Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
2nd Officer: AK FERAS - General cargo / 2023-05-10 - 2024-07-20 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: AL HUSSEIN - RO-RO / 2014-06-22 - 2014-08-04 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: RSCL EXPRESS - General cargo / 2013-04-14 - 2013-07-25 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: AEGEAN PEARL - RO-RO / 2012-07-28 - 2013-03-11 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: EGY PRIDE - Container Ship / 2012-03-27 - 2012-05-16 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: MSC Kanoko - Container Ship / 2024-02-12 - 2024-07-15 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: MSC Roberta V - Container Ship / 2023-06-30 - 2023-12-11 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2024-05-07 - 2024-07-10 (2 months)
AB / Motorman: m/t Chemtrans Nova - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-01-26 - 2024-07-09 (5 months)
AB / Motorman: m/t Chemtrans Naos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-26 - 2023-12-19 (1 month)
AB / Motorman: m/t Constellation - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-14 - 2023-07-06 (7 months)
AB / Motorman: m/v Eraclea - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-07 - 2022-02-14 (7 months)
AB / Motorman: m/v Eraclea - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-24 - 2020-12-17 (9 months)
ETO: Aleksey Chirikov - Platform Supply vessel / 2024-04-03 - 2024-07-01 (3 months)
3rd Officer: ST.PETER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-18 - 2024-07-01 (6 months)
3rd Officer: ST. OSWALD - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-21 - 2023-08-20 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Anna-Meta - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-25 - 2021-12-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Viking Destiny - RO-RO / 2020-12-03 - 2021-04-11 (4 months)
OS: Viking Destiny - RO-RO / 2020-07-01 - 2020-12-02 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: ST THERESA - Bulk Carrier / 2024-01-28 - 2024-06-23 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: BEL AIR - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-25 - 2023-12-01 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: OCEAN JADE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-18 - 2023-02-03 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: RUBY INDAH - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-15 - 2022-04-14 (9 months)
Chief Engineer: OCEAN MAKMUR - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-22 - 2021-04-20 (9 months)
OS: VASILIY TATISCHEV - General cargo / 2023-03-11 - 2024-06-23 (1 year)
Motorman: visir - Research vessel / 2024-04-12 - 2024-06-13 (2 months)
Messman: Black marlin - Heavy lift vessel / 2024-02-13 - 2024-06-05 (4 months)
Messman: Blue marlin - Heavy lift vessel / 2023-06-09 - 2023-10-27 (5 months)
Messman: White Marlin - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-10-10 - 2023-02-15 (4 months)
Messman: Antwerp eagle - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-15 - 2022-04-29 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: IBAIZABAL CINCO - Tug boat / 2024-04-01 - 2024-06-01 (2 months)
Oiler: KAVKAZ V - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-20 - 2024-05-31 (1 month)
Oiler: KAVKAZ I - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-12 - 2024-04-19 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Kaying - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-24 - 2024-05-29 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Kaying - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-19 - 2022-02-19 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Druzhba - Training Ship / 2020-08-03 - 2020-08-30 (1 month)
Master: MERA - Chemical tanker / 2024-01-20 - 2024-05-25 (4 months)
Master: METIN HUSEYNOV - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-08-20 - 2023-11-05 (3 months)
Master: JABRAYIL DOVLATZADEH - Chemical tanker / 2023-03-05 - 2023-07-18 (4 months)
Master: ADIL IBRAHIMLI - Chemical tanker / 2023-01-02 - 2023-03-01 (2 months)
Master: ADIL IBRAHIMLI - Chemical tanker / 2022-06-13 - 2022-09-15 (3 months)
Master: LA PEARL - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-03-08 - 2024-05-25 (3 months)
Master: PRADA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-01 - 2024-03-06 (4 months)
Master: PRADA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-05-27 - 2023-10-30 (5 months)
Master: KARMA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-12-28 - 2023-04-30 (4 months)
Master: PK MARIT - Chemical tanker / 2021-11-05 - 2022-03-18 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Alexander Sannicov - Icebreaker / 2022-05-10 - 2024-05-18 (2 years)
4th Engineer: Pola Anisia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-29 - 2021-07-25 (4 months)
Motormen / Turner: Pola Anisia - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-12 - 2020-12-15 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: ESENIYA - General cargo / 2019-08-28 - 2019-12-11 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Galan - General cargo / 2018-01-28 - 2018-04-15 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Aquavita Trust - Bulk Carrier / 2023-12-04 - 2024-05-17 (5 months)
Motorman: Hector Afina - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-02-09 - 2024-05-15 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Samson - Tug boat / 2023-07-01 - 2023-09-01 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Vodolaz KUZMINIH - Tug boat / 2022-09-01 - 2023-01-10 (4 months)
Steward: Ievoli Amber - Tug boat / 2023-12-28 - 2024-05-12 (4 months)
Steward: VICTORINE - RO-RO / 2022-08-23 - 2022-10-28 (2 months)
Messman: MSC Talia F - Container Ship / 2021-08-14 - 2022-07-25 (11 months)
Steward: Victory Shine - General cargo / 2020-11-15 - 2021-05-08 (6 months)
Steward: Fleet Leader - RO-RO / 2019-08-27 - 2020-03-11 (6 months)
AB Seaman: M.T.Swarna Sindhu - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-09-12 - 2024-05-11 (8 months)
OS: K.D.Malaviya - Accommodation barge / 2022-09-01 - 2023-01-24 (5 months)
OS: L.J.Johnson - Accommodation barge / 2022-05-21 - 2022-07-08 (2 months)
OS: N.B.Prasad - Accommodation barge / 2021-08-26 - 2022-03-13 (6 months)
OS: VAFA 3 - General cargo / 2019-10-03 - 2020-12-15 (1 year)