Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Electrician: MIR - Sailing Vessel / 2022-03-05 - 2022-09-12 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: KNYAZ VLADIMIR - Passenger vessel / 2018-09-13 - 2019-05-13 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: akhtiar - Tug boat / 2022-03-07 - 2022-09-04 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: AKHTIARI - Tug boat / 2022-03-07 - 2022-09-04 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: SHAMAN WISDOM - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-13 - 2022-09-02 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Jutta - Bulk Carrier / 2022-04-09 - 2022-09-02 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Anna-Meta - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-22 - 2022-04-08 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Anna-Barbara - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-07 - 2021-09-04 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Anna-Elisabeth - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-24 - 2019-12-22 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Florintine Oetker - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-05 - 2018-11-29 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: AEGEA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-08 - 2022-08-31 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Agata - Container Ship / 2021-07-06 - 2022-03-19 (8 months)
Deck Fitter: MSC Jordan - Container Ship / 2020-11-18 - 2021-06-12 (7 months)
Mess Boy: Desimi Valleta - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-11-11 - 2022-08-29 (10 months)
OS: Omskiy-206 - Dry Cargo / 2022-04-21 - 2022-08-26 (4 months)
Ship Security Officer: MSC Azurit F , MSC MIRELLA R, MSC Vaishnavi R , MSC Nina F , Cape Tainaro - Container Ship / 2022-04-14 - 2022-08-26 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Friendship - Other vessels / 2022-07-24 - 2022-08-24 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: TSDH ABUL - Dredger / 2022-02-21 - 2022-08-21 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Favori - General cargo / 2022-01-18 - 2022-08-20 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Kaunas - Ferry / 2020-07-10 - 2021-02-12 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Greifswald - Ferry / 2020-06-04 - 2020-07-03 (1 month)
Messman: MSC SANTHYA - Container Ship / 2022-02-20 - 2022-08-20 (6 months)
Messman: MSC SANTHYA - Container Ship / 2021-02-20 - 2021-08-20 (6 months)
Messman: MSC SANTHYA - Container Ship / 2014-02-12 - 2014-02-12 (0 days)
OS: Norsel - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-03-01 - 2022-08-15 (5 months)
OS: Norsel - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-27 - 2021-11-27 (3 months)
OS: RIX ZENITH - General cargo / 2021-02-27 - 2021-04-30 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Akhtiar - Tug boat / 2022-02-14 - 2022-08-14 (6 months)
Motorman: Tug boat Burun - Tug boat / 2022-06-10 - 2022-08-10 (2 months)
Boatswain: Атлас - Fishing vessel / 2021-01-11 - 2022-08-08 (1 year)
Boatswain: Грей - Reefer / 2018-08-21 - 2019-04-21 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Diktis - Reefer / 2017-10-13 - 2018-03-14 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Knightship - Bulk Carrier / 2021-12-12 - 2022-08-08 (8 months)
Chief Engineer: Lordship - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-14 - 2021-09-26 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Knightship - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-11 - 2021-01-12 (1 year)
Chief Engineer: Gloriiuship - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-04 - 2019-08-12 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Lordship - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-08 - 2019-02-19 (4 months)
AB / Motorman: MSC ESHA - Container Ship / 2022-07-01 - 2022-07-31 (1 month)
AB / Motorman: MSC Vancouver - Container Ship / 2022-05-28 - 2022-06-30 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: DOBRYNYA NIKITICH - General cargo / 2022-01-09 - 2022-04-28 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: ILYA MUROMETS - General cargo / 2021-04-28 - 2021-07-01 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: SVYATOY PYOTR - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-31 - 2020-04-17 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Seaspan Rio De Janeiro - Container Ship / 2022-03-23 - 2022-07-20 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Seaspan Jakarta - Container Ship / 2021-10-27 - 2022-03-17 (5 months)