Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: Всеволод Сибирцев - Other vessels / 2023-03-13 - 2023-08-29 (6 months)
Motorman: A. Rublev - Cruise Liner / 2023-05-12 - 2023-08-24 (3 months)
Oiler: sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2022-09-08 - 2022-11-08 (2 months)
Oiler: A.S. Pushkin - Cruise Liner / 2022-05-13 - 2022-08-13 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Astrid - General cargo / 2022-11-05 - 2023-01-05 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Kapitan Kolesnikov - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-09-04 - 2022-11-03 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Ivan Bunin - Passenger vessel / 2022-04-28 - 2022-07-03 (2 months)
Motorman: MARIE CURIE - Ferry / 2021-10-16 - 2022-10-27 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: KAPITAN SHLYGIN - Tug boat / 2022-03-25 - 2022-09-11 (6 months)
Motorman: Caspian Sprinter - Oil Products Tanker / 2022-05-30 - 2022-08-25 (3 months)
Motorman: Del Monte Pride - Container Ship / 2022-01-20 - 2022-08-19 (7 months)
Motorman: Sedov - Sailing Vessel / 2022-05-27 - 2022-08-09 (2 months)
Wiper: Vankor - Crude Oil Tanker / 2021-04-16 - 2021-12-15 (8 months)
Motorman: ANSAC KATHRYN - Bulk Carrier / 2017-03-26 - 2017-11-14 (8 months)
Motorman: Dobrynya Nicitich - General cargo / 2021-07-31 - 2021-10-17 (3 months)
Motorman: Ilya Muromets - General cargo / 2021-05-01 - 2021-07-30 (3 months)
Motorman: Mezhdurechensk - General cargo / 2020-08-17 - 2020-11-29 (3 months)
Motorman: Oleg Davidenko - Oil Products Tanker / 2019-06-26 - 2019-12-04 (5 months)
Motorman: Sea Explirer - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-05-10 - 2021-09-23 (4 months)
Motorman: F/V ARISTOTLE - Fishing vessel / 2019-11-08 - 2020-02-04 (3 months)
Motorman: Polar Pioneer - Passenger vessel / 2021-05-03 - 2021-07-03 (2 months)
Motorman: M/V Favori - General cargo / 2020-12-10 - 2021-05-10 (5 months)
Motorman-welder: Papua - Bulk Carrier / 2020-09-06 - 2021-04-13 (7 months)
Motorman: Camilla - Container Ship / 2018-05-15 - 2019-02-04 (9 months)
Motorman: Taifun - Barge / 2016-10-23 - 2017-11-23 (1 year)
Motorman: SCF DON - Chemical tanker / 2020-07-24 - 2021-03-20 (8 months)
Motorman: Regina Seaways - RO-RO / 2020-06-29 - 2020-12-25 (6 months)
Motorman: Volgoneft-210 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2020-03-20 - 2020-12-05 (8 months)
Motorman: Volgoneft-32 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2019-05-21 - 2019-09-29 (4 months)
Motorman: Captain Govorukhin - Tug boat / 2020-05-03 - 2020-11-03 (6 months)
Motorman: КНЯЖНА АНАСТАСИЯ - Passenger vessel / 2019-06-01 - 2019-08-31 (3 months)
Motorman: Gurban Abasov - Crane vessel / 2018-10-22 - 2020-10-04 (1 year)
Engine Cadet: Merkury 1 - Ferry / 2018-01-20 - 2018-04-20 (3 months)
Engine Cadet: Shirvan 3 - Crane vessel / 2017-07-01 - 2017-08-10 (1 month)
Engine Cadet: Atamoglan Kerimov - Crane vessel / 2016-06-02 - 2016-08-02 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Koroglu - Oil Products Tanker / 2015-06-08 - 2015-08-20 (2 months)