Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Vityaz - Dredger / 2016-05-19 - 2021-05-01 (4 years)
AB Seaman: Ministar-7 - Dry Cargo / 2011-05-09 - 2011-08-18 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Palflot-5 - Oil Products Tanker / 2009-11-22 - 2010-01-31 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Kapella - Tug boat / 2009-06-22 - 2009-08-22 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Duma 2 - Tug boat / 2021-02-01 - 2021-04-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: KAPITAN BELOUSOV - Icebreaker / 2021-02-17 - 2021-04-18 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v Elita - Training Ship / 2020-10-05 - 2021-04-17 (6 months)
Motorman: Petr Popov - Survey vessel / 2020-10-12 - 2021-04-13 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Survey vessel / 2019-07-15 - 2019-09-13 (2 months)
OS: M/V Amity - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-07 - 2021-04-09 (5 months)
OS: MineralCloudbreak - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-25 - 2019-11-26 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Lake Erie - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-09 - 2021-04-06 (4 months)
Steward: Lake Erie - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-07 - 2020-12-08 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: White Star - General cargo / 2020-05-01 - 2020-08-06 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Omskiy 117 - General cargo / 2019-03-11 - 2019-08-30 (6 months)
OS: JARVIS - AHTS / 2020-12-25 - 2021-04-04 (3 months)
OS: Reina - General cargo / 2020-02-21 - 2020-03-13 (1 month)
Wiper: Granit - Tug boat / 2021-01-27 - 2021-03-29 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Ocean Power - RO-RO / 2017-10-23 - 2018-03-14 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: SB-4 - Tug boat / 2020-10-01 - 2021-03-28 (6 months)
OS: Vostok Reefer - Reefer / 2021-01-13 - 2021-03-26 (2 months)
OS: m/v MY LAMA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-04-12 - 2021-03-20 (11 months)
AB Seaman: m/v GANDA - General cargo / 2018-09-29 - 2019-05-15 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Maersk Launceston - Container Ship / 2020-09-07 - 2021-03-18 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Santa Maria Manuela - Floating Hotel / 2019-03-22 - 2019-03-24 (2 days)
4th Engineer: Coe Laura - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-12 - 2021-03-14 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Coe Leni - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-06-24 - 2019-12-12 (6 months)
Oiler: Coe Leni - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-06-27 - 2018-12-30 (6 months)
Oiler: Coe Leni - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-05-05 - 2018-02-23 (10 months)
Oiler: Arne - General cargo / 2016-03-19 - 2016-12-11 (9 months)
AB Seaman: ASVIRA - General cargo / 2020-09-27 - 2021-03-09 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Supra - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-28 - 2020-07-07 (4 months)
Welder: Mega - General cargo / 2020-08-15 - 2021-02-19 (6 months)
Oiler: LAKE DOLPHIN - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-28 - 2021-02-06 (7 months)
Oiler: MINARAL NINGBO - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-16 - 2019-12-29 (6 months)
Oiler: GLORIA - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-05 - 2018-11-07 (10 months)
Oiler: M/V DARWIN - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-07 - 2017-06-23 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MT Meditran - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-11 - 2021-01-30 (1 year)
2nd Officer: Earth Summit - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-13 - 2021-01-28 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Bow Gallant - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-23 - 2019-10-09 (7 months)
3rd Officer: LEG Emilius - LPG / LNG / 2017-09-28 - 2018-03-17 (6 months)
3rd Officer: LEG Ellington - LPG / LNG / 2016-12-27 - 2017-06-23 (6 months)
OS: Oramalia - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-27 - 2021-01-25 (5 months)
OS: Oramalia - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-30 - 2020-05-09 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Maple Liv - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-08-29 - 2019-03-02 (6 months)