Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Stinnes Mistral - General cargo / 2021-09-21 - 2021-12-16 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Sider Michelle - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-05-13 - 2021-09-20 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Frio Galicia - Reefer / 2020-06-22 - 2021-01-28 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Ever Loading - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-20 - 2019-02-17 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Svyatoy Pyotr - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-05 - 2018-01-17 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Northern Precision - Container Ship / 2021-08-08 - 2021-12-15 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nordic Skagen - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-18 - 2021-12-15 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nordic Hong Kong - Container Ship / 2020-08-10 - 2021-02-19 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: Nordic Stralsund - Container Ship / 2019-08-11 - 2020-05-27 (10 months)
Fitter / Welder: FS Ipanema - Container Ship / 2018-11-22 - 2019-06-07 (7 months)
Fitter / Welder: FS Ipanema - Container Ship / 2018-05-09 - 2018-08-18 (3 months)
Motorman: Vankor - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-19 - 2021-12-14 (8 months)
Motorman: Domani - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-24 - 2021-02-03 (7 months)
OS: Aviva - RO-RO / 2021-05-15 - 2021-12-10 (7 months)
OS: Astra Marine - General cargo / 2020-05-11 - 2020-10-01 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: OPTIMA SEAWAYS - RO-RO / 2021-06-18 - 2021-12-08 (6 months)
Cook: SPARROW - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-27 - 2021-12-07 (6 months)
Chief Cook: Songa Crystal - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-14 - 2021-03-02 (7 months)
Chief Cook: Catherine c - Container Ship / 2019-09-02 - 2020-07-22 (11 months)
Chief Cook: Dimitra C - Container Ship / 2018-10-17 - 2019-07-27 (9 months)
OS-Cook: Evrope - Container Ship / 2018-02-07 - 2018-08-14 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Bruce - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-05-15 - 2021-12-05 (7 months)
OS: Aurelia I - General cargo / 2021-07-17 - 2021-12-01 (4 months)
AB Seaman: ONEY Z - General cargo / 2020-07-15 - 2020-11-20 (4 months)
Motorman: “Vyacheslav Pankov” - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-08-07 - 2021-11-30 (4 months)
Motorman: Volgo-Balt 208 - General cargo / 2020-04-30 - 2020-09-30 (5 months)
Electrician: Nikolay Telenkov - Fishing vessel / 2021-06-28 - 2021-11-29 (5 months)
Electrician: Nikolay Telenkov - Fishing vessel / 2020-08-01 - 2021-01-29 (6 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Armenak Babaev - Fishing vessel / 2019-06-11 - 2020-01-24 (7 months)
3rd Electrical Engineer: Armenak Babaev - Fishing vessel / 2018-06-27 - 2019-01-24 (7 months)
Electrician: Armenak Babaev - Fishing vessel / 2018-01-05 - 2018-06-13 (5 months)
Chief Steward: MV AVNI - Container Ship / 2021-01-28 - 2021-11-29 (10 months)
Chief Steward: MV HAZEL - Container Ship / 2019-12-18 - 2020-09-29 (9 months)
Chief Steward: MV CHIEF - Container Ship / 2018-11-06 - 2019-10-22 (12 months)
Chief Steward: ADMIRAL VENTURE - Container Ship / 2017-12-07 - 2018-08-21 (8 months)
2nd Officer: NS ANGELA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-05-15 - 2021-11-28 (6 months)
AB / Crane Operator: MSC JASMINE - Container Ship / 2019-06-24 - 2020-08-12 (1 year)
AB Seaman: ASTERION - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-17 - 2018-09-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: LAMBAY - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-30 - 2017-12-02 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Mustai Karim - Passenger vessel / 2021-04-27 - 2021-11-25 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Nadezda - Training Ship / 2020-10-21 - 2020-11-06 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Nadezda - Training Ship / 2020-09-29 - 2020-10-12 (13 days)
Deck Cadet: Nadezda - Training Ship / 2019-08-19 - 2019-10-27 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Nadezda - Training Ship / 2018-10-11 - 2018-12-12 (2 months)
Cook: ANNE - General cargo / 2021-06-23 - 2021-11-24 (5 months)
Cook: Piotr - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-24 - 2020-11-25 (2 months)
Cook: Galileo - Fishing vessel / 2019-05-20 - 2020-01-12 (8 months)
Cook: Galileo - Fishing vessel / 2018-09-28 - 2019-03-08 (5 months)
Cook: Frio seven - Reefer / 2018-01-22 - 2018-07-05 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: ACX PEARL - Container Ship / 2021-06-23 - 2021-11-21 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: FLORIDA BAY - Container Ship / 2020-11-08 - 2021-03-03 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: RHL VARESIA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-01-03 - 2020-06-16 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: RHL MARTA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-24 - 2019-08-10 (6 months)
1st Engineer: Pelican - Container Ship / 2018-07-24 - 2018-12-01 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: NEFRIT - ROV Support vessel / 2021-09-19 - 2021-11-18 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Mir - Training Ship / 2019-07-09 - 2019-09-08 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: M/T DANK SILVER - Chemical tanker / 2021-07-15 - 2021-11-14 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: SALALAH LNG - LPG / LNG / 2020-06-25 - 2020-10-04 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: MT MASIRAH - Chemical tanker / 2018-10-03 - 2019-01-25 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: MATE - Container Ship / 2021-02-02 - 2021-11-11 (9 months)
2nd Engineer: Independent Pursuit - Container Ship / 2017-10-17 - 2020-10-27 (3 years)
Trainee OS: PK 59 - Crane vessel / 2021-09-21 - 2021-11-11 (2 months)
Trainee OS: Neptun-4 - Crane vessel / 2021-09-13 - 2021-09-20 (7 days)
Trainee OS: Neptun-4 - Crane vessel / 2021-07-05 - 2021-08-01 (1 month)