Сохранить
Закрыть
Добавить моряка в избранное
Удалить моряка из избранного
1st Officer: KETHI - Dry Cargo / 2021-07-04 - 2021-11-28 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: KETHI - Dry Cargo / 2020-12-10 - 2021-04-08 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: KETHI - Dry Cargo / 2020-04-03 - 2020-08-06 (4 месяца)
Safety Officer: Pacific World - Cruise Liner / 2021-10-11 - 2022-05-29 (8 месяцев)
1st Officer: M/V Century Harmony - Cruise Liner / 2020-11-26 - 2021-07-18 (8 месяцев)
Safety Officer: M/V The Zenith - Cruise Liner / 2020-01-16 - 2020-05-25 (4 месяца)
Safety Officer: M/V Ocean Dream - Cruise Liner / 2019-08-28 - 2019-12-18 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: M/V Ocean Dream - Cruise Liner / 2018-10-17 - 2019-04-18 (6 месяцев)
1st Officer: Primorye - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-04 - 2020-01-16 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: Ostrov Sakhalin - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-08-03 - 2019-07-20 (12 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Ostrov Sakhalin - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-04-12 - 2018-07-14 (3 месяца)
2nd Officer: Zaliv Petra Velikogo - Chemical tanker / 2017-07-17 - 2018-02-01 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: VIKTORIY - Bunkering Vessel / 2014-11-15 - 2016-02-01 (1 год)
1st Officer: Dutch Blue - AHTS / 2019-08-22 - 2019-10-24 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: Fairmount Expedition - AHTS / 2019-02-28 - 2019-06-14 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: Fairmount Alpine - AHTS / 2018-05-17 - 2018-10-27 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: Fairmount Alpine - AHTS / 2017-10-22 - 2018-02-17 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: Fairmount Alpine - AHTS / 2017-03-04 - 2017-07-14 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: Onat - General cargo / 2018-09-06 - 2019-06-20 (9 месяцев)
1st Officer: Ahmet Can - General cargo / 2017-12-10 - 2018-05-04 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ISIS - General cargo / 2016-10-05 - 2017-05-11 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: IRIS - General cargo / 2015-09-23 - 2016-02-20 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: OCEAN VICTORY - General cargo / 2013-05-26 - 2014-03-08 (9 месяцев)
1st Officer: MV Nivaga III - General cargo / 2019-04-03 - 2019-04-27 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: MV Nivaga III - General cargo / 2016-01-23 - 2016-08-10 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: MV Manu Folau - General cargo / 2015-12-01 - 2016-01-22 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: MV Nivaga II - General cargo / 2015-09-29 - 2015-11-30 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: MV Manu Folau - General cargo / 2015-05-24 - 2015-09-28 (4 месяца)
3rd Officer: M.T.Sidra 1 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-01-01 - 2019-09-05 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: M.T. Zayn - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-27 - 2017-09-30 (6 месяцев)
3rd Officer: M.T.Alejandrina 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-06-23 - 2016-08-07 (1 месяц)
1st Officer: M.V.Mutha Pioneer - General cargo / 2015-05-15 - 2015-11-07 (6 месяцев)
AB / Crane Operator: M.v Kota Lumba - Container Ship / 2014-04-23 - 2014-08-27 (4 месяца)
Master: Armada Hibiscus - Accommodation barge / 2024-02-29 - 2024-06-13 (3 месяца)
Master: Chambon Bora - Other vessels / 2020-12-18 - 2021-02-01 (1 месяц)
HSE Manager: Geocean Protis - Pipe laying vessel / 2018-11-05 - 2019-01-23 (3 месяца)
HSE Manager: Geocean Protis - Pipe laying vessel / 2018-04-25 - 2018-06-28 (2 месяца)
HSE Manager: Geocean Protis - Pipe laying vessel / 2017-12-10 - 2018-03-21 (3 месяца)
1st Officer: Ocean Majesty - Passenger vessel / 2023-10-01 - 2024-01-05 (3 месяца)
1st Officer: Ocean Majesty - Passenger vessel / 2023-04-18 - 2023-09-10 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Densa puma - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-10 - 2022-02-23 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Kaptan Arif Bayraktar - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-23 - 2021-03-29 (8 месяцев)
Chief Officer: Ocean Majesty - Passenger vessel / 2020-03-04 - 2020-03-16 (12 дней)
1st Officer: GOODSHIP - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-03 - 2023-10-18 (9 месяцев)
1st Officer: Pantariste - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-16 - 2021-08-31 (6 месяцев)
1st Officer: Jabal Nafusa - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-28 - 2021-02-15 (3 месяца)
1st Officer: Jabal Nafusa - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-25 - 2020-07-04 (8 месяцев)
1st Officer: Maritime Power - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-28 - 2019-07-19 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: Maridive 32 - DSV (Diving Support) / 2022-04-07 - 2022-10-31 (7 месяцев)
1st Officer: Sea lion - AHTS / 2019-10-18 - 2021-06-14 (1 год)
1st Officer: shark 53 - AHTS / 2019-06-18 - 2019-10-17 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: AlArish - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-07-01 - 2018-07-02 (1 год)
1st Officer: PRINCESS MOANA - Passenger vessel / 2021-03-29 - 2021-08-06 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: PRINCESS MOANA - Passenger vessel / 2021-03-20 - 2021-03-28 (8 дней)
2nd Officer: SPIRIT OF HARMONY - Ferry / 2021-01-08 - 2021-03-08 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: SOLANDER 3 - Fishing vessel / 2020-02-18 - 2020-03-14 (1 месяц)
1st Officer: FV POSEIDON - Fishing vessel / 2019-10-17 - 2019-11-11 (1 месяц)
1st Officer: MV. Oddipan Express - Container Ship / 2020-01-01 - 2020-12-31 (12 месяцев)
Master: FV. Blue North-1 - Fishing vessel / 2018-12-01 - 2019-12-31 (1 год)
Master: Speed-2 - Survey vessel / 2018-05-01 - 2018-11-30 (7 месяцев)
Master: Speed 1 - Survey vessel / 2017-10-01 - 2018-04-30 (7 месяцев)
1st Officer: MV. Water King - Container Ship / 2017-01-01 - 2017-09-30 (9 месяцев)
Master: Lodeynoe Pole - Coaster / 2021-05-05 - 2021-08-12 (3 месяца)
Master: Berezovets - Coaster / 2020-11-14 - 2021-03-15 (4 месяца)
Master: Opal - General cargo / 2020-04-16 - 2020-08-20 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: Opal - Dry Cargo / 2020-04-07 - 2020-04-15 (8 дней)
Chief Officer: Kapitan Skachkov - Dry Cargo / 2019-09-05 - 2019-11-06 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: m/v Trudovaya - Other vessels / 2019-05-01 - 2019-12-31 (8 месяцев)
1st Officer: Mario Primo - Crane vessel / 2019-09-29 - 2019-10-15 (1 месяц)
2nd Officer: Kan 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-04-25 - 2017-12-11 (8 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Kan 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-09-17 - 2016-04-15 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: m/v Simone - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-06-05 - 2014-02-06 (1 год)
2nd Officer: ESL WINNER - Container Ship / 2024-03-03 - 2024-08-17 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ESL WINNER - Container Ship / 2023-06-23 - 2023-10-29 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: Leto - Container Ship / 2021-03-24 - 2021-07-31 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: JOGELA - Container Ship / 2020-06-12 - 2020-10-13 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: MINNA - Container Ship / 2019-09-29 - 2020-02-16 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: Sea Enterprise - Standby-safety vessel / 2023-08-19 - 2023-11-29 (3 месяца)
1st Officer: Amber Sky - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-19 - 2023-05-31 (12 дней)
2nd Officer: Amber Sky - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-08 - 2023-05-18 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: Sea Enterprise - Standby-safety vessel / 2022-10-01 - 2022-11-15 (1 месяц)
1st Officer: Sea Enterprise - Standby-safety vessel / 2022-02-27 - 2022-05-12 (2 месяца)
Master: Topaz Don - General cargo / 2023-06-08 - 2023-08-11 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: Topaz Don - General cargo / 2023-03-14 - 2023-06-07 (3 месяца)
Master: Topaz Ural - General cargo / 2022-07-24 - 2022-11-11 (4 месяца)
1st Officer: Topaz Moskva - General cargo / 2022-03-23 - 2022-05-27 (2 месяца)
1st Officer: Topaz Moskva - General cargo / 2022-01-01 - 2022-03-22 (3 месяца)
1st Officer: “PALLADA” - General cargo / 2021-09-19 - 2023-01-19 (1 год)
2nd Officer: “OBAN” - General cargo / 2020-12-18 - 2021-04-25 (4 месяца)
2nd Officer: “ODESSA 1” - General cargo / 2020-01-27 - 2020-07-19 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: “SORMOVSKIY 121” - General cargo / 2018-10-04 - 2019-05-05 (7 месяцев)
2nd Officer: “ODESSA 1” - General cargo / 2017-05-31 - 2018-03-07 (9 месяцев)
2nd Officer: Emmakris I - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-06 - 2023-03-17 (5 месяцев)
1st Officer: ARCADIA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-11 - 2022-01-13 (2 месяца)
2nd Officer: AVIONA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-28 - 2021-10-20 (5 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ANARITA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-12 - 2021-02-17 (6 месяцев)
2nd Officer: ARIZONA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-23 - 2020-01-12 (7 месяцев)