Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Engine Cadet: Federal Sable - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-18 - 2024-03-08 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Front samara - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-05-24 - 2023-03-31 (10 months)
Fitter / Welder: li bai - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-10-04 - 2024-03-07 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: stamatis - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-31 - 2023-07-22 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Portofino - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-13 - 2023-01-17 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Sevilla Carrier - Reefer / 2021-12-25 - 2022-05-31 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: глиэр - Chemical tanker / 2021-08-14 - 2021-11-13 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Frigg w - General cargo / 2023-10-30 - 2024-03-05 (4 months)
Master: MT. Tasik Nambus - Bunkering Vessel / 2022-07-05 - 2024-03-04 (1 year)
Ref. Machinist: kapitan solyanik - Fishing vessel / 2023-10-05 - 2024-03-01 (5 months)
Ref. Machinist: kapitan solyanik - Fishing vessel / 2022-11-26 - 2023-04-27 (5 months)
Ref. Machinist: kapitan solyanik - Fishing vessel / 2022-03-27 - 2022-07-10 (3 months)
Ref. Machinist: kapitan solyanik - Fishing vessel / 2021-05-04 - 2021-09-30 (5 months)
Ref. Machinist: sedov - Training Ship / 2019-12-06 - 2020-11-27 (12 months)
Engine Cadet: Meraki - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-08-22 - 2024-02-28 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Akhtiar - Tug boat / 2022-03-07 - 2022-09-04 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Ertea - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-17 - 2024-02-25 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Ertea - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-03 - 2023-07-09 (7 months)
2nd Engineer: Ertea - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-15 - 2022-08-30 (11 months)
Engine Cadet: Nyland - General cargo / 2023-10-23 - 2024-02-25 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Port Tokyo - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-04 - 2023-08-24 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Марс , морской буксир , п.Монровия - Tug boat / 2021-06-10 - 2022-02-24 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Mineral Destelbergen - Bulk Carrier / 2023-10-04 - 2024-02-21 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Federal Tambo - Bulk Carrier / 2022-10-21 - 2023-05-08 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Mineral Yarden - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-07 - 2022-06-23 (10 months)
Engine Cadet: jonas - Fishing vessel / 2023-10-11 - 2024-02-20 (4 months)
OS: Omskiy-125 - General cargo / 2023-09-21 - 2024-02-20 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: EKOLOG - Tug boat / 2022-06-30 - 2022-09-05 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: VELA - Yacht / 2020-10-13 - 2021-06-25 (8 months)
2nd Officer: AVON TRADER - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-08 - 2024-02-20 (5 months)
2nd Officer: BATAM TRADER - Container Ship / 2023-02-12 - 2023-08-12 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Frederik - Container Ship / 2022-06-19 - 2022-12-12 (6 months)
3rd Officer: MLS GEMMA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-23 - 2022-05-04 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Muse - General cargo / 2020-04-24 - 2020-09-04 (4 months)
Motorman: ORION - Shuttle Tanker / 2023-07-20 - 2024-02-20 (7 months)
Motorman: Navin osprey - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-01 - 2023-02-20 (8 months)
Motorman: Sakhalin-9 - Passenger vessel / 2023-01-27 - 2024-02-14 (1 year)
2nd Engineer: Heracles - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-27 - 2024-02-12 (7 months)
2nd Engineer: Leopard I - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-02-25 - 2023-05-05 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Ingrid Knutsen - Shuttle Tanker / 2022-11-30 - 2023-01-08 (1 month)
2nd Engineer: Ingrid Knutsen - Shuttle Tanker / 2022-09-09 - 2022-10-18 (1 month)
OS: MSC MANON - Container Ship / 2023-08-02 - 2024-02-12 (6 months)
OS: Frio Shinano - Reefer / 2022-11-05 - 2023-05-21 (7 months)
OS: VOSTOCHNYY - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-10-15 - 2021-12-20 (2 months)
El. Eng. Assistant: Pomorze - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-16 - 2024-02-08 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Daxia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-21 - 2021-10-22 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Hikmet Karabekir - General cargo / 2019-11-20 - 2020-03-09 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Emerald - Dry Cargo / 2023-10-11 - 2024-02-06 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Smart - General cargo / 2023-03-03 - 2023-06-27 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Beryl - General cargo / 2022-02-11 - 2022-10-31 (9 months)
Master: Fairplay XII - Tug boat / 2024-01-15 - 2024-02-01 (1 month)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swardfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-10-19 - 2021-12-29 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swardfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-07-07 - 2021-09-08 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swardfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2021-02-03 - 2021-04-15 (2 months)
Chief Officer: Subtech Swordfish - DSV (Diving Support) / 2020-07-19 - 2020-11-29 (4 months)
Boatswain: M/V SUADIYE - General cargo / 2023-04-21 - 2024-01-28 (9 months)
AB Seaman: M/V MEDAR - General cargo / 2021-12-11 - 2022-12-21 (1 year)