Save
Close
Add seaman to favorites
Remove seaman from favorites
Motorman: DOLPHIN - DSV (Diving Support) / 2016-10-05 - 2018-05-25 (1 year)
Motorman: Fedor Uriupin - AHTS / 2015-10-16 - 2016-07-25 (9 months)
Motorman: Inya - AHTS / 2012-02-20 - 2012-06-25 (4 months)
Motorman: Neftegaz-68 - AHTS / 2009-03-10 - 2010-06-12 (1 year)
Motorman: Neptun-3 - Crane vessel / 2008-12-04 - 2009-02-06 (2 months)
Motorman: Lime - General cargo / 2018-02-21 - 2018-04-24 (2 months)
Motorman: Daisy - General cargo / 2018-01-23 - 2018-02-20 (1 month)
Motorman: Lime - General cargo / 2017-07-27 - 2017-12-03 (4 months)
Motorman: Lime - General cargo / 2017-02-02 - 2017-07-01 (5 months)
Oiler: m/v "Ilia" - Bulk Carrier / 2017-06-21 - 2018-03-27 (9 months)
Motorman: Vadibel - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-11 - 2017-02-22 (8 months)
Motorman: Vadibel - Bulk Carrier / 2016-06-11 - 2017-02-22 (8 months)
Motorman: Kagan Bey - General cargo / 2015-04-02 - 2015-11-19 (8 months)
Engine Cadet: Alvadi 2 - General cargo / 2014-03-04 - 2014-07-16 (4 months)
Motorman: Sepano - Dry Cargo / 2017-10-03 - 2018-03-14 (5 months)
Motorman: Valencia - Passenger vessel / 2016-10-03 - 2016-12-03 (2 months)
AB / Welder: Griftbor - Dry Cargo / 2015-07-20 - 2016-05-11 (10 months)
AB Seaman: m/v odessa 1 - Dry Cargo / 2014-10-13 - 2015-04-23 (6 months)
Motorman: SILVER ROTTERDAM - Chemical tanker / 2017-03-14 - 2017-10-26 (7 months)
Motorman: GULF DEFFI - Chemical tanker / 2016-04-24 - 2016-10-22 (6 months)
Motorman: GULF FANATIR - Chemical tanker / 2015-02-21 - 2015-08-19 (6 months)
Motorman: GULF FANATIR - Chemical tanker / 2013-12-13 - 2014-07-18 (7 months)
Motorman: GULF FANATIR - Chemical tanker / 2012-10-13 - 2013-04-18 (6 months)
Motorman: SALAMIS FILOXENIA - Cruise Liner / 2017-05-04 - 2017-07-20 (3 months)
Motorman: GREIFSWALD - RO-RO / 2016-07-07 - 2016-11-15 (4 months)
Motorman: Winner S - Dry Cargo / 2015-12-07 - 2016-04-11 (4 months)
Motorman: m/vSOFRANA SURVILLE - Container Ship / 2013-08-18 - 2014-02-27 (6 months)
Motorman: RICHMOND - Dry Cargo / 2012-02-20 - 2012-09-09 (7 months)
Motorman: PURGA - Tug boat / 2017-01-09 - 2017-06-10 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: Dolphin - Reefer / 2017-01-26 - 2017-03-28 (2 months)
3rd Engineer: Svataya Anna - Dry Cargo / 2017-06-29 - 2018-02-21 (8 months)
Motorman: ASABA 2 - Ferry / 2016-09-11 - 2017-03-16 (6 months)
Motorman: ASABA 2 - Ferry / 2015-12-17 - 2016-06-21 (6 months)
Wiper: Avra - Bulk Carrier / 2019-12-17 - 2020-01-06 (1 month)
Wiper: Wybelsum - Container Ship / 2019-02-27 - 2019-08-11 (5 months)
Wiper: Ditzum - General cargo / 2017-08-18 - 2018-02-21 (6 months)
Motorman: Accum - General cargo / 2017-01-01 - 2017-03-13 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: Accum - General cargo / 2016-07-31 - 2016-12-31 (5 months)
OS: Svyatoy Pyotr - Bulk Carrier / 2021-04-26 - 2021-08-03 (3 months)
OS: Svyatoy Pyotr - Bulk Carrier / 2020-07-27 - 2021-02-03 (6 months)
OS: SVYATOY PYOTR - Bulk Carrier / 2018-08-30 - 2019-02-22 (6 months)
Motorman: kapitan nezavitin - Tug boat / 2015-09-11 - 2016-08-18 (11 months)
OS: "Александрия" буксир п.Черноморск - Tug boat / 2015-09-01 - 2016-06-30 (10 months)
AB / Motorman : volga-4007 - General cargo / 2017-05-26 - 2018-02-03 (8 months)
Motorman: river elbe - General cargo / 2016-02-19 - 2016-08-16 (6 months)
AB / Welder: alpha - General cargo / 2014-11-04 - 2015-05-16 (6 months)
AB / Welder: sembriya - Dry Cargo / 2013-05-19 - 2013-12-19 (7 months)
Motorman: liliya karastoyanova - General cargo / 2012-08-11 - 2012-12-29 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: FORNT LYNX - Oil Products Tanker / 2016-03-04 - 2016-06-26 (4 months)
Motorman: Sergey Novoselov - Fishing vessel / 2014-07-16 - 2014-08-17 (1 month)
Motorman: Volga 4052 - General cargo / 2015-08-22 - 2015-12-22 (4 months)
Motorman: Volga 4052 - General cargo / 2014-07-22 - 2014-12-08 (5 months)
Motorman: Svyatoy Mikhail - Bulk Carrier / 2014-02-26 - 2014-07-10 (4 months)
Engine Cadet: volga 4006 - General cargo / 2013-10-31 - 2014-02-22 (4 months)
Motorman: Протон-159 - Fishing vessel / 2013-05-22 - 2013-07-29 (2 months)
Engine Cadet: m/v "Sail Pride" - Dry Cargo / 2015-06-03 - 2015-10-21 (5 months)
4th Engineer: m/v MERCURY - Reefer / 2017-04-19 - 2017-11-09 (7 months)
4th Engineer: ЛСС "Суворовец" - Tug boat / 2016-11-03 - 2016-12-13 (1 month)
4th Engineer: ЛСС "Сибирский" - Tug boat / 2016-09-29 - 2016-11-02 (1 month)
4th Engineer: m/v Olympic Pride - Bulk Carrier / 2016-02-20 - 2016-08-31 (6 months)
Motorman: МСБ "Преданный" - Tug boat / 2015-07-20 - 2015-09-11 (2 months)
Motorman: Confidence I - Bulk Carrier / 2014-12-11 - 2015-08-11 (8 months)
Motorman: Marianne - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-12-26 - 2014-06-26 (6 months)
Motorman: Marlene - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2013-01-23 - 2013-08-04 (6 months)
Engine Cadet: Merle - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2011-11-16 - 2012-04-16 (5 months)
Engine Cadet: OB - Fishing vessel / 2015-04-27 - 2015-07-18 (3 months)
2nd Engineer: Tiziana - Bulk Carrier / 2022-07-30 - 2023-01-30 (6 months)
2nd Engineer: Pacific Harmony - Multi-Purpose Vessel / 2021-12-12 - 2022-05-21 (5 months)
4th Engineer: DP Ability - Container Ship / 2016-04-29 - 2016-08-09 (3 months)
4th Engineer: Energy Ranger - Bulk Carrier / 2015-06-25 - 2016-01-14 (7 months)
Motorman: Energy Ranger - Bulk Carrier / 2015-04-03 - 2015-06-24 (3 months)
4th Engineer: OCEAN PROMISE - Container Ship / 2016-10-21 - 2017-03-08 (4 months)
4th Engineer: WARRIOR - Bulk Carrier / 2015-10-04 - 2016-04-16 (6 months)
Motorman: PARAMOUNT HANOVER - Crude Oil Tanker / 2014-07-02 - 2015-02-18 (8 months)
Motorman: ENERGY CHANCELLOR - Crude Oil Tanker / 2013-06-06 - 2014-01-18 (7 months)
Motorman: PARAMOUNT HATTERAS - Crude Oil Tanker / 2012-05-17 - 2012-10-13 (5 months)