Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Deck Cadet: Hadjibey - Passenger vessel / 2019-07-24 - 2019-08-16 (1 month)
AB Seaman: HIZIR - General cargo / 2018-05-29 - 2019-03-03 (9 months)
OS: Donmaster Spirit - General cargo / 2018-08-03 - 2019-02-06 (6 months)
OS: Viktor Borisov - General cargo / 2017-05-13 - 2017-10-24 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Nadezhda - Sailing Vessel / 2016-10-28 - 2016-11-26 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Viktor Borisov - General cargo / 2016-04-13 - 2016-07-04 (3 months)
OS: DIAMOND C - General cargo / 2018-05-08 - 2018-10-22 (5 months)
OS: MV THAI BINH BAY - Bulk Carrier / 2018-01-10 - 2018-08-21 (7 months)
OS: Knyaz Vladimir - Cruise Liner / 2017-12-01 - 2018-05-21 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Черноморец -6 - Crane vessel / 2017-07-05 - 2017-09-05 (2 months)
OS: MV ASTOR - Cruise Liner / 2017-07-14 - 2018-04-21 (9 months)
Junior officer: mt Leon Hermes - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-06-05 - 2018-11-04 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: mt Leon Hermes - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-05-06 - 2018-06-05 (1 month)
OS: mv Hazar - General cargo / 2017-08-15 - 2018-01-22 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: mv Hazar - General cargo / 2016-10-20 - 2017-04-16 (6 months)
OS: Iskatel - Other vessels / 2017-04-15 - 2018-01-20 (9 months)
OS: Ocean Marvel - Bulk Carrier / 2017-08-26 - 2018-01-13 (5 months)
OS: Патриот - Tug boat / 2017-05-25 - 2017-08-30 (3 months)
OS: MTT KINABALU - Container Ship / 2016-07-05 - 2017-02-15 (7 months)
AB Seaman: MV Megastar - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-27 - 2018-02-08 (10 months)
OS: MV Parnia - General cargo / 2015-02-25 - 2016-06-18 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Habjibey - Yacht / 2016-02-12 - 2016-04-13 (2 months)
OS: KHADJIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2015-12-16 - 2016-02-19 (2 months)
OS: Pintail - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-24 - 2014-03-25 (9 months)
OS: Le Diamont - Cruise Liner / 2013-11-04 - 2013-11-27 (1 month)
OS: Stark - Bulk Carrier / 2012-09-09 - 2013-02-28 (6 months)
OS: Yeditepe - Bulk Carrier / 2012-03-07 - 2013-03-24 (1 year)
OS: OSHEN WEY - Crane vessel / 2012-02-12 - 2012-11-18 (9 months)
2nd Officer: Katerina - Dry Cargo / 2012-01-24 - 2012-07-06 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Kirklareli - Bulk Carrier / 2011-01-28 - 2011-07-30 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Mykola Slavov - Bulk Carrier / 2010-07-01 - 2010-10-15 (3 months)
OS: Conqueror - Bulk Carrier / 2008-06-15 - 2009-02-16 (8 months)