022-05-01 (6 месяцев)
4th Engineer: 10 yrs experience as Mechanical Technician - Well-stimulation vessel / 2019-06-07 - 2024-02-28 (4 года)
Mechanical Technician: New sea goer. Traveled between Offshore Platforms - Crew boat / 2012-06-17 - 2016-06-17 (4 года)
4th Engineer: GAZ PROVIDENCE - LPG / LNG / 2023-09-04 - 2024-01-08 (4 месяца)
Engine Cadet: GAZ PROVIDENCE - LPG / LNG / 2023-04-26 - 2023-09-03 (4 месяца)
Engine Cadet: GAZ SYNERGY - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-13 - 2022-09-01 (9 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Teseo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-10-20 - 2023-11-09 (1 год)
4th Engineer: Mv Captaine Kupe - General cargo / 2023-04-02 - 2023-11-04 (7 месяцев)
4th Engineer: Mv Trang An 08 - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-15 - 2023-01-16 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: Mv Kintuki - General cargo / 2020-10-05 - 2021-06-06 (8 месяцев)
Oiler: Mv Eponyma - General cargo / 2020-01-14 - 2020-08-15 (7 месяцев)
Engine Cadet: Mv Meratus Ampana - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-26 - 2019-11-26 (1 год)