Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: M/V SIARGAO - Container Ship / 2023-10-18 - 2023-11-06 (1 month)
AB Seaman: M/V SIARGAO - Container Ship / 2023-04-20 - 2023-10-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: M/V AMKE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-07-29 - 2023-01-05 (5 months)
OS: M/V AMKE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2022-02-02 - 2022-07-28 (6 months)
OS: M/V SRAR COMET - Container Ship / 2020-11-30 - 2021-10-19 (11 months)
Chief Cook: RT GENOVA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-04 - 2023-11-04 (3 months)
Chief Cook: RT GENOVA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-04 - 2023-03-04 (6 months)
Chief Cook: RT GENOVA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-03-04 - 2022-06-04 (3 months)
Chief Cook: RT GENOVA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-04 - 2022-01-04 (3 months)
Chief Cook: RT GENOVA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-04 - 2021-09-24 (3 months)
OS: Sergei Volkov - General cargo / 2023-06-05 - 2023-11-04 (5 months)
OS: Professor Khromov - Passenger vessel / 2022-06-24 - 2022-09-26 (3 months)
Bartender: Ocean Queen - Passenger vessel / 2023-06-16 - 2023-11-04 (5 months)
Waitress: Crown Iris - Passenger vessel / 2022-05-14 - 2022-11-29 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Liberty - Passenger vessel / 2023-09-03 - 2023-11-03 (2 months)
Chief Engineer: Sl Gabon - AHTS / 2013-04-04 - 2013-09-03 (5 months)
2nd Engineer: Marrekech - Ferry / 2011-10-13 - 2012-10-08 (12 months)
1st Engineer: Sichem croisic - Chemical tanker / 2010-04-04 - 2010-10-15 (6 months)
1st Engineer: Cap limbot - Chemical tanker / 2009-01-13 - 2009-05-24 (4 months)
Trainee OS: MV KAZI - Ferry / 2023-07-14 - 2023-10-30 (4 months)
Trainee OS: Kiboko - Tug boat / 2022-07-11 - 2022-10-24 (3 months)
El. Engineer: AFINA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-24 - 2023-10-29 (4 months)
El. Engineer: CLARA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-06-28 - 2022-11-28 (5 months)
El. Engineer: BELUGA REEFER - Reefer / 2021-09-30 - 2022-02-05 (4 months)
El. Engineer: BELUGA REEFER - Reefer / 2021-01-15 - 2021-07-05 (6 months)
El. Engineer: Italia Streem - Reefer / 2020-10-12 - 2020-11-16 (1 month)
3rd Officer: MAIA-1 - General cargo / 2023-05-27 - 2023-10-27 (5 months)
OS: Chemtrans Uranus - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-08-06 - 2023-10-27 (3 months)
OS: Megalonissos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-08-24 - 2021-03-06 (6 months)
OS: Капитан Глушко - Tug boat / 2019-12-16 - 2020-02-17 (2 months)
Wiper: Volgoneft-141 - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-10-02 - 2023-10-26 (1 month)
Wiper: ''ОТ-2452" - Tug boat / 2023-04-10 - 2023-07-11 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Albatross - Passenger vessel / 2022-05-18 - 2022-08-17 (3 months)
Trainee OS: Warship - Survey vessel / 2018-11-01 - 2023-10-26 (4 years)
Deck Cadet: MSC JOY - Container Ship / 2023-03-29 - 2023-10-24 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2022-09-01 - 2022-10-30 (2 months)
2nd Engineer: Indian Solidarity - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-17 - 2023-10-24 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Berge Catherine - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-11 - 2023-02-07 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: MSC LEA - Container Ship / 2021-07-03 - 2022-01-27 (7 months)
4th Engineer: MSC LEA - Container Ship / 2020-08-01 - 2021-01-31 (6 months)
4th Engineer: MSC MIA SUMMER - Container Ship / 2019-08-02 - 2020-02-21 (7 months)
Chief Officer: Alisa - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-06-19 - 2023-10-23 (4 months)
Chief Officer: Gullit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-04-01 - 2022-11-01 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Gullit - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-01-27 - 2022-03-31 (2 months)
2nd Officer: Sur - VLCC / 2020-11-19 - 2021-06-13 (7 months)
2nd Officer: Khasab Silver - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-10-11 - 2020-07-02 (9 months)
2nd Officer: ALEXANDER - General cargo / 2023-09-26 - 2023-10-21 (1 month)
3rd Officer: FEDOR - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-25 - 2023-09-25 (2 months)
OS: M/V EMMA - General cargo / 2023-03-21 - 2023-10-19 (7 months)
OS: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2020-12-20 - 2021-02-21 (2 months)
Electrician: m/v AMFITRITI - Bulk Carrier / 2023-05-11 - 2023-10-19 (5 months)
Electrician: m/v AMFITRITI - Bulk Carrier / 2022-11-11 - 2023-04-06 (5 months)
Electrician: m/v GANT MUSE - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-29 - 2022-05-29 (8 months)
Electrician: m/v Mistral - Bulk Carrier / 2020-02-14 - 2021-07-07 (1 year)
Electrician: m/v Soroco - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-16 - 2019-12-31 (6 months)
Mechanic: FAVORITE - General cargo / 2023-05-26 - 2023-10-18 (5 months)
Oiler: CASPIAN FALCON - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-04-10 - 2022-04-11 (3 years)
Chief Officer: DIMITRIS P - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-08-22 - 2023-10-16 (2 months)
Chief Officer: SELECAO - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-11-15 - 2023-04-13 (5 months)
Chief Officer: SPYROS K - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-12-02 - 2022-05-08 (5 months)
Chief Officer: SILIA T - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-13 - 2021-01-08 (6 months)
Chief Officer: SILIA T - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-09-19 - 2020-02-29 (5 months)
4th Engineer: M/T Afrodita - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-03-29 - 2023-10-15 (7 months)
4th Engineer: M/T World Perfomance - Chemical tanker / 2022-01-30 - 2022-10-15 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Thanasis - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-21 - 2021-10-08 (6 months)
Oiler: Chamtang - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-13 - 2021-02-15 (8 months)