Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
AB Seaman: Venator - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-21 - 2021-02-18 (8 months)
OS: Star Mistral - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-14 - 2019-10-03 (6 months)
OS: Ocean Saga - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-21 - 2018-09-29 (6 months)
OS: Ultramer - Bulk Carrier / 2017-01-05 - 2017-08-17 (7 months)
OS: Thor - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-08 - 2016-07-19 (7 months)
OS: WONDER I - Container Ship / 2019-03-27 - 2019-09-16 (6 months)
AB / Welder: Norman - Coaster / 2022-07-01 - 2023-07-01 (1 year)
AB / Welder: Norman - Coaster / 2021-09-12 - 2022-04-15 (7 months)
AB / Welder: Petr Hamitov - General cargo / 2020-07-04 - 2021-02-02 (7 months)
OS: River Grace - General cargo / 2018-09-08 - 2019-06-10 (9 months)
OS / Welder: River Grace - General cargo / 2017-10-20 - 2018-06-19 (8 months)
OS: Markin - Icebreaker / 2019-03-11 - 2019-05-10 (2 months)
OS: Хазарборг - Tug boat / 2019-01-16 - 2019-03-21 (2 months)
OS: M/V BADE - General cargo / 2017-12-12 - 2018-12-22 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: M/V DIONE - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-01 - 2018-11-05 (6 months)
OS: MOGUCHIY - Tug boat / 2018-07-23 - 2018-09-21 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: МБ "Бригадир" - Crew boat / 2018-03-10 - 2018-05-10 (2 months)
AB / Welder: Atria - General cargo / 2017-10-04 - 2018-04-06 (6 months)
OS: Atria - General cargo / 2017-04-28 - 2017-08-13 (4 months)
OS: m/v Kapitan Shyriagin - General cargo / 2016-06-02 - 2017-04-05 (10 months)
OS: BORIS MAKAROV - Other vessels / 2016-01-11 - 2016-03-11 (2 months)
AB Seaman: ST.Nicolas - General cargo / 2019-05-08 - 2019-09-01 (4 months)
OS: Spectrum 5 - General cargo / 2017-04-13 - 2017-11-16 (7 months)
OS: Babylon - General cargo / 2016-03-14 - 2016-10-22 (7 months)
OS: M/v rondo - Dry Cargo / 2017-05-13 - 2017-09-04 (4 months)
OS: yunyi baltiets - Yacht / 2016-09-13 - 2016-09-22 (9 days)
OS: Portovik - Tug boat / 2017-05-22 - 2017-07-22 (2 months)
OS: Achilleus - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-21 - 2016-06-22 (6 months)
OS: XIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-01 - 2015-09-26 (6 months)
OS: XIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-01 - 2015-09-26 (6 months)
OS: XIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-01 - 2015-09-26 (6 months)
OS: XIAN - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-01 - 2015-09-26 (6 months)
OS: Dorset - General cargo / 2016-03-10 - 2016-06-11 (3 months)
OS: Wilson Brake - General cargo / 2015-08-14 - 2015-12-15 (4 months)
OS: m/v Queen Of Luck - Container Ship / 2014-08-04 - 2015-01-27 (6 months)
OS: Burun - Other vessels / 2014-02-17 - 2014-04-19 (2 months)
OS: pasific - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-05-12 - 2015-10-05 (5 months)
OS: pygachev - Other vessels / 2014-09-24 - 2015-05-01 (7 months)
OS: Alamak - Tug boat / 2015-07-20 - 2015-09-19 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: Pacific breeze - Reefer / 2015-03-06 - 2015-08-04 (5 months)
OS: Stolt Strength - Chemical tanker / 2014-10-31 - 2015-02-11 (3 months)
OS: Stolt Strength - Chemical tanker / 2014-03-22 - 2014-07-18 (4 months)
Steward: Stolt Strength - Chemical tanker / 2013-08-22 - 2013-10-26 (2 months)
AB / Welder: luigi - Fishing vessel / 2012-08-10 - 2012-10-09 (2 months)
OS: sergii skadovskyi - Dry Cargo / 2010-07-27 - 2011-01-20 (6 months)