Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
ETO: Bourbon Liberty 161 - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-05-23 - 2015-07-24 (2 months)
ETO: Bourbon Liberty 161 - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-01-20 - 2015-03-21 (2 months)
ETO: Bourbon Liberty 161 - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-08-15 - 2014-11-04 (3 months)
ETO: Bourbon Liberty 163 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2014-05-15 - 2014-07-01 (2 months)
ETO: Bourbon Liberty 154 - Offshore Supply vessel / 2013-10-25 - 2014-02-06 (3 months)
Motorman: Navi star - Container Ship / 2015-02-10 - 2015-07-21 (5 months)
Motorman: Sovetskaya Rodina - General cargo / 2014-10-23 - 2014-12-26 (2 months)
Motorman: Viktor Borisov - General cargo / 2014-04-14 - 2014-09-04 (5 months)
Motorman: ST.NICOLAS - General Cargo / 2013-01-23 - 2013-05-23 (4 months)
Motorman: St. Constantine - General Cargo / 2012-05-07 - 2012-11-05 (6 months)
Wiper: Mv.Border - General cargo / 2014-08-17 - 2015-07-16 (11 months)
Wiper: Mv.Border - General cargo / 2013-08-07 - 2014-06-07 (10 months)
Wiper: Mv.Border - General cargo / 2013-07-06 - 2013-08-06 (1 month)
Wiper: Mv.Border - General cargo / 2013-01-30 - 2013-04-17 (3 months)
AB Seaman: MVO EB 104 - Barge / 2015-05-18 - 2015-06-30 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Emerald - MRSV / 2014-08-31 - 2014-11-10 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Bourbon Liberty303 - AHTS / 2014-01-21 - 2014-03-26 (2 months)
AB Seaman: CGM Leopard - LPG / LNG / 2013-07-04 - 2013-10-05 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Topaz - Yacht / 2013-03-12 - 2013-05-10 (2 months)
3rd Officer: ENERGENA - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-01-09 - 2015-06-28 (6 months)
3rd Officer: ENERGENA - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-06-29 - 2014-11-10 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Energena - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-10-16 - 2014-02-10 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: MV Joerg N - bulker / 2013-06-23 - 2014-07-11 (1 year)
AB Seaman: SORMOVO 2 - General Cargo / 2014-05-01 - 2014-08-25 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: HEINRIK G - General Cargo / 2012-10-02 - 2013-03-25 (6 months)
OS: AJAX - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-08-18 - 2015-03-02 (6 months)
OS: m/v Norwind - General cargo / 2012-06-06 - 2012-11-21 (5 months)
OS: m/v Hollum - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-06-15 - 2011-12-10 (6 months)
OS: m/v Geise - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2010-08-09 - 2011-02-25 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v Geise - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2009-06-16 - 2010-02-11 (8 months)
2nd Officer: mv MOHAR - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-17 - 2015-03-02 (6 months)
Chief Officer: mv Scanlark - General cargo / 2014-01-07 - 2014-07-22 (6 months)
2nd Officer: MV LIME - Dry Cargo / 2012-08-10 - 2013-02-02 (6 months)
Chief Officer: MV ORION-1 - Dry Cargo / 2012-04-05 - 2012-08-05 (4 months)
Chief Officer: MV ORION-1 - Dry Cargo / 2011-05-30 - 2011-11-24 (6 months)
Ref. Engineer: "Iceberg" (old name "Rainfrost") - Reefer / 2014-04-28 - 2014-08-25 (4 months)
Ref. Engineer: "Rainfrost" - Reefer / 2013-09-30 - 2013-12-06 (2 months)
Ref. Engineer: "Akademik Zavaritskiy" - Reefer / 2013-02-01 - 2013-06-04 (4 months)
Ref. Engineer: "Akademik Vavilov" - Reefer / 2011-10-20 - 2012-04-05 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Chemtrans Rugen - Chemical tanker / 2014-01-07 - 2014-07-08 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Cappadoccian - Chemical tanker / 2013-06-21 - 2013-08-09 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Linde G - Standby-safety vessel / 2012-08-27 - 2013-03-20 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Vicuna - Chemical tanker / 2011-04-18 - 2011-10-18 (6 months)
OS: Vicuna - Chemical tanker / 2009-09-26 - 2010-03-15 (6 months)
Chief Officer: ACAPULCO - Container Ship / 2013-12-13 - 2014-05-28 (5 months)
Chief Officer: ACAPULCO - Container Ship / 2013-02-02 - 2013-07-24 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Otterhound - Container Ship / 2012-05-14 - 2012-09-14 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Franklin Strait - Container Ship / 2011-10-20 - 2012-02-03 (3 months)
Chief Officer: Franklin Strait - Container Ship / 2010-12-10 - 2011-06-06 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Эльга-1 - General cargo / 2013-12-20 - 2014-05-08 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Эльга-1 - Dry Cargo / 2012-11-09 - 2013-03-16 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Эльга-1 - General cargo / 2012-04-04 - 2012-08-04 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Эльга-1 - General cargo / 2011-06-20 - 2011-09-12 (3 months)
Chief Officer: ARKAIM-3 - General cargo / 2010-03-20 - 2010-09-25 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: SVIR - General Cargo / 2013-11-26 - 2014-04-26 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Rochester Castle - Bulk Carrier / 2011-11-17 - 2012-03-22 (4 months)
4th Engineer: B EUROPA - Bulk Carrier / 2010-07-24 - 2011-02-08 (6 months)
4th Engineer: CLIFFORD CASTLE - Bulk Carrier / 2009-07-02 - 2009-10-10 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: imme Oidendorf - Bulk Carrier / 2008-07-09 - 2008-12-08 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: AJA IPSA - Container Ship / 2013-12-15 - 2014-04-08 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: PESCARA - Container Ship / 2012-12-14 - 2013-05-12 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: MOL CHARISMA - Container Ship / 2012-03-21 - 2012-09-09 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: APL LIBERTY - Container Ship / 2011-03-19 - 2011-09-21 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: MONTREAL - Container Ship / 2010-04-20 - 2010-10-08 (6 months)
AB Seaman: "Captain Danilkin" - General cargo / 2013-12-07 - 2014-04-05 (4 months)
AB Seaman: "Captain Chukhchin" - Dry Cargo / 2013-03-22 - 2013-07-25 (4 months)
AB Seaman: "Captain Danilkin" - General cargo / 2012-12-03 - 2013-02-05 (2 months)
AB Seaman: "Dmitry Donskoy" - Dry Cargo / 2012-04-08 - 2012-07-29 (4 months)
AB Seaman: "Pomorze" - Dry Cargo / 2011-07-27 - 2011-10-22 (3 months)
Trainee Engineer: DUNAY - Dredger / 2013-04-24 - 2014-02-24 (10 months)
Trainee Engineer: BRIGADIR - Tug boat / 2012-11-26 - 2013-01-26 (2 months)
Chief Officer: ELKE K - General cargo / 2013-05-07 - 2013-08-29 (4 months)
Chief Officer: GEERT K - General cargo / 2012-12-16 - 2013-03-17 (3 months)
Chief Officer: GEERT K - General cargo / 2012-12-16 - 2013-03-17 (3 months)
Chief Officer: BBC Sand - General cargo / 2012-08-21 - 2012-12-21 (4 months)
Chief Officer: BBC sand - General cargo / 2012-08-21 - 2012-11-22 (3 months)
Fitter / Welder: m/v OWL - Bulk Carrier / 2013-02-11 - 2013-08-18 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Golden Endurance - General cargo / 2012-11-27 - 2013-01-05 (1 month)
Fitter / Welder: MSC Fortunate - Container Ship / 2012-02-14 - 2012-09-27 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: m/v PISTI - Container Ship / 2011-04-03 - 2011-11-02 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: m/v MSC PEGGU - Container Ship / 2010-09-11 - 2011-02-02 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Marbella Carrier - Reefer / 2013-03-10 - 2013-08-08 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Autumn Wave - Reefer / 2012-07-22 - 2012-11-19 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Pearl Vita - General cargo / 2011-09-16 - 2012-01-27 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Sun Vita - General cargo / 2011-02-28 - 2011-07-06 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Pearl Vita - General cargo / 2010-07-13 - 2010-12-25 (5 months)