Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: GS-270 - Survey vessel / 2021-03-09 - 2021-04-26 (2 months)
OS: GS-118 - Survey vessel / 2020-08-03 - 2020-08-30 (1 month)
OS: Nikolay Matuseevich - Survey vessel / 2019-03-30 - 2019-07-12 (3 months)
OS: Nikolay Matuseevich - Survey vessel / 2018-05-07 - 2018-07-09 (2 months)
AB Seaman: "SIKINOS" - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-30 - 2023-03-07 (5 months)
AB Seaman: «Teatralny Bridge» - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-09-06 - 2022-03-05 (6 months)
OS: «Tverskoy Bridge» - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-10-01 - 2021-04-24 (7 months)
OS: «BAKU STAR» - Dry Cargo / 2019-08-03 - 2019-12-15 (4 months)
OS: «BERTRAN» - Dry Cargo / 2018-11-21 - 2019-06-01 (6 months)
OS: Platanos - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-13 - 2021-03-30 (5 months)
OS: Meteora - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-07 - 2020-06-01 (8 months)
OS: Balkan 1 - General cargo / 2019-03-11 - 2019-07-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: ELISE - General cargo / 2022-09-13 - 2023-01-18 (4 months)
3rd Officer: LAETITIA V - Landing Craft / 2021-11-26 - 2022-07-02 (7 months)
OS: REMBRANDT - Bulk Carrier / 2020-12-03 - 2021-03-28 (4 months)
OS: Mehmet Aga - General cargo / 2020-05-12 - 2020-11-01 (6 months)
OS: СПК-2 - Training Ship / 2019-10-28 - 2019-12-28 (2 months)
3rd Officer: BARBAROSA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-07-05 - 2024-01-07 (6 months)
AB Seaman: ANGEL - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-10-12 - 2023-06-02 (8 months)
AB Seaman: ORION - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-10-18 - 2022-05-20 (7 months)
OS: SAGA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-10 - 2021-03-02 (4 months)
OS: Yeoman Bank - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-13 - 2020-05-20 (5 months)
OS: Ophelia 1 - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-08-27 - 2021-02-28 (6 months)
OS: Nikolay Telenkov - Fishing vessel / 2019-05-16 - 2019-06-19 (1 month)
OS: Novator - Tug boat / 2018-11-26 - 2019-01-28 (2 months)
OS: Captain Nezavytin - Tug boat / 2018-05-29 - 2018-08-31 (3 months)
OS: Sider Atlantic - Other vessels / 2020-07-29 - 2021-02-11 (6 months)
Messman: Vos primrose - Tug boat / 2018-05-12 - 2018-07-08 (2 months)
Steward: Vos primrose - Tug boat / 2017-09-07 - 2017-10-25 (2 months)
Mess Boy: Bourbon Argos - AHTS / 2016-09-29 - 2016-11-24 (2 months)
Mess Boy: Bourbon Argos - AHTS / 2016-07-03 - 2016-09-02 (2 months)
OS: Port Belmonte - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-07 - 2021-01-16 (6 months)
OS: Daimongate - Bulk Carrier / 2019-04-30 - 2019-09-16 (5 months)
OS: Daimongate - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-01 - 2018-09-15 (6 months)
OS: BRIDGEGATE - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-23 - 2017-08-25 (6 months)
OS: Delruba - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-29 - 2016-05-10 (6 months)
Boatswain: Makhambet - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-06-15 - 2022-12-12 (6 months)
Boatswain: BALT FLOT 6 - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-06-29 - 2021-11-15 (5 months)
OS: ANDREY PERVOZVANNIY - Dry Cargo / 2020-05-11 - 2021-01-15 (8 months)
OS: Linda - Dry Cargo / 2019-07-22 - 2019-10-28 (3 months)
OS: Begey - Dry Cargo / 2018-09-07 - 2019-02-01 (5 months)
OS: m/v“ Behnavaz” - Container Ship / 2020-06-15 - 2021-01-12 (7 months)
OS: m/v“ Crown Iris” - Cruise Liner / 2019-05-12 - 2019-12-02 (7 months)
OS: m/v “ Volaris 52” - General cargo / 2018-04-28 - 2018-08-29 (4 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v “ Volaris 52” - General cargo / 2018-02-10 - 2018-04-27 (3 months)
OS: m/v "Rix Amethyst" - General cargo / 2020-07-02 - 2020-12-15 (5 months)
OS: m/v "Mriya'S" - General cargo / 2019-07-25 - 2019-12-30 (5 months)
Deck Cadet: m/v "Batis" - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-05 - 2018-11-07 (6 months)
OS: CMA CGM LOIRE - Container Ship / 2020-06-12 - 2020-11-19 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Vitoria S - General cargo / 2019-08-30 - 2020-01-31 (5 months)
OS: Ice Star - Container Ship / 2018-01-02 - 2018-06-21 (6 months)
OS: ICE STAR - Container Ship / 2017-03-06 - 2017-09-12 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Sanad - General cargo / 2015-03-20 - 2015-10-13 (7 months)
OS: Seal Sands - Dredger / 2020-10-23 - 2020-11-09 (1 month)
OS: Seal Sands - Dredger / 2020-03-11 - 2020-05-05 (2 months)
OS: NICA - Container Ship / 2017-09-22 - 2017-10-17 (1 month)
3rd Officer: TG Arktika - Bulk Carrier / 2023-03-03 - 2023-05-31 (3 months)
3rd Officer: TG Arktika - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-22 - 2022-12-09 (5 months)
Junior officer: Celine - RO-RO / 2021-12-20 - 2022-04-07 (4 months)
Junior officer: Celine - RO-RO / 2021-08-21 - 2021-11-10 (3 months)
OS: Akademik Tryoshnikov - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-07-14 - 2020-09-30 (3 months)
OS: Celestyal experience - Passenger vessel / 2020-08-24 - 2020-09-28 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: Moguchiy - Tug boat / 2019-12-26 - 2020-03-03 (2 months)
OS: Kentavr - Tug boat / 2019-06-03 - 2019-08-30 (3 months)
Junior officer: OIL TANKER ILIM - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-12 - 2021-11-08 (3 months)
OS: REEF VLAD ORION - Reefer / 2020-05-13 - 2020-09-23 (4 months)
OS: MB NIKOLAY IVANOV - AHTS / 2020-04-17 - 2020-05-12 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: CV PROFESSOR KHLYUSTIN - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-01 - 2019-04-05 (1 month)
Deck Cadet: SKS NADEJDA - Passenger vessel / 2019-01-28 - 2019-02-28 (1 month)
AB Seaman: Nireas - Bulk Carrier / 2021-09-27 - 2022-07-15 (10 months)
AB Seaman: Amapola - Bulk Carrier / 2021-02-13 - 2021-07-19 (5 months)
OS: Alicia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-01 - 2020-09-21 (11 months)
AB Seaman: ALTENAVI - General cargo / 2018-07-20 - 2018-12-25 (5 months)
OS: EVALUNA - General cargo / 2017-11-28 - 2018-04-03 (4 months)
OS: VOLGO-BALT 195 - General cargo / 2020-04-16 - 2020-09-13 (5 months)
OS: STK-1008 - General cargo / 2019-10-29 - 2019-12-28 (2 months)
OS: Nikolay Matusevich - Other vessels / 2018-04-13 - 2019-02-22 (10 months)
Deck Cadet: Kruzenshtern - Training Ship / 2017-04-04 - 2017-06-10 (2 months)
OS: Nyk Themis - Container Ship / 2019-12-17 - 2020-08-31 (8 months)
OS: MSC Janis 3 - Container Ship / 2019-02-13 - 2019-09-03 (7 months)
OS: MSC Adriana - Container Ship / 2017-10-06 - 2018-06-03 (8 months)
OS: MSC Maria - Container Ship / 2016-11-05 - 2017-07-03 (8 months)
OS: Golden Iris - Passenger vessel / 2016-05-14 - 2016-07-15 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Tugur - Fishing vessel / 2021-07-14 - 2021-12-23 (5 months)
OS: Vitim - Fishing vessel / 2020-05-09 - 2020-08-27 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Tsaritsa - Fishing vessel / 2019-07-19 - 2019-10-12 (3 months)
OS: Valeriy Maslakov - Fishing vessel / 2018-06-19 - 2018-10-30 (4 months)
OS: Reineke - Fishing vessel / 2018-03-01 - 2018-05-29 (3 months)