Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
3rd Engineer: Posh Endeavour - Construction vessel / 2016-01-07 - 2016-03-15 (2 months)
Motorman: Sea Springer - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-12-15 - 2015-02-17 (2 months)
Motorman: JASCON 11 - AHT / 2014-07-15 - 2014-09-20 (2 months)
Motorman: NSO Fortune - Platform Supply vessel / 2014-01-10 - 2014-06-27 (6 months)
Motorman: Caspian Endeavour - AHTS / 2013-12-04 - 2013-12-31 (1 month)
3rd Engineer: Сочи 2 - Passenger vessel / 2015-05-15 - 2015-09-30 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Viking - General cargo / 2015-03-19 - 2015-05-03 (1 month)
Motorman: БФИ-1 - RO-RO / 2014-10-30 - 2015-02-06 (3 months)
Motorman: Григорий Малов - Dry Cargo / 2013-04-26 - 2013-11-09 (6 months)
Motorman: star taurus - Chemical tanker / 2014-05-03 - 2014-10-30 (6 months)
Motorman: NORDIC RUHT - Chemical tanker / 2013-01-25 - 2013-06-25 (5 months)
Motorman: NORDIC RUTH - Chemical tanker / 2012-03-08 - 2012-07-15 (4 months)
Motorman: ELBTANK GERMANY - Crude Oil Tanker / 2011-05-07 - 2011-11-25 (7 months)
Motorman: AMY - Chemical tanker / 2010-06-05 - 2010-12-31 (7 months)
Pumpman: Пролив Лонга - Reefer / 2016-07-19 - 2017-01-11 (6 months)
Motorman: Василий Полещук - Reefer / 2013-12-08 - 2014-06-13 (6 months)
Motorman: Сан Диего - Reefer / 2013-05-01 - 2013-08-28 (4 months)
Motorman: Сан Диего - Reefer / 2012-11-09 - 2013-03-08 (4 months)
Motorman: Улисс - General cargo / 2012-07-14 - 2012-10-13 (3 months)
3rd Engineer: Brothers 8 - Chemical tanker / 2015-06-15 - 2015-11-10 (5 months)
Fitter / Welder: Riroil 4 - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-05-22 - 2014-12-10 (7 months)
Motorman: Zaliv Vostok - Reefer / 2013-04-23 - 2014-03-18 (11 months)
Motorman: Abinsk - Reefer / 2012-05-19 - 2012-11-30 (6 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2016-01-20 - 2016-05-21 (4 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2015-07-15 - 2015-12-22 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2014-11-27 - 2015-04-30 (5 months)
3rd Engineer: Key Fighter - Chemical tanker / 2014-04-20 - 2014-08-31 (4 months)
Motorman: Heimdal - Cable laying vessel / 2012-05-27 - 2012-09-06 (3 months)
Motorman: Taka Island - General cargo / 2011-09-03 - 2012-03-05 (6 months)
Motorman: Taka Island - General cargo / 2010-08-28 - 2011-02-17 (6 months)
Motorman: Taka Island - General cargo / 2010-08-28 - 2011-02-17 (6 months)
El. Engineer: petr hamitov - General cargo / 2014-12-17 - 2015-08-04 (8 months)
El. Engineer: petr hamitov - General cargo / 2014-05-06 - 2014-08-07 (3 months)
Motorman-electrician: n.upit - General cargo / 2012-12-03 - 2013-08-30 (9 months)
Motorman: hektor - AHTS / 2011-08-10 - 2011-11-02 (3 months)
Electrician: borealis - General cargo / 2010-06-10 - 2010-12-27 (7 months)
3rd Engineer: Volgo Balt 236 - General cargo / 2012-06-17 - 2012-10-24 (4 months)
4th Engineer: Sergey Gritsevets - General cargo / 2011-12-14 - 2012-01-27 (1 month)
4th Engineer: Zirka Dnipra - Passenger vessel / 2011-03-21 - 2011-10-12 (7 months)
Motorman: Zirka Dnipra - Passenger vessel / 2010-03-10 - 2010-10-05 (7 months)
Motorman: Zirka Dnipra - Passenger vessel / 2009-03-09 - 2009-10-18 (7 months)
AB Seaman: AMUR 2520 - General cargo / 2014-03-07 - 2014-08-04 (5 months)
AB Seaman: SeaShell - General cargo / 2013-03-22 - 2013-08-13 (5 months)
Motorman: Георгий Агафонов - Dry Cargo / 2008-10-19 - 2008-12-20 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Omskiy-118 - Dry Cargo / 2024-04-02 - 2024-06-08 (2 months)
Motorman: Liberty - Crude Oil Tanker / 2024-01-02 - 2024-06-07 (5 months)
Motorman: Valams - Crude Oil Tanker / 2022-08-02 - 2022-12-19 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Pola Makaria - Bulk Carrier / 2024-04-16 - 2024-05-29 (1 month)
Steward: LEONID SOBOLEV - Passenger vessel / 2023-05-12 - 2023-10-02 (5 months)
Trainee Engineer: Vafa-1 - General cargo / 2024-03-24 - 2024-05-08 (1 month)
Trainee Engineer: Vafa-1 - General cargo / 2023-04-26 - 2023-09-19 (5 months)
Motorman: Viking Amber - RO-RO / 2023-06-13 - 2023-12-17 (6 months)
Oiler: Solin - Bulk Carrier / 2022-08-05 - 2023-01-20 (5 months)
Oiler: Sveti Dujam - Bulk Carrier / 2021-11-01 - 2022-03-23 (5 months)
Wiper: Trogir - Bulk Carrier / 2021-03-08 - 2021-07-14 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: Tigris - Tug boat / 2020-08-01 - 2020-12-16 (4 months)
Motorman: Konstantin Simonov - Passenger vessel / 2023-04-20 - 2023-10-24 (6 months)
AB Seaman: KAPITAN MASLOVETS - Fishing vessel / 2023-04-20 - 2023-09-19 (5 months)
AB Seaman: KAPITAN ЕFREMOV - Fishing vessel / 2021-03-25 - 2021-12-11 (9 months)
AB Seaman: Pallada - Sailing Vessel / 2017-04-26 - 2017-06-05 (1 month)
Motorman: Granit - Tug boat / 2019-05-05 - 2023-08-21 (4 years)
Motorman: Atlantic Discovere - Container Ship / 2022-08-11 - 2023-08-02 (12 months)
Motorman: ALPHA - General cargo / 2020-12-19 - 2021-05-09 (5 months)