Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Mineral Cloudbreak - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-28 - 2022-02-12 (7 months)
OS: Mineral Cloudbreak - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-12 - 2020-11-16 (8 months)
OS: Mandona - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-10 - 2017-04-15 (7 months)
Motorman: OCEAN PEARL - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-09 - 2022-02-10 (6 months)
Motorman: NORWAY PEARL - General cargo / 2020-10-27 - 2021-05-23 (7 months)
Motorman: River Pearl - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-25 - 2020-06-06 (7 months)
Motorman: Cape Bellavista - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-01-19 - 2018-06-23 (5 months)
Motorman: IBLEA - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-27 - 2017-10-18 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Sea Eagle - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-22 - 2022-02-08 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Aphrodite - VLCC / 2020-06-15 - 2020-11-12 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Gulf Fanatir - Chemical tanker / 2018-12-19 - 2019-11-14 (11 months)
4th Engineer: Aris - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-28 - 2018-06-20 (1 month)
4th Engineer: Aegeas - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-09-27 - 2018-03-07 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Mineral Honshu - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-21 - 2022-02-06 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Birte Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-10 - 2021-03-04 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Khadzhibey - Passenger vessel / 2019-04-01 - 2019-08-31 (5 months)
Chief Officer: Cemi - General cargo / 2021-10-17 - 2022-02-03 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Adele - General cargo / 2020-11-26 - 2021-03-30 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Heidi - General cargo / 2020-02-25 - 2020-06-17 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Vestland - General cargo / 2019-07-25 - 2020-02-06 (6 months)
Chief Officer: Kjervaagsund - General cargo / 2018-08-28 - 2019-03-03 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Flagship Sage - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-01 - 2022-01-31 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Norient Solar - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-04 - 2015-04-04 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Baltic Favour - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-10-12 - 2012-10-12 (0 days)
Electrical Eng.: MV Rhodos - Container Ship / 2021-11-13 - 2022-01-29 (3 months)
Electrical Eng.: MV Everfit - Container Ship / 2021-01-28 - 2021-08-11 (6 months)
Electrical Eng.: MV Lilla Athens - Cement Carrier / 2020-02-24 - 2020-10-01 (7 months)
Electrical Eng.: MV Qatar Sprit - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-09 - 2019-11-11 (6 months)
Electrical Eng.: MV Al bidda - Container Ship / 2018-08-28 - 2019-02-03 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Omskiy 114 - General cargo / 2021-07-24 - 2022-01-24 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: Pallada - Sailing Vessel / 2020-10-27 - 2020-12-20 (2 months)
Electric Cadet: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2020-06-09 - 2020-10-21 (4 months)
Chief Cook: ADELE - Container Ship / 2021-08-30 - 2022-01-12 (4 months)
Cook: m/v ''SPERO'' - Container Ship / 2020-01-29 - 2020-11-20 (10 months)
Chief Cook: m/v ''CHARLIE'' - Container Ship / 2018-10-19 - 2019-06-16 (8 months)
Chief Cook: m/v ''CHERRU BLOSSOM'' - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-25 - 2018-05-20 (8 months)
AB-Cook: JANIS - Dry Cargo / 2021-09-20 - 2022-01-04 (3 months)
Chief Cook: OSLO WAVE 2 - General cargo / 2021-04-07 - 2021-08-03 (4 months)
AB-Cook: OSLO WAVE 5 - General cargo / 2020-05-31 - 2020-11-25 (6 months)
AB-Cook: SEA ENTERPRISE - Standby-safety vessel / 2019-10-11 - 2019-11-07 (1 month)
AB-Cook: SEA ENTERPRISE - Standby-safety vessel / 2019-04-18 - 2019-06-06 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: DITZUM - General cargo / 2021-06-13 - 2022-01-03 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Admiral Nachimov - Tug boat / 2020-05-15 - 2020-08-31 (4 months)
El. Engineer: tsvitomyr - Tug boat / 2019-02-15 - 2021-12-31 (2 years)
El. Engineer: lavr - Dry Cargo / 2015-08-12 - 2016-04-09 (8 months)
El. Engineer: AMIRA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-03-08 - 2014-11-03 (8 months)
El. Engineer: anatoliy gavrilov - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-12-18 - 2014-03-06 (3 months)
Electrician: brother-81 - Chemical tanker / 2012-06-21 - 2013-03-06 (8 months)
2nd Engineer: Anthea Y - Container Ship / 2021-08-08 - 2021-12-23 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Anthea Y - Container Ship / 2020-10-08 - 2021-03-26 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: UASC AL KHOR - Container Ship / 2020-02-20 - 2020-06-17 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: CMA CGM THALASSA - Container Ship / 2019-03-29 - 2019-09-24 (6 months)
Nurse: Al Salamah - Yacht / 2021-04-30 - 2021-12-21 (8 months)
Nurse: MS Europa - Passenger vessel / 2020-07-22 - 2020-11-04 (3 months)
Nurse: Ocean Majesty - Passenger vessel / 2019-09-18 - 2020-02-29 (5 months)
Chief Engineer: Lisa - General cargo / 2021-05-17 - 2021-12-20 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Lisa - General cargo / 2020-08-31 - 2021-01-10 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Lisa - General cargo / 2020-04-10 - 2020-06-08 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Atlantic Winter - General cargo / 2019-12-04 - 2020-04-09 (4 months)
2nd Engineer: Atlantic Winter - General cargo / 2019-09-20 - 2019-12-03 (2 months)
Motorman: Astra - Dredger / 2021-08-16 - 2021-12-14 (4 months)
Motorman: James - Dredger / 2020-11-26 - 2021-03-30 (4 months)
Motorman: James - Dredger / 2019-12-21 - 2020-06-23 (6 months)
Motorman: James - Dredger / 2019-04-25 - 2019-08-24 (4 months)
Motorman: James - Dredger / 2018-11-08 - 2018-12-26 (2 months)
El. Engineer: Sea Steamer - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-05-25 - 2021-12-12 (7 months)
El. Engineer: Sea Steamer - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-06-26 - 2020-11-24 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Oslo Bulk 9 - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-10-11 - 2020-03-08 (5 months)
Wiper: IOLCOS CONFIDENCE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-02 - 2021-12-11 (8 months)
Master: CFS WIND - Container Ship / 2021-07-27 - 2021-12-11 (4 months)
Master: PACOBA - Container Ship / 2020-09-19 - 2021-02-14 (5 months)
Master: PACUL - Container Ship / 2020-01-20 - 2020-06-30 (5 months)
Master: PACOBA - Container Ship / 2019-07-17 - 2019-11-24 (4 months)
Master: PACUL - Container Ship / 2019-01-02 - 2019-05-12 (4 months)
2nd Officer: TRISTAR SHAMAL - LPG / LNG / 2021-08-10 - 2021-12-09 (4 months)