Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Engineer: AOS Power - AHT / 2023-06-26 - 2023-07-09 (13 days)
2nd Engineer: AOS HAULER - AHTS / 2022-12-07 - 2023-03-22 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: AOS HAULER - AHTS / 2021-10-18 - 2022-07-20 (9 months)
2nd Engineer: AOS STAR - AHT / 2020-01-21 - 2020-12-20 (11 months)
2nd Officer: Onego Trader - General cargo / 2022-12-07 - 2023-07-04 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: SAN ALFONSO - Container Ship / 2022-12-18 - 2023-07-01 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Mygan - General cargo / 2022-01-28 - 2022-07-29 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Atlantica Brave - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-11-20 - 2023-06-21 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Thomas Selmer - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-11 - 2022-09-21 (6 months)
Motorman: Tronoldheim - Fishing vessel / 2022-11-22 - 2023-06-21 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: sky rider - Chemical tanker / 2022-12-16 - 2023-06-16 (6 months)
AB / Motorman: Aida cosma - Cruise Liner / 2022-11-01 - 2023-06-09 (7 months)
AB / Motorman: Aida cosma - Cruise Liner / 2021-11-21 - 2022-08-20 (9 months)
AB / Motorman: Roro cargo - RO-RO / 2019-09-11 - 2020-09-12 (1 year)
Electric Cadet: no experience - Chemical tanker / 2023-06-01 - 2023-06-02 (1 day)
AB Seaman: AEOLOS - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-15 - 2023-05-31 (10 months)
AB Seaman: ARIADNE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-08-13 - 2020-02-13 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Golden Shiner - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-12-28 - 2023-05-31 (5 months)
2nd Officer: RS Aurora - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-09-24 - 2022-12-13 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Lake Sturgeon - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-20 - 2022-06-26 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Lake Sturgeon - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-14 - 2021-08-26 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Lake Sturgeon - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-23 - 2021-04-13 (2 months)
4th Engineer: MT LIA - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-10-11 - 2023-05-27 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: M.T Aframax reiviera - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-08 - 2019-11-15 (6 months)
Cook: Menomonee - Bulk Carrier / 2022-11-07 - 2023-05-26 (7 months)
Cook: Brigitte - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-08 - 2022-06-04 (7 months)
Messman: Elsabeth C - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-10 - 2021-09-07 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: ALLISON - Tug boat / 2023-05-08 - 2023-05-25 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: MSC ELEONORA - Container Ship / 2023-01-29 - 2023-05-23 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: MSC SENA - Container Ship / 2022-12-06 - 2023-01-25 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: MV virgo - Container Ship / 2021-03-24 - 2021-08-26 (5 months)
ETO: Anatoly Kolodkin - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-08 - 2023-05-16 (5 months)
ETO: SCF Neva - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-04-09 - 2022-08-28 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: MV lodycke - Other vessels / 2023-02-14 - 2023-05-14 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Es sahand - Tug boat / 2022-08-31 - 2023-05-05 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Primavera II - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-08 - 2019-12-27 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Baku Sky - General cargo / 2023-03-20 - 2023-04-30 (1 month)
AB Seaman: M. Andreev - Dry Cargo / 2022-04-23 - 2022-09-22 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: KHERSONES - Sailing Vessel / 2021-06-01 - 2021-08-01 (2 months)
Cook: Bourbon Herald - Platform Supply vessel / 2023-01-27 - 2023-04-27 (3 months)
Cook: Bourbon Explorer 509 - Platform Supply vessel / 2022-10-07 - 2022-12-01 (2 months)
Chief Officer: IRAN SHAHED - Container Ship / 2022-06-23 - 2023-04-24 (10 months)
Chief Officer: SHABGOUN - Container Ship / 2022-01-19 - 2022-04-07 (3 months)
Chief Officer: SHAYAN 1 - Container Ship / 2020-07-13 - 2021-03-07 (8 months)
Chief Officer: ARVIN - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-22 - 2019-05-02 (9 months)