Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Head Waiter: Carnival Imagination - Passenger vessel / 2018-11-18 - 2019-07-25 (8 months)
Head Waiter: Carnival Victory - Passenger vessel / 2016-02-01 - 2016-04-24 (3 months)
Head Waiter: Carnival Victory - Passenger vessel / 2015-09-24 - 2016-01-18 (4 months)
Head Waiter: Carnival Paradise - Passenger vessel / 2015-02-16 - 2015-07-16 (5 months)
Dining Room Waiter: Carnival Destiny - Passenger vessel / 2007-09-12 - 2008-05-30 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2019-04-10 - 2019-07-10 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2018-06-01 - 2018-08-31 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2018-05-04 - 2018-05-23 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: TS Vishwanath - Other vessels / 2015-08-04 - 2019-07-04 (3 years)
AB Seaman: Atlantic Hermes . Belize city - Fishing vessel / 2019-02-26 - 2019-06-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: FIV Sei Whale Charlestoun - Fishing vessel / 2015-11-12 - 2016-03-17 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Marshal Novikov Basseterre - Fishing vessel / 2014-12-28 - 2015-05-04 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Ribalka Sevastopol - Fishing vessel / 2013-09-28 - 2014-06-30 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Ribalka Sevastopol - Fishing vessel / 2011-09-01 - 2012-04-17 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Калиновка - Fishing vessel / 2018-10-29 - 2019-06-19 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Калиновка - Fishing vessel / 2018-05-29 - 2018-10-29 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Arbat - General cargo / 2017-07-01 - 2017-12-07 (5 months)
AB Seaman: ELEEN NEPTUNE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-01 - 2019-06-18 (5 months)
AB Seaman: BEDFORD CASTLE - General cargo / 2018-05-21 - 2018-10-20 (5 months)
AB Seaman: BEDFORD CASTLE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-18 - 2018-03-28 (6 months)
OS: BSLE Nina - General cargo / 2016-11-23 - 2017-05-06 (5 months)
OS: BISLE PASIFIC - Dry Cargo / 2014-10-10 - 2016-07-02 (1 year)
Mess Boy: Cruise And Maritime Voages(CMV) - Passenger vessel / 2018-09-20 - 2019-06-06 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Polar - Pilot boat / 2018-12-03 - 2019-06-03 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Sea Goldcrest - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-02-19 - 2019-05-10 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Sea Goldcrest - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-11-25 - 2019-02-01 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Sea Spear - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-05-15 - 2018-07-20 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Mubarak Spirit - AHTS / 2018-01-18 - 2018-04-28 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-10-01 - 2017-12-20 (3 months)
1st Officer: OMSKIY 157 - General cargo / 2018-11-26 - 2019-05-10 (5 months)
1st Officer: PORT OLYA 2 - Other vessels / 2017-09-26 - 2018-05-10 (7 months)
1st Officer: ALIOTH - Other vessels / 2016-11-29 - 2017-04-26 (5 months)
Chief Officer: AVALON - Dry Cargo / 2015-12-14 - 2016-11-24 (11 months)
2nd Officer: AVIOR - Dry Cargo / 2013-09-27 - 2014-01-03 (3 months)
OS: M/v san rafael uno - Container Ship / 2019-03-07 - 2019-05-08 (2 months)
OS: M/v st anthony de padua - Passenger vessel / 2019-01-31 - 2019-03-02 (1 month)
OS: M/v san rafael uno - Container Ship / 2018-11-14 - 2018-12-24 (1 month)
OS: M/v st pope john paul II - Passenger vessel / 2018-09-01 - 2018-11-07 (2 months)
OS: M/v st ignatius of loyola - Passenger vessel / 2018-07-27 - 2018-08-31 (1 month)
Master: MV. Brit Oil 59 - AHT / 2018-01-11 - 2019-04-30 (1 year)
Master: MV. Armada Tuah 104 - AHTS / 2017-04-05 - 2017-12-28 (9 months)
Master: MV. Armada 5 - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-03-03 - 2015-07-27 (5 months)
Master: MV.Perdana horizon - AHTS / 2014-01-09 - 2014-10-20 (9 months)
Master: MV. Perdana Adventure - AHTS / 2013-01-01 - 2013-05-15 (4 months)
First Cook: Panagia Kanala - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-11-28 - 2019-04-29 (5 months)
First Cook: Daylight - General cargo / 2018-03-16 - 2018-10-04 (7 months)
OS: VICTORIA - General cargo / 2018-10-24 - 2019-04-25 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2017-06-19 - 2017-07-14 (1 month)
Trainee Officer: Training Ship Santa Maria Manuela - Sailing Vessel / 2019-03-28 - 2019-04-01 (4 days)
OS: Venus - Dry Cargo / 2018-10-26 - 2019-04-01 (5 months)
Wiper: M/V Filipinas Maasin - Passenger vessel / 2018-01-29 - 2019-03-20 (1 year)
Electrician: cms-3 - AHTS / 2019-02-20 - 2019-03-18 (1 month)
Electrician: cms-pahlavan - AHTS / 2019-01-10 - 2019-02-19 (1 month)
Electrician: cms-3 - Tug boat / 2018-08-26 - 2018-12-10 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: AL Fahidi 1 - RO-RO / 2018-03-11 - 2019-03-11 (1 year)
Chief Officer: Srakane - General cargo / 2018-07-21 - 2019-03-09 (8 months)
Chief Officer: Moraz - General cargo / 2017-03-20 - 2017-10-07 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Aller - General cargo / 2016-03-16 - 2016-07-29 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Aller - General cargo / 2015-06-29 - 2015-11-06 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Svetoslava - General cargo / 2014-06-03 - 2015-02-05 (8 months)