Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
4th Engineer: Luna Maersk - Container Ship / 2017-11-11 - 2018-06-03 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Symphony Performer - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-03-06 - 2018-05-28 (3 months)
3rd Officer: POSH Concorde - AHTS / 2017-05-16 - 2017-09-02 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Posh Champion - AHTS / 2016-04-16 - 2016-08-02 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Posh Champion - AHTS / 2015-08-21 - 2015-10-10 (2 months)
2nd Officer: PHORCYS - Tug boat / 2015-04-16 - 2015-07-31 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Giblatar - Dredger / 2018-02-12 - 2018-05-27 (3 months)
Electric Cadet: Giblatar - Dredger / 2017-09-04 - 2017-12-31 (4 months)
Electric Cadet: Giblatar - Dredger / 2017-03-27 - 2017-08-27 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: SEDOV - Cruise Liner / 2016-06-20 - 2016-09-20 (3 months)
1st Officer: Fehn Polaris - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-04-25 - 2018-05-23 (1 month)
1st Officer: Fehn Pollux - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-11-16 - 2018-03-05 (4 months)
1st Officer: Fehn Light - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-05-31 - 2017-07-15 (1 month)
1st Officer: Fehn Capella - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-12-30 - 2017-05-18 (5 months)
1st Officer: Fehn Polaris - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-05-22 - 2016-11-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Marbella Carrier - Container Ship / 2017-12-11 - 2018-05-14 (5 months)
AB Seaman: M/v Horn cliff - Container Ship / 2016-10-11 - 2017-04-21 (6 months)
OS: M/v Horn bay - Reefer / 2015-10-13 - 2016-05-29 (8 months)
OS: M/v JS Colorado - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-05 - 2015-08-01 (8 months)
OS: M/v Fratzis - Bulk Carrier / 2013-12-12 - 2014-08-17 (8 months)
OS: m/v MAX PARTNER - Container Ship / 2017-09-06 - 2018-05-06 (8 months)
OS: m/v MAX CENTAUR - Container Ship / 2016-07-03 - 2017-02-26 (8 months)
OS: m/v MAX CENTAUR - Container Ship / 2016-07-03 - 2017-02-26 (8 months)
OS: m/v Draco - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-11 - 2015-04-29 (5 months)
OS: m/v 'leo star 1' - Bulk Carrier / 2013-10-15 - 2014-02-07 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: M/V Theresian Stars - Passenger vessel / 2017-04-17 - 2018-04-27 (1 year)
Boatswain: Sea Spear - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-12-27 - 2018-04-13 (4 months)
Boatswain: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-05-15 - 2017-09-15 (4 months)
Boatswain: Sea Spark - Platform Supply vessel / 2016-09-26 - 2017-01-15 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Resolve Commander - Tug Boat / 2016-02-24 - 2016-03-27 (1 month)
3rd Officer: Andropov - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-09 - 2018-04-09 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Volgoneft-160 - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-03-29 - 2017-08-04 (4 months)
Boatswain: Vladimir Zakharenko - Dry Cargo / 2016-04-13 - 2016-08-13 (4 months)
Boatswain: Анатолий Сиденко - Dry Cargo / 2015-04-24 - 2015-10-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Mekhanik Kharitonov - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-06-24 - 2014-11-19 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: ODESSIT - General cargo / 2017-10-29 - 2018-04-04 (5 months)
Oiler: ODESSIT - General cargo / 2017-05-07 - 2017-10-13 (5 months)
Motorman: Venator - General cargo / 2005-07-28 - 2006-02-07 (6 months)
OS: Портовик - Tug boat / 2018-02-28 - 2018-04-02 (1 month)
OS: Капитан Маркин - Tug boat / 2018-01-31 - 2018-02-27 (1 month)
Chief Cook: Atameken - General cargo / 2017-12-25 - 2018-03-29 (3 months)
Chief Cook: Zshibek Goly - General cargo / 2017-04-27 - 2017-09-06 (4 months)
Chief Cook: Alexander Peresvet - Dry Cargo / 2016-11-25 - 2017-03-27 (4 months)
Cook: MB 12-04 - Tug boat / 2016-02-13 - 2016-07-22 (5 months)
Cook: Someri - Tug boat / 2015-07-02 - 2015-09-02 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: Kola - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-08 - 2018-03-16 (3 months)
Fitter / Welder: Pollux - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-04 - 2016-11-11 (7 days)
Fitter / Welder: Papua - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-13 - 2016-10-19 (6 days)
Fitter / Welder: Olga - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-16 - 2016-10-03 (1 month)
Motorman: Wilson Bremen - Dry Cargo / 2015-09-26 - 2016-01-29 (4 months)
Master: Georgiy Babenko - Tug boat / 2017-09-14 - 2018-03-10 (6 months)
Master: King Jesus - AHTS / 2016-06-04 - 2016-08-25 (3 months)
Master: King Jesus - AHTS / 2016-01-10 - 2016-03-10 (2 months)
Master: GAYATRI DEVI - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-06-20 - 2015-08-16 (2 months)
Master: DAYATRI DEVI - Platform Supply vessel / 2015-01-28 - 2015-04-18 (3 months)
2nd Officer: ST ELIAS - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-30 - 2018-03-09 (4 months)
2nd Officer: ANNA 2005 - General cargo / 2017-03-18 - 2017-08-25 (5 months)
2nd Officer: NIKA FORTUNE - General cargo / 2016-09-21 - 2017-01-11 (4 months)
2nd Officer: LARIX - General cargo / 2016-04-13 - 2016-08-15 (4 months)
Motorman: Tollund - General cargo / 2017-10-11 - 2018-03-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Berg - Dry Cargo / 2014-01-25 - 2014-07-25 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Phoenix I - Livestock / 2017-10-06 - 2018-03-03 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Phoenix III - Livestock / 2016-01-04 - 2016-06-05 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Volodymyr Bondar - General cargo / 2015-04-02 - 2015-09-17 (5 months)
2nd Officer: Volodymyr Sharkov - General cargo / 2014-12-26 - 2015-03-06 (2 months)
AB Seaman: BRAVO V - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-09 - 2018-02-07 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Bermudian Express - Container Ship / 2016-12-10 - 2017-05-28 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Stellar Atlantic - Bulk Carrier / 2016-03-28 - 2016-10-03 (6 months)
OS: anthea - Container Ship / 2013-04-21 - 2013-09-28 (5 months)
OS: alma - General cargo / 2010-01-20 - 2010-08-02 (6 months)
OS: Byward - General cargo / 2017-11-04 - 2018-02-06 (3 months)
OS: Byward - General cargo / 2017-05-12 - 2017-10-10 (5 months)
OS: Patriot - Tug boat / 2016-12-26 - 2017-02-24 (2 months)
3rd Officer: THEOXENIA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-30 - 2018-02-02 (2 months)
OS: THEOXENIA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-28 - 2017-11-30 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Aegean Paradise - Cruise Liner / 2015-06-26 - 2015-09-28 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Hadzhibey - Passenger vessel / 2015-04-17 - 2015-06-17 (2 months)