Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: Nabereznie chelni - Bulk Carrier / 2021-06-07 - 2021-09-19 (3 months)
Motorman: Ivan Cheremisinov - Dredger / 2020-08-31 - 2020-11-01 (2 months)
Motorman: Volgo-Don - General cargo / 2019-03-15 - 2021-09-06 (2 years)
Motorman: Strig - Other vessels / 2019-03-01 - 2021-01-29 (1 year)
3rd Engineer: Seahorse - Bulk Carrier / 2021-07-30 - 2022-01-30 (6 months)
4th Engineer: Kristina-P - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-29 - 2021-07-16 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Oxana-V - Bulk Carrier / 2020-10-22 - 2021-02-20 (4 months)
Motorman: Oxana-V - Bulk Carrier / 2020-06-27 - 2020-10-21 (4 months)
Motorman: Oxana-V - Bulk Carrier / 2019-10-14 - 2020-02-21 (4 months)
AB / Motorman: Донской 604 - Dredger / 2019-05-21 - 2020-01-21 (8 months)
Motorman: Mv Anne 1 - NAVY / 2015-09-29 - 2019-09-29 (4 years)
Engine Cadet: Sunrise - Bulk Carrier / 2019-03-22 - 2019-07-24 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Sunrise - Bulk Carrier / 2018-05-12 - 2018-09-06 (4 months)
Motorman: Mayak - Tug boat / 2018-05-18 - 2018-12-04 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: HANSA CLOPPENBURG - Container Ship / 2016-02-15 - 2016-08-28 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Madura - Container Ship / 2014-07-02 - 2015-02-01 (7 months)
Engine Cadet: Onyx Arrow - RO-RO / 2013-09-04 - 2014-04-01 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: BBC Ukraine - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-12-25 - 2022-06-18 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: BBC Russia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-01-28 - 2021-05-27 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: BBC Russia - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2020-06-15 - 2020-09-30 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Kurt Paul - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2019-09-05 - 2020-01-26 (5 months)
Motorman: Wybelsum - Container Ship / 2016-11-20 - 2017-04-26 (5 months)
Motorman: Neptune Dynamis - RO-RO / 2016-07-18 - 2017-01-24 (6 months)
Motorman: Clipper kalavryta - Bulk Carrier / 2015-09-17 - 2015-12-12 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Comanche - General cargo / 2014-12-20 - 2015-06-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Авиор - General cargo / 2016-10-18 - 2017-01-13 (3 months)
Motorman: KHADZHIBEY - Passenger vessel / 2016-09-29 - 2016-11-29 (2 months)
Motorman: Genco Aqvitaint - Bulk Carrier / 2016-04-30 - 2016-11-25 (7 months)
Oiler: Cohrane - Container Ship / 2015-08-06 - 2015-08-12 (6 days)
Oiler: Norasia Alya - Container Ship / 2014-03-08 - 2014-10-18 (7 months)
Motorman: Pucon - Container Ship / 2013-04-22 - 2013-09-16 (5 months)
Motorman: Norasia Alya - Container Ship / 2011-11-30 - 2012-07-18 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Волморе - General cargo / 2016-04-17 - 2016-10-27 (6 months)
Motorman: VOLSHEBNIK - Tug boat / 2016-04-02 - 2016-05-02 (1 month)
Motorman: DOCOVETC CREMEA - Tug boat / 2014-01-15 - 2014-07-28 (6 months)
OS: BULBACH - Tug boat / 2013-10-10 - 2014-01-14 (3 months)
Motorman: MGS - Other vessels / 2010-01-03 - 2013-03-31 (3 years)
Motorman: المناره - Chemical tanker / 2013-04-14 - 2015-08-12 (2 years)
Motorman: m/v KALLIROI K - Bulk carrier / 2012-02-03 - 2012-08-10 (6 months)
Motorman: m/v OTRADA - Bulk carrier / 2010-08-10 - 2011-08-20 (1 year)
Wiper: ELITA - Dry Cargo / 2009-06-08 - 2009-12-08 (6 months)
No Experience