Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Waitress: MS Mein Schiff 3 - Standby-safety vessel / 2016-12-11 - 2017-06-14 (6 months)
Waitress: MS Mein Schiff 3 - Passenger vessel / 2016-12-11 - 2017-06-14 (6 months)
Stewardess: MS Europa - Passenger vessel / 2015-04-24 - 2015-10-02 (5 months)
Stewardess: MS Europa - Passenger vessel / 2015-04-24 - 2015-10-02 (5 months)
Stewardess: MS Deutschland - Passenger vessel / 2011-04-17 - 2014-11-09 (3 years)
Motorman: MUSE - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-31 - 2017-06-12 (4 months)
Motorman: TATARBUNARY - Tug boat / 2015-12-30 - 2016-02-04 (1 month)
OS: Smetliviy - NAVY / 2016-06-06 - 2017-06-06 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: luka kapikraian - Tug boat / 2017-03-14 - 2017-05-28 (2 months)
Motorman: Askoe - General cargo / 2015-08-16 - 2016-02-20 (6 months)
Motorman: Patria - General cargo / 2014-07-14 - 2015-01-22 (6 months)
Motorman: Portofino - Container Ship / 2013-08-24 - 2014-04-21 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Mekong spirit - Container Ship / 2016-11-09 - 2017-05-24 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Mekong spirit - Container Ship / 2015-11-26 - 2016-05-26 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Mekong Spirit - Container Ship / 2015-03-18 - 2015-06-16 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Mekong spirit - Container Ship / 2014-11-03 - 2015-03-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Kreta - Container Ship / 2014-01-06 - 2014-06-14 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: SABRINA - Dry Cargo / 2017-01-09 - 2017-05-21 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: GRACE 1 - General cargo / 2015-11-11 - 2016-04-23 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: BECCARIA - Dry Cargo / 2014-11-09 - 2015-03-20 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Thor Leader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-04-06 - 2012-08-16 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: thor leader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-09-02 - 2012-01-07 (4 months)
Motorman: UTA - General cargo / 2017-01-29 - 2017-05-20 (4 months)
Motorman: RIVER THAMES - General cargo / 2016-04-04 - 2016-10-25 (7 months)
Motorman: URGENCE - General cargo / 2015-05-04 - 2015-11-06 (6 months)
Motorman: UTA - General cargo / 2014-07-09 - 2015-01-17 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: ALASKA - Reefer / 2012-05-02 - 2012-10-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Woodgate - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-24 - 2017-05-05 (6 months)
Motorman: Zeus 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-02 - 2016-06-17 (4 months)
Motorman: Bufflehead - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-10 - 2015-08-26 (7 months)
Motorman: Tundra - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-19 - 2014-09-29 (1 month)
Motorman: F.Shokhirev - Dry Cargo / 2013-08-14 - 2013-12-27 (4 months)
OS: Patriot - Bulk Carrier / 2013-04-14 - 2013-11-21 (7 months)
Motorman: Vasiliy Tatishev - Dry Cargo / 2016-12-01 - 2017-04-07 (4 months)
Motorman: Sandra - Dry Cargo / 2016-05-07 - 2016-11-14 (6 months)
Master: OCEAN WINNER - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-10-08 - 2017-04-01 (6 months)
Master: OCEAN FORTUNE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-11-13 - 2016-08-06 (9 months)
Master: LS AIZENSHTAT - Container Ship / 2015-01-28 - 2015-07-22 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Sofia - Bulk Carrier / 2014-03-27 - 2014-09-13 (6 months)
Master: BBC ADRIATIC - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-04-18 - 2013-09-05 (5 months)
Master: Pileas I - Tug boat / 2016-10-01 - 2017-03-31 (6 months)
Barge Master: Maniviki Dexter - Accommodation barge / 2015-11-04 - 2016-02-23 (4 months)
Barge Master: Armada Mahakam - Accommodation barge / 2015-01-08 - 2015-04-30 (4 months)
Barge Master: Armada Mahakam - Accommodation barge / 2014-06-16 - 2014-10-16 (4 months)
Barge Master: Armada Hibiscus - Accommodation barge / 2014-02-01 - 2014-04-20 (3 months)
OS: MAX PRIDE - Container Ship / 2016-07-29 - 2017-03-28 (8 months)
OS: SIERRA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-10 - 2015-06-09 (8 months)
OS: PIVDENNY - Tug boat / 2009-07-25 - 2012-11-21 (3 years)
Electrician: TOTO BR - General cargo / 2016-11-03 - 2017-03-25 (5 months)
Electrician: BBC Amazon - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-02-12 - 2016-06-08 (4 months)
Electrician: BBC Idaho - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2012-06-26 - 2012-10-20 (4 months)
Electrician: BBC Switzerland - Heavy lift vessel / 2011-12-20 - 2012-04-21 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: True colors - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-07-02 - 2017-03-15 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Eems Dublin - Construction vessel / 2017-01-03 - 2017-03-15 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Abis Calais - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-09-30 - 2016-11-12 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Abis Bremen - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-08-18 - 2016-09-30 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Abis Albufeira - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-03-21 - 2016-06-17 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Abis Albufeira - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-09-12 - 2015-12-10 (3 months)
Chief Officer: New Gemini - General cargo / 2016-10-24 - 2017-03-10 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Nikita Kozhemyaka - General cargo / 2016-03-18 - 2016-08-05 (5 months)
Chief Officer: MELITA - General cargo / 2015-06-20 - 2015-12-02 (5 months)
2nd Officer: ALMERIA - Dry Cargo / 2014-04-05 - 2014-12-01 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Kapitan Shyriagin - General cargo / 2012-10-15 - 2013-03-24 (5 months)
OS: Kapitan Chekha - General cargo / 2016-08-08 - 2017-03-03 (7 months)
Motorman: FUNKY - Dry Cargo / 2016-06-17 - 2017-02-19 (8 months)
Motorman: FUNKY - Dry Cargo / 2015-10-12 - 2016-04-14 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Koningsborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-11-22 - 2017-01-19 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Willeke - Coaster / 2016-06-20 - 2016-09-27 (3 months)
Chief Officer: SDS Rain - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-08-28 - 2016-01-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: El Nino - Reefer / 2015-02-02 - 2015-03-28 (2 months)
Chief Officer: El Nino - Reefer / 2014-08-08 - 2014-10-14 (2 months)