Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: M.V. MIRAGE - AHTS / 2019-11-13 - 2020-01-24 (2 months)
Motorman: M.V. MIRAGE - AHTS / 2019-07-14 - 2019-10-19 (3 months)
OS: Palladiy - General cargo / 2019-06-04 - 2020-01-24 (8 months)
OS: Paula 2 - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-15 - 2019-01-17 (6 months)
OS: Porada - General cargo / 2017-04-25 - 2017-06-27 (2 months)
Motorman: B/K DOKER - Tug boat / 2019-07-08 - 2020-01-17 (6 months)
Motorman: t/h Ukrainetc - Tug boat / 2018-05-21 - 2018-08-21 (3 months)
Motorman: B/K DOKER - Tug boat / 2018-02-21 - 2018-04-21 (2 months)
Motorman: OM-101 - Ferry / 2017-06-01 - 2017-07-31 (2 months)
OS: VOLGO BALT 217 - General cargo / 2019-06-09 - 2020-01-16 (7 months)
OS: Slavutich-15 - General cargo / 2018-08-17 - 2018-12-29 (4 months)
Electrician: VIALLI - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-22 - 2020-01-13 (6 months)
Electrician: Atlantic Spirit - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-01 - 2019-05-05 (6 months)
Electrician: BELLATRIX - General cargo / 2017-11-01 - 2018-05-28 (7 months)
Electrician: Leonid Leonov - General cargo / 2016-12-25 - 2017-06-24 (6 months)
Motorman: Viktor Subbotin - Other vessels / 2019-07-29 - 2020-01-10 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Alexander Peresvet - General cargo / 2018-06-01 - 2018-10-03 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Kapitan Izmailov - Icebreaker / 2017-10-02 - 2017-11-02 (1 month)
OS: Streamline - General cargo / 2019-09-03 - 2020-01-03 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Profit - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-01 - 2020-01-01 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: CITADEL - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-05-28 - 2019-12-30 (7 months)
El. Engineer: Поволжье-4 - Dry Cargo / 2019-04-01 - 2019-12-30 (9 months)
El. Engineer: Гидроперегружатель-2 - Dredger / 2016-07-11 - 2017-06-01 (11 months)
El. Engineer: Шлюзовой-102 - Tug boat / 2015-05-06 - 2016-03-14 (10 months)
El. Engineer: Шлюзовой-19 - Tug boat / 2014-04-03 - 2014-11-20 (8 months)
Messman: Perseas - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-28 - 2019-12-28 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Dream S - General cargo / 2015-06-19 - 2015-10-01 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Alexander Zhynik - General cargo / 2014-03-24 - 2014-08-28 (5 months)
OS / Welder: Волгонефть 55 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-02 - 2019-12-26 (3 months)
OS: Глен - Fishing vessel / 2017-12-09 - 2018-04-09 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Bodryy - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-10 - 2019-12-24 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Kan 2 - General cargo / 2019-07-17 - 2019-12-20 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Maersk Calabar - Container Ship / 2019-06-16 - 2019-12-17 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Maersk Colombo - Container Ship / 2018-07-06 - 2019-01-09 (6 months)
ETO: Far Stattesman - AHTS / 2019-11-14 - 2019-12-11 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: MV MERAY GLYFADA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-07 - 2019-12-06 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Nilson B - General cargo / 2019-07-30 - 2019-12-04 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Daniel K - General cargo / 2017-11-15 - 2018-05-09 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Rome - General cargo / 2016-12-09 - 2017-05-15 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Clara K - General cargo / 2015-10-21 - 2016-04-18 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Elisabeth K - General cargo / 2014-12-09 - 2015-05-29 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Odin Express PSV - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-11-09 - 2019-12-03 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Odin Express PSV - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-10-18 - 2019-11-08 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Agat Zeit AHTS - AHTS / 2019-01-17 - 2019-07-16 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Gilda - General cargo / 2018-08-31 - 2018-12-01 (3 months)
OS: Sarir - General cargo / 2017-01-14 - 2017-10-22 (9 months)
Engine Cadet: OMSKIY-157 - General cargo / 2019-06-13 - 2019-11-19 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: VOLGO-BALT 232 - General cargo / 2018-05-17 - 2018-08-18 (3 months)