Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Landy - General cargo / 2018-07-03 - 2018-10-07 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Stellar atlantic - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-13 - 2017-10-26 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Pacific victor - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-12-29 - 2017-03-21 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Stellar maestro - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-12-17 - 2016-06-21 (6 months)
OS: Indian harmony - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-25 - 2015-06-16 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: MARTIN I SOLER - RO-RO / 2018-07-15 - 2018-09-30 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: EIVISSA JET - Ferry / 2017-11-15 - 2018-02-15 (3 months)
Cook: Good Luck - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-27 - 2018-09-12 (8 months)
Cook: Senata - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-21 - 2017-10-16 (6 months)
Cook: Sabrina - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-01 - 2017-01-09 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: VOS Patriot - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-08-07 - 2018-09-04 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: VOS Patriot - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-06-12 - 2018-07-11 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: Geo Motion - Survey vessel / 2017-08-29 - 2017-10-11 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: Geo Motion - Survey vessel / 2017-09-05 - 2017-09-19 (14 days)
2nd Engineer: Geo Motion - Survey vessel / 2017-06-14 - 2017-07-28 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Т/х "ОМ -106" - Passenger vessel / 2018-07-30 - 2018-08-31 (1 month)
OS: M/V TAIF - Other vessels / 2017-11-14 - 2018-08-26 (9 months)
Wiper : CПК-100 - Other vessels / 2018-05-21 - 2018-08-20 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Сокол-5 - Repair Vessel / 2017-05-29 - 2017-09-20 (4 months)
Wiper: Хаджибей - Passenger vessel / 2018-07-16 - 2018-08-16 (1 month)
Motorman: PETRA I - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-01 - 2018-08-15 (4 months)
AB / Welder: Petra I - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-28 - 2015-12-11 (7 months)
AB / Welder: SANITA - General cargo / 2012-04-25 - 2013-02-20 (10 months)
AB Seaman: DEBRENE - Dry Cargo / 2011-01-05 - 2011-12-27 (12 months)
Chief Officer: ALP Guard - AHTS / 2018-05-13 - 2018-08-09 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ALP Guard - AHTS / 2018-01-16 - 2018-03-18 (2 months)
Chief Officer: ALP Guard - AHTS / 2017-08-20 - 2017-11-19 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ALP Guard - AHTS / 2017-04-13 - 2017-06-12 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Altus Optimus - DSV (Diving Support) / 2016-11-06 - 2016-11-27 (1 month)
OS: DERIBAS - Bulk Carrier / 2018-04-12 - 2018-08-06 (4 months)
Messman: DERIBAS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-12 - 2018-01-24 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: IRTYSH - General cargo / 2018-02-01 - 2018-08-03 (6 months)
Electrician: KATRIN - General cargo / 2018-01-25 - 2018-07-27 (6 months)
Electrician: BELLATRIX - General cargo / 2016-08-02 - 2017-01-14 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: MF Rose - General cargo / 2015-05-20 - 2016-02-22 (9 months)
OS: UCF - 1 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-12-15 - 2018-07-20 (7 months)
OS: Tatarbunary - Dry Cargo / 2017-09-14 - 2017-11-10 (2 months)
Oiler: ARAL - Chemical tanker / 2017-11-21 - 2018-07-03 (7 months)
Oiler: ARAL - Chemical tanker / 2016-10-25 - 2017-03-31 (5 months)
Motorman: MELITA - General cargo / 2016-02-25 - 2016-10-07 (7 months)
Motorman: Hera Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-20 - 2018-06-20 (6 months)
Motorman: MINOAS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-20 - 2017-07-30 (6 months)
Motorman: MINOAS - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-16 - 2016-07-23 (6 months)
Motorman: Kosmas V - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-03 - 2015-05-31 (6 months)
Motorman: Kosmas V - Bulk Carrier / 2013-08-21 - 2014-04-05 (7 months)
ETO: MV ATLANTIC SAIL - RO-RO / 2018-01-08 - 2018-06-08 (5 months)
El. Engineer: Floriana - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-21 - 2017-08-12 (4 months)
El. Engineer: MV MARIA - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-23 - 2016-11-07 (3 months)
El. Engineer: MV PIGI - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-28 - 2016-04-23 (6 months)
El. Engineer: MV DIGNITY - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-18 - 2015-07-30 (8 months)
AB / Welder: semyon morozov - General cargo / 2017-11-29 - 2018-05-23 (6 months)
AB / Welder: Svyatoy Georgiy - General cargo / 2017-03-23 - 2017-08-17 (5 months)
AB / Welder: Artey - General cargo / 2015-05-05 - 2016-10-30 (1 year)
AB / Welder: Artey - General cargo / 2014-12-18 - 2015-08-20 (8 months)
AB / Welder: amyr2507 - General cargo / 2012-11-01 - 2013-01-30 (3 months)
Motorman: "Sea Aeolis" - RO-RO / 2017-11-30 - 2018-05-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Pearl BAY - Reefer / 2017-08-23 - 2017-10-09 (2 months)
Motorman: m/t "Palchem 1" - Chemical tanker / 2016-08-28 - 2016-12-23 (4 months)
Mess Boy: m/t "Palchem 1" - Chemical tanker / 2015-12-19 - 2016-04-30 (4 months)
Mess Boy: m/t "Shusha" - Chemical tanker / 2014-12-17 - 2015-05-23 (5 months)
Electrician: Lucky star 11 - General cargo / 2017-10-20 - 2018-05-02 (6 months)
Electrician: Ritaj-a - General cargo / 2016-09-05 - 2017-03-10 (6 months)