Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman-welder: Indus Victory - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-08 - 2022-05-13 (1 year)
Motorman-welder: Afros - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-26 - 2021-02-06 (11 months)
Motorman-welder: Mv Achilleas S - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-05 - 2019-12-21 (10 months)
Motorman-welder: MV Wookie - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-16 - 2018-08-25 (3 months)
Motorman-welder: Mv Mineral Yarden - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-25 - 2017-12-22 (6 months)
Oiler: Jay Ananda - Dry Cargo / 2021-10-28 - 2022-05-09 (6 months)
Messman: JY POWER Bulk Carrier, Panama - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-10 - 2022-05-01 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Mys Tarkhankut - AHTS / 2021-05-03 - 2021-08-01 (3 months)
Trainee OS: Стивідор - Tug boat / 2020-06-23 - 2020-08-21 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2021-09-12 - 2022-04-30 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2020-11-21 - 2021-05-24 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2019-11-13 - 2020-05-18 (6 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Grand Aniva - LPG / LNG / 2019-03-18 - 2019-07-09 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Viktor Konetsky - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-27 - 2018-12-03 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: MT OLYMPIC XX - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-10-25 - 2022-04-25 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Green Bodo - Reefer / 2021-09-16 - 2022-04-24 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Green Bodo - Reefer / 2020-11-09 - 2021-04-30 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Green Maloy - Reefer / 2019-12-17 - 2020-06-30 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Green Concordia - Reefer / 2019-01-31 - 2019-08-30 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Green Concordia - Reefer / 2018-05-08 - 2018-10-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Aida 4 - Training Ship / 2021-09-13 - 2022-04-21 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: M V Elina II - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-10 - 2022-04-21 (7 months)
Master: Red Ruby - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-14 - 2022-04-17 (6 months)
Master: Apama - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-12-05 - 2021-05-20 (5 months)
Master: Babel - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-01-22 - 2020-07-12 (6 months)
AB Seaman: M/v Star SKN - Fishing vessel / 2021-10-01 - 2022-04-15 (6 months)
AB Seaman: M/v Geysir - Fishing vessel / 2017-06-07 - 2020-01-07 (2 years)
AB Seaman: M/v saga - Fishing vessel / 2014-12-01 - 2016-02-07 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Taimyr - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-21 - 2022-04-15 (8 months)
OS: FESCO Magadan - Container Ship / 2020-10-30 - 2021-03-19 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Cadet - Training Ship / 2022-02-01 - 2022-04-14 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Venture Dylan - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-21 - 2022-04-11 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Orpheus - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-31 - 2019-05-27 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: ORPHEUS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-14 - 2018-04-17 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: JPO Tucana - Container Ship / 2016-11-07 - 2017-03-18 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: JPO Tucana - Container Ship / 2015-06-08 - 2015-11-16 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: JOETEK KROKOGHAN - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-10-02 - 2022-03-31 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: LEO C - Container Ship / 2021-08-06 - 2022-03-27 (8 months)
Motorman: Bakai - Tug boat / 2021-01-08 - 2021-03-15 (2 months)
AB Seaman: TAIBAH 1 - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-02-10 - 2022-03-25 (1 year)
AB Seaman: NEFRTY - General cargo / 2019-01-15 - 2019-10-27 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: T/V CADET - Training Ship / 2021-09-15 - 2022-03-23 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: BANGLAR SHOURABH - VLCC / 2021-03-30 - 2022-03-23 (12 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Schweiz Stream - Reefer / 2021-10-20 - 2022-03-18 (5 months)
OS: m/v Elvira - Reefer / 2021-01-12 - 2021-07-26 (6 months)
OS: m/v Emerald - Reefer / 2020-07-01 - 2020-11-24 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Vladimir Rusanov - Chemical tanker / 2019-10-22 - 2020-03-22 (5 months)
OS: Grange Bay - Fishing vessel / 2017-06-07 - 2017-10-09 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Crown Garnet - Reefer / 2021-11-06 - 2022-03-17 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Crown sapphire - Reefer / 2020-11-05 - 2021-06-24 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Crown Garnet - Reefer / 2020-05-02 - 2020-07-17 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Crown Sapphire - Reefer / 2019-10-22 - 2020-02-06 (3 months)