Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Wilson Leith - General cargo / 2022-01-20 - 2022-05-20 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Wilson Luga - General cargo / 2021-06-06 - 2021-10-07 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Desna - Tug boat / 2020-04-19 - 2020-10-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Dunay - Tug boat / 2019-11-15 - 2020-02-15 (3 months)
Cook: MSC Brianna - Container Ship / 2022-03-22 - 2022-05-19 (2 months)
Messman: MSC Brianna - Container Ship / 2021-09-16 - 2022-03-21 (6 months)
Messman: MSC ELA - Container Ship / 2019-09-11 - 2020-01-07 (4 months)
Messman: MSC NORA - Container Ship / 2018-09-24 - 2019-04-18 (7 months)
Messman: MSC HIMANSHI - Container Ship / 2017-08-24 - 2018-03-11 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Baltic Swift - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-16 - 2022-05-18 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Baltic Swft - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-02-26 - 2021-07-08 (4 months)
4th Engineer: KEREL - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-02 - 2020-12-01 (4 months)
4th Engineer: KEREL - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-21 - 2020-02-21 (4 months)
Oiler: STI Executive - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-12-12 - 2019-04-30 (5 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: Marshal Novikov - Fishing vessel / 2021-10-29 - 2022-05-18 (7 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: Marshal Novikov - Fishing vessel / 2020-12-17 - 2021-05-28 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Marshal Novikov - Fishing vessel / 2019-12-04 - 2020-06-24 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: SCF Alpine - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-01-10 - 2022-05-14 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: SCF Alpine - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-04-01 - 2021-09-05 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: SCF Alpine - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-02-16 - 2020-09-25 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Cosco Hellas - Container Ship / 2021-08-24 - 2022-05-12 (9 months)
OS: CSL Frontier - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-14 - 2022-05-10 (9 months)
OS: Maliy B.S. - Heavy lift vessel / 2020-05-21 - 2020-11-25 (6 months)
OS: ALBY Liberty - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-27 - 2022-05-05 (7 months)
OS / Welder: Volgo-Bult 217 - General cargo / 2020-12-13 - 2021-06-16 (6 months)
Electrician: M/V Mygan - General cargo / 2021-09-16 - 2022-05-03 (8 months)
OS: Kristina P - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-03 - 2022-04-29 (7 months)
OS: Emmakris1 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-08 - 2021-08-14 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Emmakris2 - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-09 - 2021-03-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Finnanger - Chemical tanker / 2021-12-16 - 2022-04-26 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Torvanger - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-19 - 2021-09-22 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Falkanger - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-23 - 2021-01-17 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Leikanger - Chemical tanker / 2020-03-04 - 2020-06-02 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Leikanger - Chemical tanker / 2019-08-11 - 2019-12-02 (4 months)
2nd Officer: SIOUX - General cargo / 2021-09-13 - 2022-04-24 (7 months)
2nd Officer: WEC MAJORELLE - Container Ship / 2021-04-24 - 2021-06-05 (1 month)
2nd Officer: PANAGIA KANALA - General cargo / 2020-07-02 - 2020-12-17 (5 months)
2nd Officer: URLA - General cargo / 2019-10-10 - 2020-03-08 (5 months)
2nd Officer: BALKAN 1 - Dry Cargo / 2018-08-15 - 2019-02-02 (6 months)
Motorman: Merton 1 - General cargo / 2021-11-09 - 2022-04-24 (5 months)
Motorman: Slavutych 15 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-20 - 2021-06-30 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Bislan - General cargo / 2020-06-22 - 2020-12-15 (6 months)
3rd Officer: VIVIAN - LPG / LNG / 2021-12-09 - 2022-04-22 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Levant - LPG / LNG / 2021-05-28 - 2021-09-19 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Monsoon - LPG / LNG / 2020-08-26 - 2021-02-23 (6 months)
AB Seaman: MSC HANNAH - Container Ship / 2019-07-30 - 2020-06-06 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Gas Zeus - LPG / LNG / 2018-12-25 - 2019-05-25 (5 months)
Pumpman: Osprey - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-28 - 2022-04-07 (3 months)
Pumpman: La Balena - VLCC / 2020-11-15 - 2021-04-17 (5 months)
Pumpman: Lake Sturgeon - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-11-23 - 2020-07-20 (8 months)
Pumpman: FSL PIRAEUS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-12-17 - 2019-07-20 (7 months)
Pumpman: Alyarmouk - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-03-10 - 2017-09-16 (6 months)
Master: Giga - Dredger / 2017-08-21 - 2022-04-02 (4 years)
Diver: Ocean Explorer - Dredger / 2015-08-08 - 2017-03-01 (1 year)
OS / Welder: m/v KP ALBATROSS - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-25 - 2022-04-01 (8 months)
OS: Melpomeni - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-20 - 2021-03-31 (5 months)
OS: т/х "Фіделіо" - Cruise Liner / 2019-05-28 - 2019-09-17 (4 months)
3rd Officer: My queen majesty - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-09 - 2022-03-29 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: CADET - Training Ship / 2021-09-01 - 2022-03-28 (7 months)
Chief Officer: AFRICAN GANNET - General cargo / 2021-10-21 - 2022-03-27 (5 months)
Chief Officer: AFRICAN EAGLE - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-15 - 2021-06-18 (6 months)
Chief Officer: AFRICAN HAWK - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-15 - 2020-08-24 (8 months)
2nd Officer: AFRICAN HAWK - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-20 - 2019-12-14 (3 months)