Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Messman: Ms artania - Cruise Liner / 2022-05-20 - 2023-01-28 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Ali najafov - Chemical tanker / 2022-09-21 - 2023-01-23 (4 months)
ETO: MSC SANDY III - Container Ship / 2022-05-07 - 2023-01-22 (8 months)
Electrician: Bernhard Schulte - Container Ship / 2021-11-01 - 2022-02-02 (3 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: MSC Antigua - Container Ship / 2020-06-30 - 2020-10-27 (4 months)
Electric Cadet: Lucie Schulte - Container Ship / 2019-05-09 - 2019-11-17 (6 months)
Master: Discoverer - Crew boat / 2022-12-21 - 2023-01-11 (1 month)
Master: Backer - Crew boat / 2022-11-26 - 2022-12-20 (1 month)
Master: Braver - Crew boat / 2022-07-19 - 2022-08-17 (1 month)
Master: NCL Haugesund - Container Ship / 2022-04-12 - 2022-06-03 (2 months)
Master: NCL Haugesund - Container Ship / 2022-02-21 - 2022-03-07 (14 days)
OS: Greenwich Eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-18 - 2023-01-04 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Lisa - Container Ship / 2021-06-25 - 2022-03-19 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: ZIM SHEKOU - Container Ship / 2021-01-10 - 2021-05-02 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Al-Hadbaa - General cargo / 2022-03-03 - 2023-01-03 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: Mv ice transporter - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-22 - 2022-12-31 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Ilembe - Dredger / 2019-07-07 - 2022-12-30 (3 years)
2nd Officer: MV Isandlwana - Dredger / 2016-06-01 - 2019-05-31 (2 years)
2nd Officer: Piper - Dredger / 2002-01-15 - 2007-01-01 (4 years)
2nd Officer: Ingwenya - Dredger / 1996-12-07 - 2001-12-01 (4 years)
Deck Cadet: Alure of the seas - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-27 - 2022-12-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: DZINTARS - Fishing vessel / 2022-05-28 - 2022-12-22 (7 months)
AB Seaman: DZINTARS - Fishing vessel / 2021-08-05 - 2022-02-06 (6 months)
Welder: TRONDHEIM - Fishing vessel / 2020-12-21 - 2021-02-27 (2 months)
Chief Officer: OCEAN LION - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-22 - 2022-12-09 (10 months)
Chief Officer: APOLO - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-20 - 2021-07-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: PONENTE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-02 - 2020-08-23 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: SSI EXCELLENT - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-25 - 2022-12-04 (1 year)
3rd Officer: Elandra denali - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-03-05 - 2022-11-25 (9 months)
Assistant Housekeeper: Cleaner, cooker - Cruise Liner / 2021-11-17 - 2022-11-17 (1 year)
Motorman: BORIS SYROMYATNIKOV - Fishing vessel / 2022-06-17 - 2022-11-17 (5 months)
OS: F/V Margiris KL855 - Fishing vessel / 2022-01-28 - 2022-11-14 (10 months)
4th Engineer: SEA SIDDHEE - Cement Carrier / 2022-08-18 - 2022-11-11 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Svitzer echo - AHTS / 2020-02-22 - 2020-09-09 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Clipper Kythira - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-07 - 2022-11-08 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: STS "MIR" - Sailing Vessel / 2021-04-21 - 2021-07-05 (2 months)
Motorman: M/v TIKSI - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-05 - 2022-11-06 (6 months)
Motorman: Aleksey Kartashov - Tug boat / 2019-04-16 - 2019-07-01 (2 months)
Motorman: Kapitan Bogaterov - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-06 - 2017-10-18 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: "Drushba" - AHT / 2022-11-03 - 2022-11-03 (0 days)