Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: MV Integrador - RO-RO / 2021-12-30 - 2022-04-26 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Tua 84 - Tug boat / 2020-03-16 - 2020-08-05 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Pat M - Dredger / 2018-09-19 - 2020-01-15 (1 year)
OS: TIUMEN I - General cargo / 2021-09-12 - 2022-04-23 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Гранит - Tug boat / 2021-03-19 - 2021-06-24 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Trader - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-27 - 2022-04-22 (10 months)
OS: Geliodor - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-13 - 2022-04-15 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Nadezhda - Sailing Vessel / 2020-08-04 - 2020-09-26 (2 months)
OS: Zaliv vostok - Chemical tanker / 2019-07-07 - 2019-10-25 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Nadezhda - Sailing Vessel / 2018-06-11 - 2018-08-12 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Akademik Tryoshnikov - General cargo / 2021-12-01 - 2022-04-12 (4 months)
AB Seaman: KAREN - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-04-10 - 2021-08-13 (4 months)
Boatswain: POSEIDON - Research vessel / 2016-06-05 - 2021-04-05 (4 years)
AB Seaman: BELORUS - General cargo / 2007-12-17 - 2008-05-29 (5 months)
Boatswain: EKOLOG - Research vessel / 2001-12-28 - 2006-04-27 (4 years)
OS: Liberty - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-17 - 2022-04-10 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: ABS AMELIA - Platform Supply vessel / 2021-10-30 - 2022-04-06 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: GRANIT - Tug boat / 2021-06-08 - 2022-03-31 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: NAWIGATOR XXI - Research vessel / 2022-02-28 - 2022-03-20 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: NAWIGATOR XXI - Research vessel / 2021-05-31 - 2021-06-13 (13 days)
Galley Cleaner: Celebrity cruises, Celebrity silhouette - Cruise Liner / 2017-07-12 - 2022-03-13 (4 years)
Master: SIBUR TOBOL - LPG / LNG / 2021-11-23 - 2022-03-13 (4 months)
Master: SIBUR TOBOL - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-05 - 2021-07-24 (5 months)
Master: SIBUR TOBOL - LPG / LNG / 2020-04-26 - 2020-10-29 (6 months)
Master: SIBUR TOBOL - LPG / LNG / 2019-08-07 - 2019-11-13 (3 months)
Master: SCF TOBOLSK - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-08 - 2019-05-26 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: M.T PVT VENUS - Chemical tanker / 2021-03-06 - 2022-03-09 (1 year)
Motorman: m/v MARAKLIS - General cargo / 2021-06-07 - 2022-03-07 (9 months)
Oiler: m/v LILIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-23 - 2021-05-25 (8 months)
Oiler: m/v LILIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-22 - 2020-02-01 (11 months)
Oiler: M/V UNIWIND - General cargo / 2015-05-01 - 2015-08-27 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V CADET - Training Ship / 2021-09-01 - 2022-03-01 (6 months)
Master: Noble Orion - Tug boat / 2017-03-23 - 2022-03-01 (4 years)
Master: Noble Atlas - Tug boat / 2015-03-26 - 2015-12-08 (8 months)
Master: Star Discovery - Tug boat / 2013-10-14 - 2014-03-26 (5 months)
Wiper: MV pearl 9 - Accommodation barge / 2021-02-16 - 2022-03-01 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: CADET - Training Ship / 2021-09-01 - 2022-02-28 (6 months)
Mechanic: Atlantic Glory - Fishing vessel / 2022-01-21 - 2022-02-26 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Amstelborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-10-06 - 2022-02-19 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Amurborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-09-03 - 2021-10-05 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Victoriaborg - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-09-02 - 2021-02-02 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Gas Allure - LPG / LNG / 2021-11-24 - 2022-02-19 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Al Barrah - LPG / LNG / 2021-04-19 - 2021-08-18 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Matharki - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-11 - 2019-10-25 (3 months)
Chief Engineer: Umm Laqhab - LPG / LNG / 2019-01-19 - 2019-03-19 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Umm Laqhab - LPG / LNG / 2018-08-03 - 2018-10-20 (3 months)