Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: Almirante Storni - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-21 - 2017-11-26 (5 months)
OS: Ostermarsch - General cargo / 2016-08-06 - 2017-02-13 (6 months)
OS: EMMAKRIS I - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-11 - 2016-07-06 (3 months)
OS: EASTGATE S - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-14 - 2016-02-02 (2 months)
OS: EASTGATE S - Bulk Carrier / 2013-03-20 - 2013-07-31 (4 months)
OS: Max Mars - Container Ship / 2017-05-04 - 2017-10-03 (5 months)
OS: Juliana - General cargo / 2015-08-05 - 2016-03-20 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Charon J - Container Ship / 2014-01-11 - 2014-06-13 (5 months)
AB Seaman: CRS Rebecca - Other vessels / 2018-09-16 - 2018-11-25 (2 months)
AB Seaman: HC NATALIA - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-02 - 2018-06-16 (6 months)
OS: HC LARA - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2017-02-15 - 2017-07-25 (5 months)
OS: MV HC EVA MARIE - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2016-04-17 - 2016-10-11 (6 months)
OS: MV PALESSA - Heavy lift vessel / 2015-06-25 - 2015-11-25 (5 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Gogland rifer - Reefer / 2020-02-06 - 2020-07-20 (5 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Baltic forward - Reefer / 2019-05-06 - 2019-09-04 (4 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Baltic forward - Reefer / 2018-06-07 - 2018-09-19 (3 months)
AB / Crane Operator: Pearl bay - Reefer / 2017-10-01 - 2018-04-21 (7 months)
OS: Frio forwin - Reefer / 2017-04-09 - 2017-04-30 (1 month)
OS: Tavricheskiy Bridge - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-10-09 - 2017-04-23 (6 months)
OS: Ns Power - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-07-30 - 2016-03-12 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Energy Skier - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-11-27 - 2014-05-08 (5 months)
3rd Officer: FURNESS PORTLAND - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-06 - 2017-09-10 (5 months)
OS: LENE SELMER - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-23 - 2017-03-16 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: WEHT WESER - Container Ship / 2015-10-03 - 2016-03-03 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: VARAMO - Container Ship / 2014-03-03 - 2014-12-04 (9 months)
OS: Саspian GAS - LPG / LNG / 2016-02-09 - 2016-09-23 (7 months)
OS: odergas - LPG / LNG / 2015-09-12 - 2016-01-21 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Barnacle - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-16 - 2015-01-07 (7 months)
OS: Puna - Bulk Carrier / 2013-06-27 - 2013-12-20 (6 months)
OS: Zoya - Ferry / 2012-04-17 - 2012-12-25 (8 months)
AB Seaman: ALION - Container Ship / 2018-01-07 - 2018-08-16 (7 months)
AB Seaman: HH EAST - Container Ship / 2016-11-17 - 2017-06-07 (7 months)
OS: HH NORTH - Container Ship / 2016-03-05 - 2016-08-04 (5 months)
3rd Officer: THOR - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-11 - 2017-10-02 (11 months)
OS: STAR MISTRAL - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-18 - 2016-05-31 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: AFRICAN WIND - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2014-08-10 - 2015-03-17 (7 months)
AB Seaman: St.Nicolas - General cargo / 2019-09-23 - 2020-07-11 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Selim-1 - General cargo / 2018-12-26 - 2019-02-17 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Alvadi-1 - General cargo / 2018-07-26 - 2018-12-23 (5 months)
OS: Hizir - General cargo / 2016-01-08 - 2016-05-17 (4 months)
OS: Profit - Dry Cargo / 2015-10-11 - 2015-12-30 (3 months)
Junior officer: Pserimos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-10-26 - 2016-04-19 (6 months)
OS: Msc Chiara - Container Ship / 2014-10-01 - 2015-04-30 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Cymbeline - Bulk Carrier / 2013-08-21 - 2013-12-02 (3 months)
OS: Cymbeline - Bulk Carrier / 2013-04-27 - 2013-08-20 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Cerafina - Bulk Carrier / 2012-12-04 - 2013-01-08 (1 month)
AB Seaman: M/V Gemini - Passenger vessel / 2018-04-04 - 2020-01-19 (1 year)
AB Seaman: Zurbaran - Ferry / 2016-11-29 - 2017-03-05 (3 months)
AB Seaman: Las palmas de gran canaria - Ferry / 2016-07-06 - 2016-11-28 (5 months)
OS: M/V Azores - Passenger vessel / 2013-06-06 - 2014-06-15 (1 year)
OS: M/V Arion - Passenger vessel / 2009-05-30 - 2012-12-06 (3 years)
2nd Officer: Haian Song - Container Ship / 2015-04-06 - 2015-10-08 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Prosperity - General cargo / 2014-06-13 - 2014-10-27 (4 months)
2nd Officer: DON STAR - General cargo / 2014-02-08 - 2014-06-12 (4 months)
2nd Officer: Pechora - Dry Cargo / 2013-04-17 - 2013-10-22 (6 months)
OS: Reymar - Dry Cargo / 2012-06-15 - 2013-02-16 (8 months)
3rd Officer: ABB VANESSA - General cargo / 2019-12-21 - 2020-07-19 (7 months)
3rd Officer: OSLO WAVE 4 - General cargo / 2019-02-26 - 2019-07-18 (5 months)
3rd Officer: ATMODA - Reefer / 2015-11-21 - 2016-07-22 (8 months)
Trainee Officer: KRUZENSHTERN - Sailing Vessel / 2013-04-12 - 2013-08-15 (4 months)
OS: KURSHSKAYA KOSA - Fishing vessel / 2012-01-14 - 2012-05-07 (4 months)
OS: front future - Oil Products Tanker / 2023-03-29 - 2024-11-08 (1 year)
OS: FRONT SINGAPOUR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-11-30 - 2024-03-16 (3 months)
OS: EL GAIA - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-03-05 - 2020-11-27 (9 months)
OS: ELDORADO - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-05-01 - 2017-09-30 (5 months)
OS: Sormovskiy-3068 - General cargo / 2024-05-05 - 2024-09-25 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: Mir - Sailing Vessel / 2023-04-20 - 2023-06-26 (2 months)
OS: Tekhnolog Sarkisov - Fishing vessel / 2024-06-07 - 2024-08-22 (2 months)
OS: Staryy Arbat - Fishing vessel / 2024-01-27 - 2024-05-17 (4 months)
OS: Evangelia D - Bulk Carrier / 2024-02-19 - 2024-07-27 (5 months)
OS: Emmakris 1 - Bulk Carrier / 2022-01-22 - 2022-07-21 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Tatiana P - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-24 - 2021-07-26 (4 months)
OS: Nizami Ganjavi - Chemical tanker / 2024-03-07 - 2024-07-25 (5 months)
OS: Nizami Ganjavi - Chemical tanker / 2023-06-28 - 2023-09-30 (3 months)
OS: Nizami Ganjavi - Chemical tanker / 2022-10-10 - 2023-03-03 (5 months)
OS: Alireza-1 - General cargo / 2021-05-06 - 2021-08-26 (4 months)
OS: Nanto - Container Ship / 2024-03-15 - 2024-07-12 (4 months)
OS: Nanto - Container Ship / 2023-08-11 - 2023-12-15 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: Stolt Sea - Chemical tanker / 2022-07-19 - 2023-01-15 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Ice Ranger - Reefer / 2020-02-27 - 2020-07-14 (5 months)