Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: Blue Fury - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-07-18 - 2015-01-19 (6 months)
Mess Boy: AG Methodios - Bulk Carrier / 2013-07-16 - 2014-01-13 (6 months)
OS: Portovik - Tug boat / 2011-06-02 - 2011-08-02 (2 months)
Chief Cook: Bourbon Liberty 247 - AHTS / 2014-11-11 - 2015-01-19 (2 months)
Chief Cook: Scapino - AHT / 2012-02-20 - 2012-06-10 (4 months)
Chief Cook: Scapino - AHT / 2011-05-19 - 2011-08-20 (3 months)
Chief Cook: Conger - Chemical tanker / 2010-06-18 - 2010-12-16 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Orion - Container Ship / 2009-01-07 - 2009-04-26 (4 months)
Motorman: Vogecarrier - Bulk Carrier / 2014-07-27 - 2014-12-31 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: M/v Ortelius - Icebreaker / 2013-05-07 - 2013-10-06 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Maersk Miami - Container Ship / 2012-10-05 - 2013-01-18 (3 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nedlloyd Honshu - Container Ship / 2012-02-12 - 2012-06-19 (4 months)
Master: Sider Pamina - General cargo / 2014-07-13 - 2014-11-20 (4 months)
Master: Beata - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-09-05 - 2014-01-18 (4 months)
Master: Isabella - General cargo / 2013-03-15 - 2013-07-28 (4 months)
Master: Isabella - General cargo / 2012-09-09 - 2013-01-11 (4 months)
Master: Alana - General cargo / 2012-06-12 - 2012-09-08 (3 months)
2nd Officer: WILSON NORTH - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-06-17 - 2014-10-17 (4 months)
2nd Officer: WILSON ROSS - Bulk Carrier / 2013-10-25 - 2014-03-07 (4 months)
2nd Officer: WILSON NORFOLK - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-05-04 - 2013-09-08 (4 months)
2nd Officer: WILSON NICE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-02-03 - 2013-03-28 (2 months)
2nd Officer: KAPITAN LUS - General cargo / 2012-05-29 - 2012-10-15 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Anatoly Churinov - General cargo / 2014-05-21 - 2014-09-21 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Anatoly Kolesov - General cargo / 2014-01-10 - 2014-01-24 (14 days)
2nd Officer: Anatoly Kolesov - General cargo / 2013-06-25 - 2013-12-06 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Anatoly Churinov - General cargo / 2012-07-31 - 2012-11-09 (3 months)
2nd Officer: Omskiy-125 - General cargo / 2011-10-05 - 2012-01-20 (3 months)
El. Engineer: MV "HORNCLIF" - Reefer / 2014-03-23 - 2014-07-28 (4 months)
El. Engineer: MV "HORNCLIF" - Reefer / 2013-07-20 - 2013-11-02 (3 months)
El. Engineer: MV " HORNBAY " - Reefer / 2013-02-20 - 2013-04-24 (2 months)
El. Engineer: Chile Star - Reefer / 2011-03-20 - 2011-06-08 (3 months)
El. Engineer: Ice Field - Reefer / 2009-11-16 - 2010-05-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: ULS Ferry 1 - RO-RO / 2014-03-29 - 2014-07-25 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Elans - Dry Cargo / 2013-05-10 - 2013-09-21 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Nerey - Dry Cargo / 2012-07-17 - 2013-02-20 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Elans - Dry Cargo / 2012-07-17 - 2013-02-20 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Forward-1 - Dry Cargo / 2009-09-21 - 2010-06-29 (9 months)
Chief Officer: DB-101 - Cable laying vessel / 2014-06-06 - 2014-07-24 (2 months)
Chief Officer: DB-101 - Construction vessel / 2014-03-01 - 2014-04-12 (1 month)
Chief Officer: DB-101 - Construction vessel / 2013-12-07 - 2014-01-18 (1 month)
Chief Officer: DB-101 - Construction vessel / 2013-09-14 - 2013-10-26 (1 month)
Chief Officer: DB-101 - Construction vessel / 2013-06-13 - 2013-07-27 (1 month)
Motorman: SLV-400 - Other vessels / 2014-05-08 - 2014-07-10 (2 months)
Motorman: "Forward" - Floating Hotel / 2014-03-14 - 2014-06-26 (3 months)
Motorman: "Novoulyanovsk" - Fishing vessel / 2012-01-16 - 2012-06-08 (5 months)
Motorman: "Prostor" - Fishing vessel / 2011-10-06 - 2011-12-30 (3 months)
Motorman: Atlas Wave - General cargo / 2013-08-06 - 2014-05-20 (9 months)
Motorman: Atlas Wind - General cargo / 2012-06-12 - 2013-04-26 (10 months)
Boatswain: PATRIA - Container Ship / 2013-09-13 - 2014-05-19 (8 months)
Boatswain: HHL Fremantle - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-11-21 - 2013-06-17 (7 months)
Boatswain: HHL Valparaiso - Heavy lift vessel / 2012-03-15 - 2012-09-15 (6 months)
Boatswain: HHL Rio de Janeiro - Heavy lift vessel / 2011-06-09 - 2011-11-13 (5 months)
Boatswain: Beluga London - Heavy lift vessel / 2010-11-07 - 2011-03-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Marsus - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-02-05 - 2014-04-30 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Ocean Victory - General cargo / 2013-04-28 - 2013-12-15 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Ocean Glory - General cargo / 2012-04-17 - 2012-12-06 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Darja - General cargo / 2011-03-29 - 2011-12-01 (8 months)
2nd Officer: Nika - General cargo / 2010-06-19 - 2010-11-12 (5 months)
Boatswain: Caspian Endeavour - AHTS / 2013-05-28 - 2014-03-12 (9 months)
Boatswain: Bourbon Liberty 305 - AHTS / 2012-09-13 - 2013-04-16 (7 months)
Boatswain: Primus - AHT / 2011-08-02 - 2012-09-01 (1 year)
Boatswain: Bourbon Liberty 249 - AHTS / 2011-09-20 - 2012-07-12 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Pegasus,Centaurus,Primus - AHT / 2009-04-07 - 2011-11-10 (2 years)
Chief Officer: Sereno - Container Ship / 2013-12-11 - 2014-01-30 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Diamant - Container Ship / 2013-11-03 - 2013-12-10 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Sereno - Container Ship / 2013-06-30 - 2013-09-18 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Pelican - Standby-safety vessel / 2013-04-02 - 2013-05-27 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Diamant - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-01-17 - 2013-03-06 (2 months)
AB Seaman: BOA DEEP C - Offshore Supply vessel / 2013-11-23 - 2013-12-19 (1 month)
AB Seaman: SIEM LOUISA - Offshore Supply vessel / 2013-02-27 - 2013-09-26 (7 months)
AB Seaman: SIEM LOUISA - Offshore Supply vessel / 2013-02-27 - 2013-05-09 (2 months)
2nd Officer: AMUR 2510 - Dry Cargo / 2012-03-16 - 2012-07-10 (4 months)
AB / Crane Operator: SBL BOA GALATEA - SBL Vessel / 2011-12-19 - 2012-02-29 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Atlantic Orion - Reefer / 2013-07-25 - 2013-11-15 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Kerchenskiy 2 - Ferry / 2012-06-28 - 2012-08-27 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Kerchenskiy 2 - Ferry / 2012-03-04 - 2012-06-12 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: BRIZ - Tug boat / 2011-06-15 - 2011-11-15 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Yeysk - Ferry / 2010-07-02 - 2010-09-29 (3 months)
OS: Okhta Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-09-18 - 2013-11-11 (2 months)
OS: Nevskiy Prospect - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-11-25 - 2013-04-14 (5 months)
OS: Turid Knutsen - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-04-10 - 2012-11-01 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Fehn Mistrl - Dry Cargo / 2011-03-18 - 2011-09-16 (6 months)