Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
OS: M.V BEHTA - Container Ship / 2019-04-04 - 2019-07-14 (3 months)
AB Seaman: M.T PAGAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-07-23 - 2019-01-21 (6 months)
OS: M.V NEGAR - General cargo / 2018-01-18 - 2018-04-21 (3 months)
OS: M.V Inter Sydney - Container Ship / 2017-08-03 - 2017-09-30 (2 months)
Junior officer: Front Lynx - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-25 - 2021-09-25 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: SFL Trinity - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-03-16 - 2020-09-12 (6 months)
OS: Unisky - Container Ship / 2019-01-16 - 2019-05-23 (4 months)
OS: O.M. Aestatis - Container Ship / 2016-06-29 - 2016-09-21 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: O.M. Aestatis - Container Ship / 2016-05-10 - 2016-06-28 (2 months)
3rd Officer: MSC AbigailF - Container Ship / 2023-05-23 - 2023-10-23 (5 months)
3rd Officer: Senata - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-10 - 2022-10-09 (8 months)
3rd Officer: Salvinia - General cargo / 2021-01-28 - 2021-08-24 (7 months)
AB Seaman: Sophia I - General cargo / 2019-08-20 - 2020-04-14 (8 months)
OS: Sophia I - General cargo / 2018-10-07 - 2019-04-29 (7 months)
3rd Officer: RDJ Rijnstroom - General cargo / 2023-09-23 - 2024-02-03 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Wilson Hawk - General cargo / 2022-12-04 - 2023-04-13 (4 months)
AB Seaman: SINGAPORE - Container Ship / 2021-08-11 - 2022-07-09 (11 months)
AB / Crane Operator: MSC Zebra - Container Ship / 2019-11-06 - 2020-09-28 (11 months)
OS: CMA CGM Rabelais - Container Ship / 2018-10-25 - 2019-04-21 (6 months)
2nd Officer: Lady Sofia - Crude Oil Tanker / 2023-02-15 - 2023-11-21 (9 months)
2nd Officer: Aurora - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-05-14 - 2022-03-11 (10 months)
3rd Officer: Sigma Triumph - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-09-25 - 2021-01-29 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Cape Bellavista - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-08-28 - 2020-08-08 (11 months)
OS: Bareilly - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-12 - 2019-04-17 (5 months)
OS: Antigua - Cement Carrier / 2018-11-22 - 2019-02-28 (3 months)
OS: Boudicca - Cruise Liner / 2018-03-19 - 2018-03-29 (10 days)
OS: Corina - Container Ship / 2015-11-29 - 2016-05-25 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Rubin - Passenger vessel / 2015-07-01 - 2015-08-31 (2 months)
4th Engineer: Scf Plimoyt - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-09-06 - 2022-01-09 (4 months)
Motorman: SCF Pioneer - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-07-01 - 2021-01-04 (6 months)
Motorman: SCF Plymouth - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-07-18 - 2020-01-13 (6 months)
OS: SCF Provider - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-05-15 - 2018-12-25 (7 months)
OS: SCF Provider - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-06-30 - 2018-01-26 (7 months)
OS: Melissa - General cargo / 2018-06-03 - 2018-12-10 (6 months)
OS: ST Peter - Bulk Carrier / 2017-12-22 - 2018-05-04 (4 months)
OS: Courageous - Bulk Carrier / 2017-04-15 - 2017-11-17 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Zirka Dnipra - Cruise Liner / 2013-07-26 - 2013-09-26 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: OM-106 - Passenger vessel / 2012-05-16 - 2012-08-31 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Star balboa - Chemical tanker / 2019-03-15 - 2019-12-16 (9 months)
Deck Cadet: Hyde park - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-12-03 - 2019-03-09 (3 months)
OS: valviria - Tug boat / 2018-06-27 - 2018-11-27 (5 months)
OS: M/V "Achilleas S" - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-05 - 2018-11-09 (3 months)
OS: M/V "ILIA" - Bulk Carrier / 2017-11-08 - 2018-05-09 (6 months)
OS: M/V "CAPE KENNEDY" - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-09 - 2017-04-12 (6 months)
OS: M/V "CAPE KASOS" - Bulk Carrier / 2016-01-17 - 2016-07-24 (6 months)
Messman: M/V "CAPE KENNEDY" - Bulk Carrier / 2015-05-30 - 2015-10-15 (4 months)
Junior officer: MSC Busan - Container Ship / 2018-04-12 - 2018-08-18 (4 months)
Safety Officer: MSC VIGO - Container Ship / 2017-11-07 - 2018-03-05 (4 months)
OS: Honduras Star/ Liberia - Reefer / 2016-03-19 - 2016-10-02 (6 months)
OS: Almeda Star - Reefer / 2015-04-18 - 2015-10-02 (5 months)
AB Seaman: Oltenitsa - Bulk Carrier / 2013-05-29 - 2013-11-14 (6 months)
AB Seaman: ANNA THERESA - Bulk Carrier / 2023-08-19 - 2023-09-20 (1 month)
AB Seaman: SERENEA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-07-26 - 2022-01-12 (6 months)
AB Seaman: VINALINES GlORI - Oil Products Tanker / 2021-03-10 - 2021-06-29 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Asterdea - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-12-27 - 2020-04-01 (3 months)
OS: Sania - General cargo / 2017-08-18 - 2018-02-23 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Balt Flot 6 - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-04-27 - 2020-09-08 (4 months)
AB Seaman: Aleksandr Sannikov - Icebreaker / 2019-06-20 - 2019-12-17 (6 months)
AB Seaman: Angara - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-07-10 - 2019-03-31 (9 months)
OS: BBC Vesuvius - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-11-22 - 2018-02-16 (3 months)
OS: BBC Kibo - Heavy lift vessel / 2016-12-03 - 2017-06-11 (6 months)
Deckhand: M/Y Galaxy - Yacht / 2021-12-22 - 2023-05-09 (1 year)
Deck Cadet: Ural - Container Ship / 2019-04-25 - 2019-10-05 (5 months)
OS: Sofia - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-07 - 2018-01-24 (9 months)
AB Seaman: WAIKIKI - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-11-06 - 2021-01-23 (3 months)
AB Seaman: GLOBAL CARRIER - Heavy lift vessel / 2019-10-25 - 2020-06-05 (7 months)
AB Seaman: NESHAT - General cargo / 2018-06-08 - 2019-01-12 (7 months)
OS: BLUE FURY - General cargo / 2017-05-19 - 2017-09-18 (4 months)
OS: BENEDITO - General cargo / 2016-06-05 - 2016-12-29 (7 months)
Deck Cadet: Glomar Vantage - MRSV / 2018-10-03 - 2019-04-11 (6 months)
Deck Cadet: Glomar Scout - Standby-safety vessel / 2018-07-02 - 2018-08-23 (2 months)
AB Seaman: Mintaka I - ROV Support vessel / 2018-03-24 - 2018-06-13 (3 months)
Deck Cadet: Glomar Vantage - MRSV / 2018-01-24 - 2018-03-23 (2 months)
OS: M/V BARNET - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-14 - 2017-07-04 (8 months)
Watchkeeping Officer: SANAT - Other vessels / 2020-11-07 - 2020-12-24 (2 months)
Deck Cadet: SANAT - Tug boat / 2020-08-01 - 2020-10-01 (2 months)
OS: BOTNIA St. John’s - General cargo / 2016-01-02 - 2016-09-11 (8 months)
OS: Bugaz - Tug boat / 2013-01-30 - 2013-03-30 (2 months)
OS: Puna - Bulk Carrier / 2015-07-29 - 2016-02-01 (6 months)
OS: Cinnamon - Bulk Carrier / 2014-06-19 - 2015-01-14 (7 months)
OS: Bluewing - Bulk Carrier / 2013-11-27 - 2014-05-17 (6 months)
OS: m/v Erato - Container Ship / 2012-02-03 - 2012-10-03 (8 months)
OS: Земснаряд Antea - Drilling platform / 2011-03-21 - 2011-11-21 (8 months)
AB-Cook: ALABORG - Standby-safety vessel / 2018-06-02 - 2018-07-16 (1 month)
AB-Cook: MARRY ANN - Standby-safety vessel / 2017-11-17 - 2018-02-28 (3 months)
AB-Cook: m/v MARSCHENLEND - General cargo / 2016-07-25 - 2016-12-05 (4 months)
OS-Cook: Konak - General cargo / 2016-01-24 - 2016-05-26 (4 months)
OS: TITAN - Other vessels / 2015-03-10 - 2015-05-10 (2 months)
AB Seaman: BRANT - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-15 - 2019-01-01 (7 months)
AB Seaman: SILVER - Bulk Carrier / 2016-12-06 - 2017-07-25 (8 months)
AB Seaman: VELVET - Bulk Carrier / 2015-12-02 - 2016-07-09 (7 months)
OS: TUFTY - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-01 - 2015-03-20 (8 months)