Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Ship Security Officer: MSC Virtuosa - Cruise Liner / 2021-08-11 - 2021-11-27 (4 months)
Ship Security Officer: MSC Grandiosa - Cruise Liner / 2021-05-30 - 2021-08-10 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Kamilla - Training Ship / 2021-09-18 - 2021-11-20 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Dremora 2 - General cargo / 2021-09-17 - 2021-11-19 (2 months)
Master: Contship Way - Container Ship / 2021-07-12 - 2021-11-16 (4 months)
Master: Miro - Container Ship / 2019-11-17 - 2020-06-30 (7 months)
Master: Miro - Container Ship / 2019-01-09 - 2019-05-31 (5 months)
Master: Miro - Container Ship / 2018-03-03 - 2018-08-23 (6 months)
Master: Miro - Container Ship / 2017-04-23 - 2017-10-07 (5 months)
OS: Porada - General cargo / 2021-07-14 - 2021-11-16 (4 months)
OS: Mila - General cargo / 2020-02-19 - 2020-08-14 (6 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: MV. Chief - Container Ship / 2021-05-23 - 2021-11-14 (6 months)
Chief Electrical Engineer: MV. Behta - Container Ship / 2020-10-25 - 2021-02-26 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: MSC TAVVISHI - Container Ship / 2021-04-17 - 2021-10-31 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Maersk Garonne - Container Ship / 2021-04-22 - 2021-10-30 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Granit - Tug boat / 2020-06-22 - 2020-09-14 (3 months)
OS: DOLPHIN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-30 - 2021-10-30 (6 months)
OS: FREEDOM - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-10-25 - 2021-04-29 (6 months)
Trainee OS: MONERON - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-07-11 - 2016-08-12 (1 month)
Wiper: M. T. BLUEBELL - AHT / 2021-03-20 - 2021-10-27 (7 months)
Trainee Wiper: M. T. PARIJAT - AHT / 2019-12-11 - 2020-02-12 (2 months)
Trainee Wiper: M. T. JASMINESTAR - AHT / 2019-08-07 - 2019-12-07 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: M/T VAALS - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-09 - 2021-10-19 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: OPC Defender - Chemical tanker / 2016-06-01 - 2016-08-01 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Neptune Aegli - RO-RO / 2021-05-18 - 2021-10-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: TSV,,Druzhba’’ - Sailing Vessel / 2020-07-20 - 2020-08-16 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Serenity Ace - RO-RO / 2021-04-08 - 2021-10-16 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Viking queen - RO-RO / 2020-09-12 - 2021-01-30 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Viking Odessa - RO-RO / 2019-02-16 - 2019-08-04 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: MV Lake St Clair - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-30 - 2021-10-14 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V ARABIAN SEA - RO-RO / 2021-02-11 - 2021-03-18 (1 month)
Motorman: Slavutich 15 - Dry Cargo / 2020-05-10 - 2020-08-25 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Akademik Sergey Vavilov - Passenger vessel / 2021-04-16 - 2021-10-12 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Akademik Sergey Vavilov - Passenger vessel / 2020-05-28 - 2021-03-31 (10 months)
3rd Engineer: Akademik Sergey Vavilov - Passenger vessel / 2018-10-16 - 2019-05-10 (7 months)
OS: Kiowa - General cargo / 2021-04-10 - 2021-10-10 (6 months)
OS / Welder: Fox - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-11 - 2021-10-09 (7 months)
OS / Welder: OctopusS - General cargo / 2018-10-22 - 2019-04-16 (6 months)
Motorman: Vostochnyy - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-09-05 - 2021-10-07 (1 month)
OS: Portovyy-8 - Other vessels / 2021-07-05 - 2021-10-07 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Neptune Kefalonia - RO-RO / 2021-05-27 - 2021-10-06 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Tsv “Druzhba” - Passenger vessel / 2020-08-03 - 2020-08-30 (1 month)