Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: RINA - Bunkering Vessel / 2023-02-21 - 2023-04-15 (2 months)
AB Seaman: AYANE - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-30 - 2022-12-06 (4 months)
Junior officer: STAR FIRST - Reefer / 2021-11-25 - 2022-04-03 (4 months)
OS: Leevsten - RO-RO / 2021-04-26 - 2021-09-27 (5 months)
OS: TRANSBAY - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-10-06 - 2020-08-22 (11 months)
AB Seaman: M/v Port Imabari - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-13 - 2023-06-13 (6 months)
AB Seaman: m/v “Port Kyushu” - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-16 - 2022-09-13 (8 months)
OS: M/v “ Port Kyushu - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-06 - 2021-09-25 (7 months)
OS: M/v “Iliana” - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-11 - 2020-07-22 (9 months)
OS: M/v”Nicholas” - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-20 - 2019-06-08 (7 months)
2nd Officer: LEONID LEONOV - General cargo / 2023-08-12 - 2024-06-20 (10 months)
OS: Kiowa - General cargo / 2021-04-05 - 2021-09-25 (6 months)
OS: Seneca - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-22 - 2020-11-10 (5 months)
OS: Mohican - General cargo / 2019-09-03 - 2020-02-17 (5 months)
OS: Comanche - General cargo / 2018-10-19 - 2019-04-09 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Amber Trader - General cargo / 2024-02-18 - 2024-05-18 (3 months)
3rd Officer: Amber Trader - General cargo / 2023-11-22 - 2024-02-17 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Roadrunner Bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2022-09-05 - 2023-01-23 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Owl - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-04 - 2022-04-25 (4 months)
OS: Egret Bulker - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-18 - 2021-09-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Sky Rider - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-21 - 2022-12-17 (2 months)
AB Seaman: TORO - Chemical tanker / 2022-05-03 - 2022-10-20 (6 months)
OS: Four Wind - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-20 - 2021-09-19 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Kapitan Pshenitsin - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-01-27 - 2020-08-08 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Kapitan Pshenitsin - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-08-04 - 2019-10-06 (2 months)
OS: Olympus - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-13 - 2021-09-19 (7 months)
OS: Moguchiy - Tug boat / 2020-08-20 - 2020-10-18 (2 months)
OS: Avigail - Tug boat / 2018-12-18 - 2019-03-16 (3 months)
OS: Dobroslav - Tug boat / 2017-12-12 - 2018-04-24 (4 months)
OS: Oura - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-28 - 2017-06-30 (6 months)
AB Seaman: mv “Sanita S” - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-20 - 2022-07-28 (5 months)
OS: mv “Rego” - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-19 - 2021-09-18 (7 months)
OS: mv Eraclea - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-21 - 2020-07-16 (7 months)
OS: mv “Lady Celine” - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-04 - 2019-04-29 (6 months)
OS: mv “Lady Celine” - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-13 - 2018-07-14 (6 months)
OS: Front Singapore - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-11 - 2021-09-18 (5 months)
OS: Ridgebury Pallas - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-02-12 - 2020-08-16 (6 months)
OS: Nordic Space - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-08-06 - 2019-02-16 (6 months)
OS: Nordic Zenith - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-05-05 - 2017-12-11 (7 months)
OS: Cape Martin - Container Ship / 2016-04-15 - 2016-10-21 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Capella - General cargo / 2021-09-29 - 2021-11-12 (1 month)
OS: Smaland - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-04-28 - 2021-09-17 (5 months)
OS: Froland - General cargo / 2020-07-22 - 2020-12-18 (5 months)
OS: Froland - General cargo / 2019-10-20 - 2020-01-21 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Froland - General cargo / 2019-07-02 - 2019-10-19 (4 months)
OS: ALL STAR ATLAS - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-30 - 2021-09-16 (8 months)
OS: MAHMET AGA - General cargo / 2019-12-21 - 2020-06-18 (6 months)
OS: HIZIR - General cargo / 2018-09-10 - 2019-03-19 (6 months)
OS: HIZIR - General cargo / 2018-06-27 - 2018-09-08 (2 months)
OS: MELA - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-06-08 - 2018-02-10 (8 months)
OS: LAURA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-05-31 - 2021-09-15 (3 months)
OS: SEA CRUISER 1 - Ferry / 2020-11-08 - 2021-04-17 (5 months)
OS: CSL TARANTAU - Bulk Carrier / 2020-05-26 - 2020-09-26 (4 months)
OS: CSL METIS - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-15 - 2019-12-19 (5 months)
OS: CSL ACADIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-07 - 2019-03-12 (4 months)
3rd Officer: STI Wembley - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-07-11 - 2022-10-10 (3 months)
3rd Officer: STI Pimlico - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-12-20 - 2022-04-23 (4 months)
OS: STI Comandante - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-07 - 2021-09-13 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Clipper Barolo - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-04 - 2020-12-18 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: BBC Vesuvius - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2018-04-14 - 2018-10-17 (6 months)
OS: NODUS - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-21 - 2021-09-10 (6 months)
OS: IGRIM - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-01-04 - 2019-06-17 (5 months)
OS: Ocean Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2007-03-05 - 2007-11-25 (9 months)
Mess Boy: Ocean Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2005-11-28 - 2006-10-10 (10 months)
OS: Федор Попов - Bulk Carrier / 2005-06-24 - 2005-09-30 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Glomar Baltic - Standby-safety vessel / 2021-07-18 - 2021-09-10 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Glomar Advance - Standby-safety vessel / 2021-07-14 - 2021-07-17 (3 days)
AB Seaman: Glomar Baltic - Standby-safety vessel / 2021-04-18 - 2021-07-08 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Glomar Baltic - Standby-safety vessel / 2020-12-10 - 2021-02-13 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Glomar Baltic - Standby-safety vessel / 2020-07-30 - 2020-09-30 (2 months)
3rd Officer: SANAR 2 - Chemical tanker / 2023-08-11 - 2024-01-06 (5 months)
OS: Eastern Pride - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-25 - 2021-09-09 (3 months)
AB Seaman: GENERAL HAZI ASLANOV - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-05-25 - 2020-10-12 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: KHERSONES - Sailing Vessel / 2019-07-07 - 2019-09-05 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Energy Commander - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-02-11 - 2022-08-23 (6 months)
OS: Ns Yakutia - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-12 - 2021-09-08 (8 months)
OS: Ns Corona - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-02-09 - 2019-07-25 (6 months)
OS: Ns Century - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-11-09 - 2018-05-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Energy Puma - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-06-27 - 2015-12-26 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Oralora - Chemical tanker / 2024-05-24 - 2024-08-16 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Libera - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-07-31 - 2024-01-26 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Libera - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-07 - 2023-05-01 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Veter - VLCC / 2021-11-15 - 2022-06-13 (7 months)
OS: Tivoli Park - Chemical tanker / 2021-04-06 - 2021-09-08 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Azov - General cargo / 2023-12-15 - 2024-04-20 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Volgograd - General cargo / 2023-05-13 - 2023-10-07 (5 months)
OS: KOOL ORCA - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-04 - 2021-09-07 (6 months)
OS: VELIKIY NOVGOROD - LPG / LNG / 2019-02-25 - 2019-08-17 (6 months)
OS: VELIKIY NOVGOROD - LPG / LNG / 2018-03-20 - 2018-09-06 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Selena - General cargo / 2023-02-15 - 2023-09-02 (7 months)
2nd Officer: OLLAN - Tug boat / 2022-11-02 - 2023-01-31 (3 months)
AB Seaman: ANYA - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-21 - 2022-06-05 (6 months)
OS: ELSABETH C - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-25 - 2021-09-07 (10 months)
OS: MENOMONEE - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-23 - 2020-07-01 (8 months)
3rd Officer: PEGASUS - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-06 - 2024-06-17 (2 months)
3rd Officer: CETUS BOWHEAD - Bulk Carrier / 2023-06-30 - 2023-11-20 (5 months)
3rd Officer: OBROVAC - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-22 - 2023-05-26 (2 months)
3rd Officer: OBROVAC - Bulk Carrier / 2022-05-29 - 2022-12-26 (7 months)
OS: Ugljan - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-20 - 2021-09-07 (8 months)