Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: Elka Glory - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-05-29 - 2021-01-11 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Winter Oak - Chemical tanker / 2019-06-09 - 2019-11-22 (5 months)
Oiler: River Oak - Chemical tanker / 2018-11-08 - 2019-04-05 (5 months)
Oiler: Leon Dias - Oil Products Tanker / 2017-12-18 - 2018-05-24 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Mistral A - Chemical tanker / 2016-07-02 - 2017-03-23 (9 months)
Oiler: ''Mineral Kyoto'' - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-23 - 2019-03-30 (5 months)
Oiler: RUDDY - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-28 - 2018-02-07 (7 months)
Oiler: ESI ARCTIC - Dry Cargo / 2016-05-12 - 2016-12-31 (8 months)
Oiler: ESI ANAX - Dry Cargo / 2015-08-12 - 2016-03-07 (7 months)
Oiler: ESI ARCTIC - Dry Cargo / 2014-12-12 - 2015-04-05 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: St Andrew - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-14 - 2022-01-14 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Elinda Mare - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-27 - 2020-11-27 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Dolce Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-30 - 2019-07-14 (3 months)
Oiler: Dolce Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2018-09-21 - 2019-03-29 (6 months)
Oiler: Dolce Vita - Bulk Carrier / 2017-07-06 - 2018-02-03 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Gaz Horizon - LPG / LNG / 2023-08-15 - 2023-12-20 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Gaz Imperial - LPG / LNG / 2022-10-23 - 2023-04-16 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Gaz Energy - LPG / LNG / 2021-03-09 - 2021-10-05 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Gaz Explorer - LPG / LNG / 2020-01-24 - 2020-07-14 (6 months)
Oiler: Guayaquil Bridge - Container Ship / 2019-01-17 - 2019-03-17 (2 months)
Motorman: ANA - RO-RO / 2018-08-22 - 2019-03-12 (7 months)
Motorman: AFRICAN SPIRIT - Platform Supply vessel / 2018-02-17 - 2018-04-08 (2 months)
Motorman: AFRICAN SPIRIT - Platform Supply vessel / 2017-08-06 - 2017-08-28 (1 month)
Motorman: PHOENIX III - Livestock / 2016-12-16 - 2017-03-27 (3 months)
Motorman: ORIENT TIDE - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-08 - 2016-03-14 (6 months)
Motorman: OYA STAR - Cement Carrier / 2018-08-30 - 2019-03-10 (6 months)
Oiler: amsel - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-08 - 2017-06-20 (8 months)
Oiler: amsel - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-05 - 2015-10-27 (9 months)
Oiler: cetus star - Bulk Carrier / 2013-12-25 - 2014-06-05 (5 months)
Oiler: arinaga - Bulk Carrier / 2013-08-10 - 2013-11-25 (3 months)
Motorman-welder: Bluefin - Chemical tanker / 2022-08-26 - 2023-03-23 (7 months)
Motorman-welder: Frio Marathon - Reefer / 2021-05-29 - 2021-11-21 (6 months)
Motorman-welder: Zefyros Reefer - Reefer / 2020-04-30 - 2021-02-02 (9 months)
Motorman-welder: Frio Shinano - Reefer / 2019-06-19 - 2019-12-15 (6 months)
Oiler: Grey Whale - Fishing vessel / 2018-10-25 - 2019-03-09 (4 months)
Oiler: ALP ACE - AHT / 2018-09-05 - 2019-03-01 (6 months)
Oiler: Pegasus - AHT / 2017-12-15 - 2018-04-14 (4 months)
Wiper : ALP CENTRE - AHT / 2017-06-07 - 2017-10-05 (4 months)
Wiper : ALP GUARD - AHT / 2017-04-26 - 2017-06-07 (1 month)
Wiper : ALP ACE - AHT / 2016-12-08 - 2017-03-30 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Gh brickfielder - Container Ship / 2020-08-08 - 2021-03-01 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Northern general - Container Ship / 2020-08-24 - 2020-12-14 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: M/v delphinus - Container Ship / 2019-09-25 - 2020-01-25 (4 months)
Oiler: St-cergue - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-22 - 2019-02-23 (6 months)
Oiler: Csl Argosy - Bulk Carrier / 2017-05-10 - 2017-11-13 (6 months)
Motorman: Nicolaos A - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-14 - 2021-02-11 (7 months)
Wiper: Evnia - Bulk Carrier / 2019-05-26 - 2019-12-07 (6 months)
Oiler: movers - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-04 - 2019-02-16 (6 months)
Motorman: suadiye - General cargo / 2016-08-29 - 2017-02-27 (6 months)
Motorman: ak seren - Bulk Carrier / 2015-08-15 - 2016-01-31 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v Petra ||| - Bulk Carrier / 2018-12-21 - 2019-02-10 (2 months)
Motorman: m/v Kristina P - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-28 - 2018-11-03 (2 months)
Motorman: m/v "GULF PERL" - Well-stimulation vessel / 2018-02-01 - 2018-07-16 (5 months)
Wiper: M/v CSL Frontier - Bulk Carrier / 2017-02-01 - 2017-06-06 (4 months)
Motorman: m/v Platres - General cargo / 2016-10-15 - 2016-11-15 (1 month)
Oiler: Julian - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-11 - 2019-02-10 (3 months)
Oiler: SEA HELLINIS - RO-RO / 2017-11-09 - 2018-03-28 (5 months)
Motorman: Iris-II - Bulk Carrier / 2016-09-02 - 2016-12-10 (3 months)
Motorman: Nikolas - III - Bulk Carrier / 2015-02-28 - 2015-12-27 (10 months)
Wiper : Blue Wave - Bulk Carrier / 2014-03-20 - 2014-09-30 (6 months)
Motorman: Siem Cicero - RO-RO / 2022-07-13 - 2023-01-03 (6 months)
Wiper: Wellington star - Reefer / 2021-10-21 - 2022-06-13 (8 months)
Wiper: Hikmet K - General cargo / 2019-09-15 - 2020-04-17 (7 months)
Mechanic: MP-26 - Dredger / 2019-03-01 - 2019-08-20 (6 months)
Oiler: UMD HERCULES - Dredger / 2018-07-15 - 2019-02-09 (7 months)
Oiler: Eleen Neptune - Bulk Carrier / 2018-10-04 - 2019-02-03 (4 months)
Oiler: Bedford Castle - Bulk Carrier / 2017-09-09 - 2018-03-28 (7 months)
Motorman: Consul - General cargo / 2016-11-26 - 2017-05-02 (5 months)
Motorman: Consul - General cargo / 2015-11-27 - 2016-06-23 (7 months)
Motorman: Sibirskiy-2131 - Dry Cargo / 2014-10-09 - 2015-07-25 (10 months)
4th Engineer: Gaz Providence - LPG / LNG / 2019-12-06 - 2020-06-23 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Gaz Century - LPG / LNG / 2019-07-28 - 2019-09-22 (2 months)
Oiler: GAZ FRATERNITY - LPG / LNG / 2018-07-22 - 2019-01-29 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Ngol Cassai - LPG / LNG / 2017-12-21 - 2018-04-20 (4 months)
Oiler: Ngol Cassai - LPG / LNG / 2017-05-17 - 2017-12-21 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Caroline Selmer - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-09 - 2023-02-17 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: ALMAR - Bulk Carrier / 2021-08-21 - 2022-04-23 (8 months)
Motorman-welder: AVIONA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-05 - 2020-08-25 (11 months)
Oiler: PALMERTON - Heavy lift vessel / 2018-07-21 - 2019-01-28 (6 months)
Oiler: PANTANAL - Heavy lift vessel / 2017-11-14 - 2018-05-08 (6 months)
Plumber: Costa Victoria - Cruise Liner / 2019-11-03 - 2020-01-23 (3 months)
Oiler: Pacific Venture - General cargo / 2018-09-01 - 2019-01-25 (5 months)
Motorman: GB Atlantic - General cargo / 2017-11-01 - 2018-01-05 (2 months)
Motorman: GB Atlantic - General cargo / 2017-03-07 - 2017-09-26 (7 months)
Motorman: Jin Long - General cargo / 2015-11-07 - 2016-06-30 (8 months)
Oiler: M/V OCEAN SPIRIT - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-29 - 2019-01-22 (5 months)
Oiler: M/N NILE - General cargo / 2008-08-08 - 2009-02-10 (6 months)
Oiler: M/V CAPTAIN UFUK - General cargo / 2008-02-04 - 2008-04-01 (2 months)
Oiler: M/V ALEX - General cargo / 2007-06-28 - 2007-11-20 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: MACCOA - Bulk Carrier / 2019-07-08 - 2019-09-21 (2 months)
Oiler: CRESTY - Bulk Carrier / 2018-06-23 - 2019-01-20 (7 months)
Oiler: PINTAIL - Bulk Carrier / 2016-11-16 - 2017-09-06 (10 months)
Oiler: SNOWY - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-25 - 2016-06-05 (8 months)
Oiler: MACCOA - Bulk Carrier / 2014-08-26 - 2015-04-11 (8 months)
AB Seaman: AHTS SAMED - Platform Supply vessel / 2020-10-11 - 2021-06-07 (8 months)
AB Seaman: MV KHORA - Tug boat / 2019-12-19 - 2020-09-23 (9 months)
OS: Azam Sealink 2 - RO-RO / 2019-03-22 - 2019-12-04 (8 months)
Oiler: MV LUXURY 2 - General cargo / 2018-08-10 - 2019-01-16 (5 months)