Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Reliable - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-10 - 2018-08-20 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Bulat - Tug boat / 2016-05-23 - 2016-07-31 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Lisbon Trader - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-01-08 - 2018-08-13 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Rachel Borchard - Container Ship / 2015-03-16 - 2015-09-14 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Herkules - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-03 - 2018-08-03 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Ariadne - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-30 - 2017-07-07 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Aeolos - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-04 - 2016-02-16 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Western Aida - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-20 - 2015-03-02 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Torrent - Bulk Carrier / 2013-10-02 - 2014-04-16 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: NAVE ALDERAMIN - Chemical tanker / 2018-03-21 - 2018-08-02 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: NAVE RIGEL - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-05-31 - 2017-12-14 (6 months)
Chief Engineer: Navi Cielo - Crude Oil Tanker / 2016-08-05 - 2016-12-04 (4 months)
Chief Engineer: Lake Traut - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-05-31 - 2015-12-28 (7 months)
Chief Engineer: Emerald Shiner - Oil Products Tanker / 2014-06-15 - 2014-10-16 (4 months)
Boatswain: SOPHIA N - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-30 - 2018-07-27 (6 months)
Boatswain: KAMARI - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-01 - 2017-08-04 (9 months)
Boatswain: NONI - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-22 - 2016-07-18 (7 months)
Boatswain: EFFY N - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-03 - 2015-10-06 (6 months)
OS: BBC Naples - General cargo / 2018-02-26 - 2018-07-17 (5 months)
AB Seaman: BBC Balboa - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-06-22 - 2017-12-06 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Saxum - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-04-17 - 2016-10-23 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Milady - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-07-02 - 2015-11-29 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Stortebeker - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2015-05-30 - 2015-07-01 (1 month)
OS: Adele - Dry Cargo / 2018-06-26 - 2018-07-10 (14 days)
OS: VLAS CHUBAR - General cargo / 2016-04-12 - 2016-10-02 (6 months)
AB / Motorman : LABRADOR - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-16 - 2018-07-03 (8 months)
Trainee Engineer: Parisiana - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-12 - 2017-10-01 (2 months)
AB / Motorman : BRASSCHAAT - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-06 - 2017-04-17 (6 months)
Motorman: Legend - Cruise Liner / 2015-05-26 - 2015-07-14 (2 months)
Motorman: владимир игнатюк - Other vessels / 2018-06-06 - 2018-07-03 (1 month)
Motorman: ОПТИМУС - Dredger / 2017-06-15 - 2017-12-07 (6 months)
Motorman: ОПТИМУС - Dredger / 2016-11-01 - 2017-03-12 (4 months)
Motorman: M/V BORIS PEVKIN - General cargo / 2016-05-25 - 2016-06-28 (1 month)
Motorman: Т/Х КАСПИАН ВИНД - General cargo / 2015-09-08 - 2016-03-05 (6 months)
Chief Officer: m/v Star Angelina - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-04 - 2018-06-28 (8 months)
Chief Officer: m/v Star Angelina - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-09 - 2017-06-12 (4 months)
Chief Officer: m/v Giovanni Bottiglieri - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-24 - 2016-06-10 (5 months)
Chief Officer: m/v Giovanni Bottiglieri - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-07 - 2015-04-30 (5 months)
Chief Officer: m/v Michele D’Amato - Bulk Carrier / 2013-12-10 - 2014-04-10 (4 months)
Motorman: ILEANA N - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-14 - 2018-06-11 (8 months)
Motorman: HEIMDAL - Cable laying vessel / 2016-04-25 - 2016-11-29 (7 months)
Motorman: HEIMDAL - Cable laying vessel / 2015-04-20 - 2015-12-08 (8 months)
Motorman: HEIMDAL - Cable laying vessel / 2014-09-09 - 2014-12-04 (3 months)
Motorman: HEIMDAL - Cable laying vessel / 2013-04-21 - 2013-11-02 (6 months)
Master: Hadi 26 - AHTS / 2018-01-17 - 2018-05-24 (4 months)
Master: Hadi 26 - AHTS / 2017-07-25 - 2017-11-01 (3 months)
Master: Richard Tide - AHTS / 2015-10-23 - 2016-11-05 (1 year)
Master: Mansour Tide - AHTS / 2016-09-18 - 2016-10-22 (1 month)
Boatswain: YAGUAR - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-02-18 - 2018-05-22 (3 months)
Boatswain: YAGUAR - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-09-15 - 2017-12-22 (3 months)
Boatswain: YAGUAR - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-06-18 - 2017-08-28 (2 months)
Boatswain: YAGUAR - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-03-19 - 2017-06-02 (2 months)
Steward: Commodor Clipper - Ferry / 2018-02-04 - 2018-04-30 (3 months)
Steward: Commodore Clipper - Ferry / 2018-02-04 - 2018-04-29 (3 months)
Steward: Commodore Clipper - Ferry / 2017-06-01 - 2017-12-25 (7 months)
Waiter: Seabourn Odyssey - Yacht / 2016-10-21 - 2017-02-08 (4 months)
Waiter: Celebrity Eclipce - Cruise Liner / 2016-04-03 - 2016-08-01 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: NAVIOS STAR - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-03 - 2018-04-25 (10 months)
Fitter / Welder: DENITA WAVE - Bulk Carrier / 2016-07-31 - 2016-12-14 (4 months)
Fitter / Welder: DENITA WAVE - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-03 - 2015-11-30 (6 months)
Fitter / Welder: BLUE WAVE - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-19 - 2015-02-28 (8 months)
Fitter / Welder: NORASSIA ALYA - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-11 - 2013-08-25 (5 months)
Electric Cadet: Venator - General cargo / 2017-10-20 - 2018-04-18 (6 months)
Electric Cadet: ACASTE - Dry Cargo / 2017-03-16 - 2017-09-20 (6 months)
Electrician: LIME - General cargo / 2017-10-11 - 2018-04-10 (6 months)
Electrician: LIME - General cargo / 2016-09-23 - 2017-05-31 (8 months)
Electrician: " BADE " - General cargo / 2015-01-27 - 2015-08-07 (6 months)
Electrician: m/v "BADE" - General cargo / 2015-01-27 - 2015-08-07 (6 months)
Electrician: m/v " SORMOVSKIY 121 " - General cargo / 2013-12-22 - 2014-07-15 (7 months)
Chief Cook: Morning Midas - RO-RO / 2017-09-01 - 2018-04-04 (7 months)
Chief Cook: PLV Fortuna - Pipe laying vessel / 2016-05-30 - 2016-11-04 (5 months)
Chief Cook: "Silver San" - RO-RO / 2015-05-23 - 2015-10-29 (5 months)
Chief Cook: "BBC WESER" - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-03-16 - 2014-12-17 (9 months)
Chief Cook: "VOLGO-BALT 236" - General cargo / 2013-05-25 - 2014-01-01 (7 months)
OS: Orient Accord - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-20 - 2018-03-26 (9 months)
OS: Orient Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-28 - 2016-10-29 (6 months)
OS: Orient Accord - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-08 - 2015-11-06 (6 months)
Messman: Orient Accord - Bulk Carrier / 2014-04-15 - 2014-10-22 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Despina D - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-06 - 2018-03-26 (9 months)
Motorman: KENTAVR - Tug boat / 2017-02-22 - 2017-04-24 (2 months)