Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Chief Cook: Bude - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-07 - 2016-10-31 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Bude - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-09 - 2015-10-01 (6 months)
Chief Cook: TIVERTON - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-14 - 2015-01-22 (6 months)
OS-Cook: WILSON GAETA - Dry Cargo / 2014-02-27 - 2014-04-23 (2 months)
OS-Cook: WILSON GAETA - Dry Cargo / 2013-06-14 - 2013-10-22 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Green Concordia - Reefer / 2016-06-11 - 2016-09-27 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Team Spirit - General cargo / 2015-07-22 - 2015-10-30 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Pacific Express - General cargo / 2014-12-14 - 2015-04-16 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: BBC Marmara - General cargo / 2014-01-05 - 2014-07-18 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: BBC Marmara - General cargo / 2013-01-27 - 2013-08-10 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Island Transporter - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-05-05 - 2016-09-22 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Fair Artemis - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-12-20 - 2015-04-02 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Anamaria - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-10-05 - 2014-02-10 (4 months)
2nd Officer: CANOPUS - General cargo / 2013-05-08 - 2013-07-18 (2 months)
2nd Officer: IRAN NEKA - Oil Products Tanker / 2007-12-21 - 2008-04-12 (4 months)
3rd Officer: dream - Seismic vessel / 2012-12-11 - 2015-04-02 (2 years)
Cook: m/v Alexander B / - Container Ship / 2016-04-18 - 2016-07-10 (3 months)
Cook: Palmetron - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-07-27 - 2015-12-12 (4 months)
Cook: Herm J - Container Ship / 2015-03-03 - 2015-05-27 (3 months)
Cook: Uphusen - General cargo / 2014-05-26 - 2014-10-03 (4 months)
Cook: AB Bilbao - Dry Cargo / 2014-04-09 - 2014-05-22 (1 month)
AB Seaman: GRANGE BAY - Fishing vessel / 2016-02-20 - 2016-07-05 (4 months)
AB Seaman: GRANGE BAY - Fishing vessel / 2015-04-13 - 2015-08-25 (4 months)
AB Seaman: "Kapitan Konkin" - Dry Cargo / 2013-11-13 - 2014-05-25 (6 months)
AB Seaman: "Kapitan Konkin" - Dry Cargo / 2013-06-13 - 2013-07-08 (1 month)
AB Seaman: STARK - Fishing vessel / 2012-08-24 - 2012-10-26 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: волго-балт-226 - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-01 - 2016-06-30 (7 months)
AB / Welder: воло-балт-213 - Bulk Carrier / 2014-11-14 - 2015-07-03 (8 months)
AB / Welder: волго-балт-235 - Bulk Carrier / 2013-09-29 - 2014-04-15 (7 months)
2nd Officer: hs medea - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-01-03 - 2016-05-29 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Hs alcina - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-06-26 - 2014-11-20 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Bremen Trader - Chemical tanker / 2013-09-03 - 2014-01-10 (4 months)
2nd Officer: BREMEN TRADER - AHTS / 2013-08-22 - 2013-10-22 (2 months)
Boatswain: EFA - General cargo / 2016-02-02 - 2016-05-28 (4 months)
Boatswain: TINA - General cargo / 2015-05-05 - 2015-11-05 (6 months)
AB Seaman: m/v"DIAMOND C" - General cargo / 2014-10-01 - 2014-12-09 (2 months)
Boatswain: m/v"TINA" - General cargo / 2014-03-11 - 2014-08-11 (5 months)
AB Seaman: m/v"SAMAN" - General cargo / 2014-01-09 - 2014-03-11 (2 months)
OS: Optima - Container Ship / 2015-11-14 - 2016-05-25 (6 months)
OS: Silver - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-25 - 2015-11-06 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2016-01-20 - 2016-05-21 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2015-07-15 - 2015-12-22 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2014-11-27 - 2015-04-30 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-20 - 2014-08-31 (4 months)
Motorman: Heimdal - Cable laying vessel / 2012-05-27 - 2012-09-06 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Simonas Daukantas - Fishing vessel / 2015-11-24 - 2016-04-05 (4 months)
AB Seaman: POSEYDON - Coaster / 2015-05-05 - 2015-09-30 (5 months)
OS: Deva Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-06 - 2014-11-06 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Posh Endeavour - Construction vessel / 2016-01-07 - 2016-03-15 (2 months)
Motorman: Sea Springer - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-12-15 - 2015-02-17 (2 months)
Motorman: JASCON 11 - AHT / 2014-07-15 - 2014-09-20 (2 months)
Motorman: NSO Fortune - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-01-10 - 2014-06-27 (6 months)
Motorman: Caspian Endeavour - AHTS / 2013-12-04 - 2013-12-31 (1 month)
Assistant Cook: Crown Princess - Cruise Liner / 2015-10-17 - 2016-03-09 (5 months)
Assistant Cook: Emerald Princess - Cruise Liner / 2014-12-07 - 2015-07-15 (7 months)
Assistant Cook: Emerald Princess - Cruise Liner / 2014-03-24 - 2014-10-06 (6 months)
Assistant Cook: Crown Princess - Cruise Liner / 2013-06-29 - 2014-01-25 (7 months)
Boatswain: modulus-5 - Dry Cargo / 2015-09-07 - 2015-12-14 (3 months)
Boatswain: Ulus Wind - General cargo / 2015-03-25 - 2015-08-10 (5 months)
Boatswain: Ulus Prime - Dry Cargo / 2014-02-15 - 2014-06-19 (4 months)
Boatswain: Ulus Prime - Dry Cargo / 2013-04-20 - 2013-09-21 (5 months)
Boatswain: Amur2501 - Dry Cargo / 2012-05-01 - 2012-11-30 (7 months)
El. Engineer: TFM-1 - RO-RO / 2015-08-29 - 2015-12-03 (3 months)
El. Engineer: BFI-1 - RO-RO / 2015-03-24 - 2015-06-15 (3 months)
El. Engineer: TFM-1 - RO-RO / 2015-02-07 - 2015-03-23 (2 months)
El. Engineer: BFI-1 - RO-RO / 2014-09-12 - 2014-12-17 (3 months)
El. Engineer: Karrizona - General cargo / 2014-02-07 - 2014-07-21 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Brothers 8 - Chemical tanker / 2015-06-15 - 2015-11-10 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Riroil 4 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-05-22 - 2014-12-10 (7 months)
Motorman: Zaliv Vostok - Reefer / 2013-04-23 - 2014-03-18 (11 months)
Motorman: Abinsk - Reefer / 2012-05-19 - 2012-11-30 (6 months)
Electrician: Centaurus - Container Ship / 2015-07-24 - 2015-11-02 (3 months)
Electrician: Ym New Jersey - Other vessels / 2015-05-23 - 2015-06-23 (1 month)
Electric Cadet: Cape Blle - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-04 - 2015-03-16 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Begonia - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-26 - 2014-05-02 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Nordic Harrier - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-06-04 - 2013-11-08 (5 months)
Motorman: HHL Elbe - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-04-04 - 2015-10-18 (6 months)
Motorman: HHL Rio de Janeiro - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-04-24 - 2014-10-16 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Knock - Container Ship / 2012-03-09 - 2012-09-07 (6 months)
2nd Officer: RISING SUN - Chemical tanker / 2015-06-23 - 2015-10-18 (4 months)
2nd Officer: DUBRA - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-03 - 2015-04-16 (6 months)
2nd Officer: RISING SUN - Chemical tanker / 2013-12-07 - 2014-06-01 (6 months)
2nd Officer: HALIT BEY - Chemical tanker / 2013-05-03 - 2013-08-02 (3 months)
3rd Officer: PHOENIX BEACON - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-02-13 - 2013-04-15 (2 months)