Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: Admiral Vladimirskiy - Research vessel / 2019-11-28 - 2020-10-10 (10 months)
AB Seaman: MV KEN - General cargo / 2019-10-02 - 2020-10-08 (1 year)
AB Seaman: MV KEN - General cargo / 2018-09-20 - 2019-09-28 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: MV KEN - General cargo / 2017-03-04 - 2018-03-27 (1 year)
ETO: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-07-07 - 2020-10-07 (3 months)
ETO: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-11-12 - 2020-01-14 (2 months)
ETO: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-07-13 - 2019-09-12 (2 months)
ETO: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-03-13 - 2019-05-12 (2 months)
ETO: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-11-12 - 2019-01-12 (2 months)
OS: saif 1 - General cargo / 2019-09-25 - 2020-10-01 (1 year)
OS: saif-1 - General cargo / 2018-07-29 - 2019-08-22 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: VELS SCHOOL OF MARITIME STUDIES - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-01 - 2020-09-30 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Ocean Saphire - Platform Supply vessel / 2019-11-22 - 2020-09-30 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: Icaro - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-06-26 - 2020-09-28 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: EOS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-09-09 - 2020-06-25 (10 months)
AB / Crane Operator: STARYY ARBAT - Fishing vessel / 2020-07-08 - 2020-09-22 (2 months)
Turner: ALICIA - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-22 - 2020-09-21 (1 month)
Turner: ALICIA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-01 - 2020-08-18 (11 months)
Turner: m/v"Aragona" - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-19 - 2019-09-30 (1 year)
Turner: m/v"Aragona" - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-16 - 2017-10-23 (7 months)
Trainee Engineer: M.T JAG AABHA - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-24 - 2020-09-11 (12 months)
Master: Demeter ex. Sea Faith - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-06-18 - 2020-09-10 (3 months)
Master: BDIN - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-12-13 - 2019-02-28 (2 months)
Master: Tirupati - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-12 - 2017-09-27 (5 months)
Master: BEI JIANG - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-08-31 - 2017-01-23 (5 months)
Master: Rawabi Integrity - Chemical tanker / 2015-12-15 - 2016-04-10 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Melody 5 - AHTS / 2019-11-14 - 2020-09-03 (10 months)
Painter: mt.Voyager - Chemical tanker / 2020-03-06 - 2020-08-31 (6 months)
Painter: mt Astra - Chemical tanker / 2019-10-26 - 2020-01-20 (3 months)
Painter: RN Arkhangelsk - Chemical tanker / 2019-06-26 - 2019-08-13 (2 months)
Painter: Baltic Sea - Chemical tanker / 2018-06-16 - 2018-08-10 (2 months)
Painter: Monrovia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-08-20 - 2016-12-27 (4 months)
Motorman: Glomar Vantage - ROV Support vessel / 2020-08-09 - 2020-08-26 (1 month)
Motorman: Glomar Arctic - Standby-safety vessel / 2019-12-19 - 2020-03-09 (3 months)
Motorman: m/v"Arosa" - Bulk Carrier / 2019-01-22 - 2019-09-12 (8 months)
Motorman: Adelina - Bulk Carrier / 2018-02-20 - 2018-10-05 (7 months)
Motorman: Adelina - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-06 - 2017-08-04 (7 months)
AB Seaman: ATHENA - LPG / LNG / 2019-11-03 - 2020-08-18 (9 months)
OS: IBRI LNG - LPG / LNG / 2015-08-03 - 2016-06-15 (10 months)
OS: MARE DORICUM - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-02-26 - 2015-06-09 (3 months)
OS: NJORD THYRA - Oil Products Tanker / 2013-12-05 - 2014-10-12 (10 months)
OS: MT NAPA 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-04-06 - 2013-04-11 (1 year)
4th Engineer: Avachinsky - Fishing vessel / 2019-09-24 - 2020-08-16 (11 months)
Motorman: Avachinsky - Fishing vessel / 2018-10-15 - 2019-03-17 (5 months)
Motorman: Kievska Rus - Fishing vessel / 2017-10-07 - 2018-03-20 (5 months)
Motorman: Kievska Rus - Fishing vessel / 2016-08-21 - 2017-02-13 (6 months)
OS: MV ISHWARI - Bulk Carrier / 2019-09-07 - 2020-08-14 (11 months)
OS: MV MAITHILI - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-01 - 2019-05-13 (9 months)
OS: MV SHRAVAN - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-14 - 2017-12-21 (8 months)
OS: MV ISHWARI - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-15 - 2016-05-04 (2 months)
Trainee Engineer: SFINKS - Tug boat / 2020-06-01 - 2020-08-05 (2 months)
Waiter: Majestic Princess - Cruise Liner / 2019-11-01 - 2020-08-02 (9 months)
Waiter: Majestic Princess - Cruise Liner / 2018-08-29 - 2019-05-13 (8 months)
Waiter: Majestic Princess - Cruise Liner / 2017-11-11 - 2018-05-05 (6 months)
Waiter: Sun Princess - Cruise Liner / 2016-09-04 - 2017-04-25 (8 months)
Waiter: Caribbean Princess - Cruise Liner / 2015-08-15 - 2016-05-05 (9 months)
OS: Alexia I - General cargo / 2020-02-17 - 2020-08-02 (6 months)
OS: m/v Odinnadsataya Pyatiletka - General cargo / 2019-07-12 - 2020-01-08 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v Apache - General cargo / 2016-12-07 - 2017-07-15 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: M/V Tiyam - General cargo / 2015-12-19 - 2016-05-21 (5 months)