Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: Marielist - Container Ship / 2021-09-10 - 2022-06-11 (9 months)
3rd Engineer: Sonderborg - Container Ship / 2021-01-27 - 2021-08-09 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Carina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-12-10 - 2020-07-01 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Carina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-08-19 - 2019-11-25 (3 months)
Motorman: Carina - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-04-23 - 2019-07-30 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Cardinal - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-09 - 2021-11-04 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: SANDPIPER BULKER - Bulk Carrier / 2019-11-14 - 2020-08-08 (9 months)
Motorman: SANDPIPER BULKER - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-10 - 2019-07-22 (5 months)
Motorman: SANDPIPER BULKER - Bulk Carrier / 2018-07-19 - 2019-01-07 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: HATICE.C - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-02 - 2016-10-04 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: ENEIDA - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-12 - 2023-02-17 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Alexia I - General cargo / 2021-04-07 - 2021-11-23 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Alexia I - General cargo / 2019-12-18 - 2020-11-02 (10 months)
Motorman: Estestar - General cargo / 2019-02-13 - 2019-07-16 (5 months)
Motorman: Estestar - General cargo / 2017-10-16 - 2018-06-01 (8 months)
4th Engineer: Bluefort - Passenger vessel / 2021-05-08 - 2021-08-25 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Cabostar - RO-RO / 2020-11-06 - 2021-02-01 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Bluefort Ro-Ro Passenger - Passenger vessel / 2020-03-10 - 2020-07-20 (4 months)
Motorman: Bluefort Ro-Ro Passenger - RO-RO / 2019-03-06 - 2019-07-06 (4 months)
Motorman: Bluefort Ro-Ro Passenger - RO-RO / 2018-08-29 - 2019-01-05 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Marlene Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2023-11-11 - 2024-04-16 (5 months)
4th Engineer: Kira Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2022-12-03 - 2023-07-01 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Trina Oldendorff - Bulk Carrier / 2022-02-04 - 2022-07-14 (5 months)
Engineer Assistant: Medi Roma - Bulk Carrier / 2021-01-21 - 2021-08-27 (7 months)
Motorman: Saipan star - Passenger vessel / 2018-10-03 - 2019-07-05 (9 months)
Motorman: DNIPRO-7 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-03-01 - 2019-07-02 (4 months)
Motorman: Malburg - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-10-01 - 2019-02-04 (4 months)
Motorman: Malburg - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-03-02 - 2018-07-03 (4 months)
Motorman: Inder - Tug boat / 2017-10-09 - 2017-12-08 (2 months)
4th Engineer: FMT «Bergama» - Chemical tanker / 2019-10-27 - 2020-05-25 (7 months)
Motorman: FMT «Gumuldur» - Chemical tanker / 2019-02-14 - 2019-06-30 (5 months)
Motorman: FMT «Gumuldur» - Chemical tanker / 2018-03-22 - 2018-09-26 (6 months)
Motorman: m/t “Nataly” - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-06-23 - 2017-12-02 (5 months)
Motorman: Volgoneft 101 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2015-06-01 - 2015-11-16 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: mv Konrad - Container Ship / 2021-12-03 - 2022-01-29 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: m/v VOLGA-4009 - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-22 - 2021-09-23 (5 months)
Motorman: Snfnislaw Legowski - Dredger / 2019-04-24 - 2019-06-29 (2 months)
Mess Boy: St.Elias - Bulk Carrier / 2016-10-10 - 2017-06-14 (8 months)
Mess Boy: FLAGSHIP IVY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-09-04 - 2015-05-02 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: ERNA - Dry Cargo / 2021-08-09 - 2021-11-14 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: VAN GOGH - Dry Cargo / 2021-05-15 - 2021-07-03 (2 months)
Motorman-electrician: ERNA - Dry Cargo / 2020-10-24 - 2020-12-18 (2 months)
Motorman: Ariel - Tug boat / 2019-05-21 - 2019-06-28 (1 month)
Motorman: Port 101 - Tug boat / 2018-06-27 - 2019-03-06 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: OPAL - AHTS / 2022-08-02 - 2023-03-01 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: OPAL - AHTS / 2022-02-01 - 2022-06-09 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Widor - General cargo / 2020-12-10 - 2021-07-18 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Widor - General cargo / 2020-01-24 - 2020-06-30 (5 months)
Motorman: Pernille - General cargo / 2019-01-09 - 2019-06-27 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Gulf Mirdif - Chemical tanker / 2020-03-12 - 2020-07-14 (4 months)
Motorman: BLUE SUN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2018-10-24 - 2019-06-26 (8 months)
Motorman: LIBRA SUN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2017-04-27 - 2017-11-24 (7 months)
Motorman: ABBEY ROAD - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-11-21 - 2016-04-17 (5 months)
Motorman: LEO SUN - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-10-14 - 2015-04-26 (6 months)
4th Engineer: CMA CGM LOUGA - Container Ship / 2023-02-08 - 2023-06-05 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Ivar Reefer - Reefer / 2021-11-15 - 2022-09-09 (10 months)
3rd Engineer: Bukhta Russkaya - Reefer / 2020-04-01 - 2020-10-05 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Bukhta Russkaya - Reefer / 2019-10-25 - 2020-03-31 (5 months)
Motorman: Mys Olyutorskiy - Fishing vessel / 2019-04-22 - 2019-06-25 (2 months)
Fitter / Welder: Mirella S - Chemical tanker / 2022-01-18 - 2022-03-20 (2 months)
Motorman-welder: SANTA MARTINA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-03-30 - 2021-07-19 (4 months)
Motorman-welder: Mount McKinney - Chemical tanker / 2020-05-20 - 2020-11-08 (6 months)
Motorman: Resolut bay - Dry Cargo / 2019-04-05 - 2019-06-18 (2 months)
Motorman: Mykonos bay - Bulk Carrier / 2018-03-28 - 2018-12-07 (8 months)
3rd Engineer: Kouroupi - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-11 - 2022-02-20 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Alina - Bulk Carrier / 2020-11-26 - 2021-03-13 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Alina - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-16 - 2020-08-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Alina - Bulk Carrier / 2018-11-04 - 2019-06-10 (7 months)
Motorman: Ocean Tressure - Bulk Carrier / 2017-10-06 - 2018-03-12 (5 months)
Oiler: Alora - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-23 - 2022-01-23 (7 months)
Oiler: Navigare Bellus - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-23 - 2021-03-27 (5 months)
Oiler: "Emilia" - Bulk Carrier / 2020-03-07 - 2020-08-15 (5 months)
Motorman: ,,Sanna’’ - Bulk Carrier / 2019-02-26 - 2019-06-04 (3 months)
Wiper: ,,Star- 2’’ - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-04 - 2017-10-16 (7 months)
4th Engineer: Osveyskoe - Fishing vessel / 2021-09-27 - 2022-03-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Akademik Ioffe - Passenger vessel / 2019-01-12 - 2019-06-03 (5 months)
Motorman: Iosif Shmelkin - Fishing vessel / 2017-02-15 - 2017-09-19 (7 months)
Motorman: Iosif Shmelkin - Fishing vessel / 2016-04-08 - 2016-09-22 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: mt PORTOFINO - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-07-13 - 2023-04-13 (9 months)
4th Engineer: AMBROSIA - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-08-28 - 2022-02-11 (5 months)
4th Engineer: PAPILLON - Oil Products Tanker / 2020-07-08 - 2021-01-23 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: KURA RIVER - Chemical tanker / 2019-09-26 - 2020-01-22 (4 months)
Motorman: SKF PACIFICA - Oil Products Tanker / 2018-11-17 - 2019-06-03 (7 months)
Motorman: Oleksandr Okhrymenko - Research vessel / 2019-02-01 - 2019-06-01 (4 months)
Motorman: Oleksandr Okhrymenko - Research vessel / 2018-08-23 - 2018-12-30 (4 months)
Motorman: Oleksandr Okhrymenko - Research vessel / 2018-03-18 - 2018-07-21 (4 months)
Motorman: Oleksandr Okhrymenko - Research vessel / 2017-10-15 - 2018-02-16 (4 months)
Motorman: Oleksandr Okhrymenko - Research vessel / 2017-05-10 - 2017-09-12 (4 months)
Motorman: mv VOLGA 4009 - General cargo / 2018-12-09 - 2019-06-01 (6 months)
Motorman: mv FAVORITE - General cargo / 2018-01-22 - 2018-07-26 (6 months)
Motorman: mv PLUTON - General cargo / 2016-11-22 - 2017-07-15 (8 months)
Motorman: mv PLUTON - General cargo / 2016-04-28 - 2016-10-15 (6 months)
Motorman: mv TUZLA - General cargo / 2016-03-13 - 2016-03-19 (6 days)
Motorman: DNEPR - AHT / 2019-01-01 - 2019-05-31 (5 months)
Motorman: DNEPR - AHT / 2013-08-01 - 2018-07-06 (4 years)
Motorman: Victoria - General cargo / 2012-12-31 - 2013-05-07 (4 months)
Motorman: Victoria - General cargo / 2011-10-03 - 2012-02-19 (5 months)
Motorman: Victoria - General cargo / 2011-03-02 - 2011-06-29 (4 months)