Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: start - Dry Cargo / 2018-04-01 - 2018-04-14 (13 days)
OS: Merton 1 - Coaster / 2017-03-06 - 2018-04-06 (1 year)
OS: Merton 1 - Coaster / 2017-03-06 - 2018-03-06 (1 year)
Boatswain: Elegance - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-05-31 - 2023-05-15 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Shturman Albanov - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-10-03 - 2018-12-12 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Shturman Albanov - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-04-30 - 2018-07-16 (3 months)
OS: Shturman Albanov - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-12-08 - 2018-02-27 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Artey - General cargo / 2017-02-20 - 2017-04-23 (2 months)
AB / Crane Operator: mv milestone - General cargo / 2017-02-16 - 2018-04-11 (1 year)
OS: mv trident challenger - Bulk Carrier / 2016-05-26 - 2016-12-21 (7 months)
OS: SV Anna - Dry Cargo / 2016-03-01 - 2016-05-01 (2 months)
OS: Nefterudovoz 36m - Dry Cargo / 2015-08-20 - 2015-12-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: Atlan - Fishing vessel / 2016-04-24 - 2016-09-04 (4 months)
OS: Bridgegate - Bulk Carrier / 2014-10-14 - 2015-07-04 (9 months)
OS: Sea Arrow - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-30 - 2014-10-10 (3 months)
OS: Lantana - Oil Products Tanker / 2012-08-25 - 2012-12-07 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Jana - Bulk Carrier / 2011-05-25 - 2011-08-30 (3 months)
OS: Eva Maria Mueller - Coaster / 2014-09-29 - 2015-01-21 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Christina - Coaster / 2014-01-20 - 2014-08-02 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Fedor Uriupin - AHTS / 2012-09-03 - 2013-03-04 (6 months)
3rd Officer: Kapitan Chekha - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-17 - 2015-09-27 (4 months)
OS: Nairobi - Container Ship / 2014-04-08 - 2014-06-11 (2 months)
OS: MSC Chiara - Container Ship / 2012-12-20 - 2013-06-30 (6 months)
OS: MSC Sariska - Container Ship / 2011-05-04 - 2011-11-20 (7 months)
OS: Rotter Trader - Bulk Carrier / 2010-03-21 - 2010-11-30 (8 months)
Boatswain: River Pride - General cargo / 2016-10-08 - 2017-04-10 (6 months)
AB Seaman: River Pride - General cargo / 2016-01-16 - 2016-09-01 (8 months)
AB Seaman: Excalibur - General cargo / 2014-10-20 - 2015-04-29 (6 months)
OS: EVCENIA-Z - General cargo / 2013-08-10 - 2014-03-27 (8 months)
OS: IZMAILSKAYA - Other vessels / 2013-11-24 - 2014-03-01 (3 months)
OS: Piotr Zhitnikov - Fishing vessel / 2013-04-29 - 2013-11-17 (7 months)
OS: C/V Reecon emir / V7PZ4 - Container Ship / 2012-10-16 - 2013-08-28 (10 months)
Cook: Sun Princess - Cruise Liner / 2013-06-12 - 2014-01-16 (7 months)
OS: Jetstream - Dry Cargo / 2010-11-04 - 2012-11-10 (2 years)
OS: Jet stream - Dry Cargo / 2010-05-20 - 2011-03-11 (10 months)
OS: Jetstream - Dry Cargo / 2010-06-30 - 2011-03-10 (8 months)
OS: Jet stream - Dry Cargo / 2010-05-10 - 2011-02-18 (9 months)
OS: Helikon - Bulk Carrier / 2009-02-20 - 2009-08-26 (6 months)
OS: Havis-7 - General cargo / 2024-03-17 - 2024-07-21 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Атаман - Passenger vessel / 2023-03-14 - 2023-05-14 (2 months)
OS: Volgo-Don 219 - Dry Cargo / 2024-01-27 - 2024-03-29 (2 months)
OS: M.V IBN-AL-WALEED - RO-RO / 2023-11-18 - 2024-02-17 (3 months)
Trainee OS: PORTO LEONE - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-14 - 2023-10-14 (10 months)
AB Seaman: M.V LUCENT - Bulk Carrier / 2023-01-12 - 2023-10-14 (9 months)
OS: M.V. MARAL2 - Landing Craft / 2020-11-07 - 2021-06-23 (8 months)