Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
4th Engineer: OYA STAR - Cement Carrier / 2017-10-19 - 2018-01-12 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Leptis Star - Cement Carrier / 2016-09-26 - 2017-05-26 (8 months)
4th Engineer: OYA STAR - Cement Carrier / 2015-06-11 - 2016-03-23 (9 months)
4th Engineer: Golden Arrow 3 - Cement Carrier / 2013-07-17 - 2014-07-03 (12 months)
AB / Welder: Рррп - Ferry / 2017-12-15 - 2017-12-31 (1 month)
AB / Welder: Аар - Ferry / 2017-12-22 - 2017-12-31 (9 days)
AB / Welder: Про - Ferry / 2017-12-22 - 2017-12-31 (9 days)
AB / Welder: Ghdhb - Ferry / 2017-12-09 - 2017-12-24 (15 days)
AB / Welder: Паии - Ferry / 2017-12-09 - 2017-12-22 (13 days)
Fitter / Welder: BBC compana - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-10-29 - 2017-12-17 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: BLU TIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-20 - 2017-06-30 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Wellington strait - Container Ship / 2015-11-20 - 2016-07-15 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: Sapphir - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-08-28 - 2015-10-26 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: Macao - Heavy lift vessel / 2014-11-06 - 2015-03-15 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: mv maymona - General cargo / 2016-08-14 - 2017-11-26 (1 year)
OS: Caspian Leader - Chemical tanker / 2017-08-15 - 2017-11-25 (3 months)
Junior officer: Caspian Stream - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-01 - 2016-12-18 (4 months)
Junior officer: Azov Mariner - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-03-31 - 2014-10-02 (6 months)
Wiper : Avlemon - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-29 - 2017-11-23 (11 months)
Wiper : Alma-ata - Bulk Carrier / 2011-02-12 - 2011-05-18 (3 months)
OS: Marco polo - Ferry / 2017-07-01 - 2017-11-15 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v "Tufty" Bulk Carrier. Limassol. - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-10 - 2017-10-20 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v "Stellar Atlantic" Bulk Carrier.St.Johns. - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-15 - 2016-12-20 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v "Evdokia L" - General cargo / 2015-11-04 - 2016-05-10 (6 months)
Motorman: CMA CGM Melisande - Container Ship / 2017-03-27 - 2017-10-04 (6 months)
Motorman: Severodvinskiy - Dredger / 2016-04-20 - 2017-01-17 (9 months)
Motorman-electrician: Granit - Tug boat / 2017-07-20 - 2017-09-19 (2 months)
Cook: Lubomyr - Tug boat / 2017-05-15 - 2017-09-16 (4 months)
Cook: Illya Muromets - Dry Cargo / 2016-11-22 - 2017-04-15 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: WADI FERAN - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-28 - 2017-08-10 (1 year)
Motorman: Aliot - Tug / 2014-01-24 - 2014-08-01 (6 months)
Motorman: [Malyshk - Tug / 2013-05-24 - 2013-09-30 (4 months)
Trainee Engineer: Greatship dhriti - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-12-16 - 2017-06-23 (6 months)
El.Eng / 3rd Engineer: JS NARMADA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-01 - 2017-06-20 (7 months)
El.Eng / 3rd Engineer: JS NARMADA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-01 - 2017-06-20 (7 months)
El.Eng / 3rd Engineer: JS COLUMBIA - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-01 - 2016-08-25 (1 year)
El.Eng / 3rd Engineer: js garone - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-26 - 2016-06-03 (7 months)
El.Eng / 3rd Engineer: js loire - Bulk Carrier / 2014-03-06 - 2014-09-18 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: San Marino Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-11-29 - 2017-05-29 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: FILIA GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-27 - 2017-05-16 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: FILIA GLORY - Bulk Carrier / 2015-07-14 - 2016-02-28 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: VELES - General cargo / 2014-07-12 - 2015-02-01 (7 months)
Master: Rhona - Chemical tanker / 2016-09-23 - 2017-04-27 (7 months)
Master: Rodes Sun - Chemical tanker / 2015-11-16 - 2016-05-05 (6 months)
Master: Marida Mulbery - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-27 - 2014-09-14 (5 months)
Master: Chem Pegasus - Chemical tanker / 2013-06-05 - 2013-10-09 (4 months)
Master: Pvt Eagle - Chemical tanker / 2012-08-10 - 2012-12-25 (4 months)
DP Officer: Jason 25 - Construction vessel / 2017-03-14 - 2017-04-23 (1 month)
DP Officer: Jason 25 - Construction vessel / 2016-12-17 - 2017-02-02 (2 months)
DP Officer: Jascon 25 - Construction vessel / 2016-09-28 - 2016-11-09 (1 month)
DP Officer: Jason 34 - Construction vessel / 2016-07-06 - 2016-08-19 (1 month)
DP Officer: Jason 34 - Construction vessel / 2016-03-30 - 2016-05-26 (2 months)