Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Neptune Aegli - RO-RO / 2023-02-13 - 2023-11-19 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Neptune Avra - RO-RO / 2021-02-05 - 2021-05-22 (4 months)
OS: Neptune Avra - RO-RO / 2020-09-27 - 2021-02-04 (4 months)
OS: Silver Origin - Passenger vessel / 2020-07-05 - 2020-08-31 (2 months)
OS: Crown Iris - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-16 - 2019-11-26 (5 months)
OS: m/v Sanar 8 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-28 - 2021-02-03 (4 months)
OS: m/v Sanar 8 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-02-23 - 2020-06-25 (4 months)
OS: m/v Sanar 8 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-10-07 - 2020-01-24 (4 months)
AB Seaman: m/v Baku wind - General cargo / 2019-01-26 - 2019-05-21 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Armada Navigator - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-02-02 - 2018-06-28 (5 months)
3rd Officer: NAVIS-4 - Dry Cargo / 2022-08-29 - 2023-01-22 (5 months)
3rd Officer: LIONESS - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-01 - 2022-04-09 (7 months)
OS: Aleksandr Antonov - Dry Cargo / 2020-07-31 - 2021-02-02 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Volgoneft-268 - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-04-06 - 2019-06-08 (2 months)
AB Seaman: M/T AMANDA - Chemical tanker / 2022-01-01 - 2022-03-02 (2 months)
AB Seaman: M/T AMANDA - Chemical tanker / 2021-06-28 - 2021-11-12 (4 months)
OS: Nordic wolverine - Chemical tanker / 2020-06-09 - 2021-02-02 (8 months)
OS: Nordic WOLVERINE - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-09 - 2019-09-11 (6 months)
Messman: NORDIC WOLVERINE - Chemical tanker / 2018-05-04 - 2018-10-29 (6 months)
OS: Elena L. - General cargo / 2020-08-02 - 2021-02-01 (6 months)
OS: Diamond C - General cargo / 2019-09-04 - 2020-02-17 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Wes Gesa - Container Ship / 2018-08-01 - 2019-03-02 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Sparta - General cargo / 2017-12-14 - 2018-04-18 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Ingulets - Tug boat / 2016-07-21 - 2016-08-26 (1 month)
2nd Officer: Wec Majorelle - Container Ship / 2024-06-20 - 2024-07-23 (1 month)
2nd Officer: WEC MAJORELLE - Container Ship / 2023-09-11 - 2024-04-22 (7 months)
AB Seaman: WEC MAJORELLE - Container Ship / 2023-05-24 - 2023-09-10 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Tomaros - Bulk Carrier / 2021-10-20 - 2022-01-02 (2 months)
OS: Elikon - Bulk Carrier / 2020-08-05 - 2021-02-01 (6 months)
OS: Ocean Trader - General cargo / 2020-07-24 - 2021-02-01 (6 months)
OS: Alp Ace - AHTS / 2019-12-19 - 2020-01-01 (13 days)
Deck Cadet: Sofrana Surville - Container Ship / 2018-08-19 - 2018-12-01 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Industrial Eagle - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-11-08 - 2018-06-27 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Moskovskiy 8 - Tug boat / 2016-05-23 - 2016-07-31 (2 months)
2nd Officer: ROSSANA - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-04 - 2024-09-15 (5 months)
3rd Officer: TD HAMBURG - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-03 - 2024-01-31 (5 months)
3rd Officer: TD HAMBURG - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-17 - 2023-03-21 (7 months)
AB Seaman: CMA CGM RIVOLI - Container Ship / 2022-01-07 - 2022-07-16 (6 months)
OS: CMA CGM JACQUES SAADE - Container Ship / 2020-09-22 - 2021-02-01 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Thun Liffey - Chemical tanker / 2023-12-09 - 2024-03-07 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Thun Liffey - Chemical tanker / 2023-04-18 - 2023-08-19 (4 months)
AB Seaman: NS Laguna - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-04-15 - 2022-11-22 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Four Wind - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-07-18 - 2021-12-06 (5 months)
OS: Marvin Faith - Chemical tanker / 2020-09-12 - 2021-01-31 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Freedom - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-30 - 2023-04-15 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Nicholas - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-22 - 2022-08-08 (11 months)
AB Seaman: Nicholas - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-01 - 2021-06-24 (5 months)
OS: Nicholas - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-09 - 2021-01-31 (3 months)
OS: Ilia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-31 - 2020-08-22 (8 months)
2nd Officer: LIVLAND - General cargo / 2023-06-07 - 2023-10-18 (4 months)
2nd Officer: NIKO PIROSMANI - General cargo / 2021-10-06 - 2022-03-21 (5 months)
OS: HUNTER - Fishing vessel / 2020-09-26 - 2021-01-29 (4 months)
OS: GALILEO - Fishing vessel / 2019-11-20 - 2020-07-08 (8 months)
OS: NOVAYA ZEMLYA - Reefer / 2016-09-21 - 2017-04-30 (7 months)
3rd Officer: ALP Forward - AHTS / 2024-05-08 - 2024-07-11 (2 months)
3rd Officer: Jabal Samhan - Bulk Carrier / 2023-09-21 - 2024-03-03 (5 months)
3rd Officer: BBC Pearl - Heavy lift vessel / 2022-11-19 - 2023-05-31 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Dioni GR. - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-17 - 2022-05-15 (9 months)
OS: Sloman Discharger - General cargo / 2020-07-01 - 2021-01-29 (7 months)
3rd Officer: Amalia - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-11 - 2023-06-14 (11 months)
AB Seaman: Nordic Tellus - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-13 - 2022-01-15 (6 months)
OS: Nordic Light - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-28 - 2021-01-28 (6 months)
OS: Nordic Light - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-17 - 2020-02-15 (6 months)
OS: Crown Iris - Cruise Liner / 2018-10-20 - 2019-03-12 (5 months)
OS: simphony sea - Heavy lift vessel / 2021-01-05 - 2021-01-28 (1 month)
OS: Daina - General cargo / 2020-06-17 - 2020-11-24 (5 months)
OS: Anna Maria - Bulk Carrier / 2019-06-24 - 2019-10-28 (4 months)
OS: Avra Miteras - Other vessels / 2018-12-28 - 2019-02-28 (2 months)
OS: M/V Armata - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-27 - 2018-01-08 (5 months)
3rd Officer: AS SILJE - Container Ship / 2023-08-02 - 2024-01-28 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Madrid Trader - Container Ship / 2021-06-29 - 2022-01-11 (6 months)
OS: Grete Sibum - Container Ship / 2020-07-26 - 2021-01-26 (6 months)
OS: New Gemeni - General cargo / 2019-10-01 - 2020-04-15 (6 months)
OS: Sormovskiy-123 - General cargo / 2018-08-10 - 2019-05-27 (10 months)
3rd Officer: KAVKAZ V - Bulk Carrier / 2024-05-17 - 2024-09-30 (4 months)
3rd Officer: KAVKAZ V - Bulk Carrier / 2023-07-14 - 2023-11-17 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Polar Rock - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-01 - 2023-04-29 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Lady Aria - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-11 - 2022-03-17 (10 months)
OS: Vilesh River - Chemical tanker / 2020-08-12 - 2021-01-25 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Antheia - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-18 - 2023-04-17 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Vinjerac - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-05-22 - 2021-12-13 (7 months)
OS: Arctic Blizzard - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-16 - 2021-01-24 (6 months)
OS: Arctic Bay - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-09-11 - 2020-03-01 (6 months)
OS: Arctic Bay - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-10-17 - 2019-05-05 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Pomerenia Sky - Container Ship / 2021-05-26 - 2021-11-28 (6 months)
OS: Polar Peru - Container Ship / 2020-08-13 - 2021-01-23 (5 months)
OS: Commodore Goodwill - RO-RO / 2020-01-23 - 2020-05-26 (4 months)
OS: Pavo J - Container Ship / 2019-02-18 - 2019-10-17 (8 months)
Deck Cadet: Pavo J - Container Ship / 2018-02-28 - 2018-10-14 (8 months)
OS: CSL SPIRIT - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-14 - 2021-01-22 (6 months)
OS: FERBEC - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-30 - 2020-03-19 (3 months)
OS: TRAMPER - General cargo / 2019-03-07 - 2019-08-30 (6 months)
OS: FLAGSHIP ORHID - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-10-12 - 2018-04-19 (6 months)
OS: RIVER SHINER - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-06-07 - 2017-03-12 (9 months)
OS: E.R.YOKOHAMA - Container Ship / 2020-12-11 - 2021-01-21 (1 month)
OS: Langeness - Container Ship / 2019-08-12 - 2020-03-06 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: langeness - Container Ship / 2018-07-21 - 2019-01-25 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Igarka - General cargo / 2016-04-17 - 2016-08-10 (4 months)